Depot: Wath
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Wath | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | 26002 | on | 27/10/1950 | 39A | Gorton (New) | m/e | 30/04/1952 | 36b | on | 01/03/1953 | 39A | Gorton |
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | 26003 | m/e | 30/04/1952 | 30a | Ilford | on | 19/07/1952 | 36b | on | 01/03/1953 | 39A | Gorton |
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | 26004 | m/e | 30/04/1952 | 30a | Ilford | on | 19/07/1952 | 36b | on | 01/03/1953 | 39A | Gorton |
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | 26002 | on | 01/03/1953 | 39A | Gorton | on | 05/05/1953 | 36b | on | 18/12/1953 | 39A | Gorton |
Electric | EM2 | Co-Co | 27000 | on | 28/12/1953 (New) | 36b | on | 01/06/1954 | 39a | Reddish | ||||
Electric | EM1 | Bo+Bo | 26003 | on | 01/03/1953 | 39A | Gorton | on | 19/03/1954 | 36b | on | 12/06/1954 | 39a | Reddish |
Electric | EM2 | Co-Co | 27001 | on | 22/03/1954 (New) | 36b | on | 05/10/1968 | Withdrawn | |||||
Electric | EM2 | Co-Co | 27002 | on | 18/05/1954 (New) | 36b | on | 05/10/1968 | Withdrawn | |||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5527 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40A | Lincoln |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5528 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 40A | Lincoln |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5538 | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 05/06/1965 | 2E | Saltley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5539 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5542 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5583 | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5584 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 16A | Toton |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5585 | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5804 | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5805 | on | 06/07/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 25/09/1965 | 41C | Wath |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5806 | on | 13/07/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5807 | on | 20/07/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5808 | on | 20/07/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 41C | Wath |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5809 | on | 27/07/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5810 | on | 03/08/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5811 | on | 24/08/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 2E | Saltley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5812 | on | 31/08/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5813 | on | 07/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5814 | on | 14/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 41C | Wath |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5815 | on | 21/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5816 | on | 28/09/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5817 | on | 05/10/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5818 | on | 12/10/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5819 | on | 19/10/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5820 | on | 26/10/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5821 | on | 02/11/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 04/12/1965 | D16 | Nottingham Division |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5822 | on | 09/11/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5823 | on | 16/11/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5824 | on | 23/11/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5825 | on | 30/11/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5826 | on | 07/12/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5827 | on | 14/12/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2E | Saltley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5828 | on | 28/12/1961 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 41C | Wath |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5584 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 16A | Toton | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 41C | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5829 | on | 04/01/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 41C | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 16G | Westhouses |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5830 | on | 11/01/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 41C | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 2E | Saltley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5831 | on | 18/01/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 41C | w/e | 05/06/1965 | 41C | Wath |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5832 | on | 01/02/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5833 | on | 15/02/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 41C | w/e | 18/09/1965 | O/L | |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5834 | on | 01/03/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 41C | w/e | 18/03/1967 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5836 | on | 12/04/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3060 | on | 22/08/1953 | 36B | Mexborough (New) | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | on | 28/10/1979 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3061 | on | 22/08/1953 | 36B | Mexborough (New) | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | on | 12/12/1977 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3062 | on | 10/09/1953 | 36B | Mexborough (New) | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | on | 17/05/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3063 | on | 24/10/1953 | 36B | Mexborough (New) | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | on | 25/10/1981 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3064 | on | 09/09/1953 | 36B | Mexborough (New) | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | on | 11/07/1982 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3329 | on | 14/12/1956 | 36B | Mexborough (New) | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | 2w/e | 05/04/1975 | NA | Newton Abbot |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3333 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 36B | Mexborough | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | w/e | 26/07/1969 | 41J | Shirebrook |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3697 | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 41F | Mexborough | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3726 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 41F | Mexborough | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4031 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 41F | Mexborough | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 41J | Shirebrook |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4032 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 41F | Mexborough | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | 2w/e | 20/11/1976 | TE | Thornaby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4033 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 41F | Mexborough | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | 2w/e | 20/11/1976 | HM | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5837 | on | 19/04/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 41C | Wath |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5838 | on | 26/04/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5839 | on | 03/05/1962 | 41A | Sheffield Darnall (New) | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 2E | Saltley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5811 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 41C | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5828 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | Wath | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 41C | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 2E | Saltley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5828 | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 41C | w/e | 26/11/1966 | 31B | March |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5831 | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 41C | Wath | w/e | 05/06/1965 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5538 | w/e | 05/06/1965 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 41C | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4030 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 41C | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4034 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 41C | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5814 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | Wath | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 41C | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 41C | Wath |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5814 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 41C | Wath | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 41C | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5830 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5808 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | Wath | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 41C | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 41C | Wath |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5839 | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5837 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 41C | Wath | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5805 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 41f | Wath | w/e | 25/09/1965 | 41C | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5833 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | O/L | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley | |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5827 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5829 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 16G | Westhouses | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5808 | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 41C | Wath | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 41C | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 41C | Wath |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5808 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 41C | Wath | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 41C | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1797 | on | 06/01/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 41C | w/e | 29/01/1966 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1798 | on | 29/01/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 41C | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1799 | on | 21/01/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 41C | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1800 | on | 14/01/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 41C | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1801 | on | 14/01/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 41C | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1802 | on | 22/01/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 41C | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1803 | on | 21/01/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 41C | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1804 | on | 16/02/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 41C | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1805 | on | 21/01/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 41C | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | D1806 | on | 26/01/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 41C | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5821 | w/e | 04/12/1965 | D16 | Nottingham Division | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5538 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 41C | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5539 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 41C | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5542 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 41C | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5583 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 41C | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5585 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 41C | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5804 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 41C | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5805 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 41C | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5806 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 22/01/1966 | 41C | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7624 | on | 30/07/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7625 | on | 30/07/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7626 | on | 05/08/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7627 | on | 12/08/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 12/08/1967 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7628 | on | 12/08/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 12/08/1967 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7629 | on | 07/09/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 12/08/1967 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7630 | on | 16/09/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 15/07/1967 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7631 | on | 29/09/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 12/08/1967 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7632 | on | 08/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 12/08/1967 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7633 | on | 30/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7634 | on | 19/10/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7635 | on | 05/11/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7636 | on | 15/11/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7637 | on | 22/12/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7638 | on | 30/01/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 15/07/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7639 | on | 23/12/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 01/04/1967 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7640 | on | 31/12/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 01/04/1967 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7641 | on | 14/01/1966 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 01/04/1967 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7642 | on | 28/01/1966 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 01/04/1967 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7643 | on | 08/02/1966 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 01/04/1967 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7644 | on | 23/03/1966 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41C | w/e | 01/04/1967 | D01 | London Division |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6746 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 30/06/1966 | 41C | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 31B | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6747 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 30/06/1966 | 41C | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 31B | March |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6965 | on | 03/02/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 30/06/1966 | 41C | w/e | 02/12/1967 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6966 | on | 11/02/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 30/06/1966 | 41C | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6967 | on | 11/02/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 30/06/1966 | 41C | w/e | 23/12/1967 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6968 | on | 17/02/1965 | 41A | Tinsley (New) | w/e | 30/06/1966 | 41C | w/e | 18/11/1967 | 30A | Stratford |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5811 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5812 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5813 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5814 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5815 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5816 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5679 | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 34G | Finsbury Park | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 41C | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 32B | Ipswich |
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | D5842 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 40B | Immingham | w/e | 20/08/1966 | 41C | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 32B | Ipswich |
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | D5633 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 18/03/1967 | 41C | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 32B | Ipswich |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6701 | on | 12/12/1960 | 30A | Stratford (New) | w/e | 15/07/1967 | 41C | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | D7630 | w/e | 15/07/1967 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | w/e | 22/07/1967 | 41C | w/e | 12/08/1967 | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6796 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 41C | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 41C | Wath |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6798 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 41C | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 41C | Wath |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6702 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 41C | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6796 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 41C | Wath | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 41C | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6798 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 41C | Wath | w/e | 09/09/1967 | 41C | m/e | 30/09/1967 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6703 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 30/09/1967 | 41C | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6704 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 14/10/1967 | 41C | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6708 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 28/10/1967 | 41C | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6705 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 18/11/1967 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6706 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 02/12/1967 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6707 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 23/12/1967 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6709 | on | 17/02/1961 | 30A | Stratford (New) | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 41C | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3936 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 41C | w/e | 09/11/1968 | 81A | Old Oak Common |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D206 | on | 17/06/1968 | D08 | Liverpool Division | w/e | 29/07/1969 | 41C | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D09 | Manchester Division |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4037 | on | 26/04/1964 | 41A | Tinsley | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | 41C | w/e | 31/03/1973 | 41J | Shirebrook |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08930 | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 2w/e | 05/04/1975 | WH | w/e | 21/06/1975 | SF | Stratford |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08870 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | m/e | 08/1977 | WH | on | 07/05/1993 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08866 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 41A | Tinsley | 5w/e | 31/12/1977 | WH | m/e | 10/1978 | TI | Tinsley |