Depot: Woodford Halse
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Woodford Halse | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 338 | m/e | 06/1915 (New) | WFD | on | 09/08/1925 | NEA | Neasden | ||||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 344 | m/e | 08/1916 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 08/11/1919 | WFD | on | 11/05/1929 | MAR | March |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 368 | m/e | 03/1917 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 08/11/1919 | WFD | on | 01/08/1926 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 369 | m/e | 04/1917 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 16/05/1920 | WFD | on | 30/01/1925 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 462 | on | 09/12/1921 | NEA | Neasden | on | 19/05/1922 | WFD | on | 05/06/1926 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 467 | on | 14/07/1922 | WFD | on | 30/06/1926 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 468 | on | 14/07/1922 | WFD | on | 09/10/1935 | NEA | Neasden | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 469 | on | 14/07/1922 | WFD | on | 10/05/1924 | IMM | Immingham | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 36 | on | 03/02/1922 | IMM | Immingham | on | 12/01/1923 | WFD | on | 24/05/1924 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 463 | on | 09/12/1921 | NEA | Neasden | on | 12/01/1923 | WFD | on | 19/07/1924 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 464 | on | 09/12/1921 | NEA | Neasden | on | 12/01/1923 | WFD | on | 05/09/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 37 | on | 03/02/1922 | IMM | Immingham | on | 26/01/1923 | WFD | on | 19/07/1924 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 38 | on | 28/07/1922 | IMM | Immingham | on | 28/01/1923 | WFD | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 452 | on | 30/11/1912 | NEA | Neasden (New) | on | 20/09/1924 | WFD | on | 23/09/1924 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5463 | on | 15/11/1924 | NEA | Neasden | on | 17/11/1924 | WFD | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 37 | on | 19/07/1924 | ANN | Annesley | on | 22/11/1924 | WFD | on | 28/10/1925 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6501 | on | 19/06/1925 | GOR | Gorton | on | 09/07/1925 | WFD | on | 24/09/1928 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6502 | on | 19/06/1925 | GOR | Gorton | on | 09/07/1925 | WFD | on | 03/02/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6506 | on | 02/07/1925 | GOR | Gorton | on | 10/07/1925 | WFD | on | 08/12/1926 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5342 | m/e | 06/1916 | NEA | Neasden (New) | on | 09/08/1925 | WFD | on | 11/05/1929 | MAR | March |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6499 | on | 22/10/1925 | GOR | Gorton | on | 04/11/1925 | WFD | on | 13/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6536 | on | 20/10/1925 | GOR | Gorton | on | 05/11/1925 | WFD | on | 07/05/1944 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6542 | on | 22/10/1925 | GOR | Gorton | on | 05/11/1925 | WFD | on | 18/12/1928 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6517 | on | 29/10/1925 | GOR | Gorton | on | 07/11/1925 | WFD | on | 03/09/1929 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6521 | on | 29/10/1925 | GOR | Gorton | on | 07/11/1925 | WFD | on | 04/02/1926 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6537 | on | 29/10/1925 | GOR | Gorton | on | 13/11/1925 | WFD | on | 25/09/1928 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6518 | on | 29/10/1925 | GOR | Gorton | on | 13/11/1925 | WFD | on | 10/10/1929 | KEA | Keadby |
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | 5196 | m/e | 01/1904 | IMM | Immingham (New) | on | 27/04/1926 | WFD | on | 31/03/1928 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | 5195 | on | 27/04/1923 | IMM | Immingham | on | 28/04/1926 | WFD | on | 03/03/1940 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 5184 | on | 08/10/1925 | IMM | Immingham | on | 06/08/1926 | WFD | on | 30/05/1929 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 5186 | on | 04/03/1924 | IMM | Immingham | on | 07/08/1926 | WFD | on | 31/03/1936 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5467 | on | 30/06/1926 | GOR | Gorton | on | 14/09/1926 | WFD | on | 14/01/1928 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6366 | on | 21/02/1927 | CLK | Colwick | on | 05/04/1927 | WFD | on | 25/10/1929 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6623 | on | 06/04/1927 | WFD | on | 13/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6278 | on | 03/03/1927 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 07/04/1927 | WFD | on | 14/09/1929 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6312 | on | 14/03/1927 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 07/04/1927 | WFD | on | 11/10/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 2165 | on | 07/06/1927 | WFD | on | 25/09/1928 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 2082 | on | 16/06/1927 | WFD | on | 24/09/1928 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6640 | on | 16/06/1927 | WFD | on | 07/05/1944 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 2162 | on | 18/08/1927 | WFD | on | 28/09/1928 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6553 | on | 14/11/1927 | WFD | on | 24/09/1928 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5481 | on | 28/10/1927 | NEA | Neasden | on | 14/01/1928 | WFD | on | 17/12/1929 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | B18 | 4-6-0 | 5196 | on | 31/03/1928 | NEA | Neasden | on | 23/04/1928 | WFD | on | 03/03/1940 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5445 | on | 20/05/1926 | GOR | Gorton | on | 08/06/1928 | WFD | on | 13/07/1928 | MAR | March |
Steam | B8 | 4-6-0 | 5280 | on | 02/04/1928 | CLK | Colwick | on | 08/06/1928 | WFD | on | 13/07/1928 | MAR | March |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 6068 | on | 26/07/1927 | DON | Doncaster | on | 14/07/1928 | WFD | on | 30/03/1936 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 6071 | on | 18/07/1925 | IMM | Immingham | on | 18/07/1928 | WFD | on | 24/07/1939 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5462 | on | 25/01/1927 | NEA | Neasden | on | 23/08/1928 | WFD | on | 14/09/1928 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6553 | on | 22/10/1928 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 16/11/1928 | WFD | on | 03/08/1943 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6626 | on | 01/10/1928 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 19/11/1928 | WFD | on | 13/10/1940 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6501 | on | 24/09/1928 | DON | Doncaster | on | 26/11/1928 | WFD | on | 03/09/1942 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6642 | on | 25/09/1928 | DON | Doncaster | on | 28/11/1928 | WFD | on | 20/02/1930 | IMM | Immingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6537 | on | 25/09/1928 | DON | Doncaster | on | 29/11/1928 | WFD | on | 27/09/1930 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6641 | on | 28/09/1928 | DON | Doncaster | on | 04/12/1928 | WFD | on | 19/06/1937 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5462 | on | 14/09/1928 | NEA | Neasden | on | 14/03/1929 | WFD | on | 11/10/1935 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5368 | on | 01/08/1926 | NEA | Neasden | on | 25/03/1929 | WFD | on | 29/06/1929 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5369 | on | 30/01/1925 | NEA | Neasden | on | 25/03/1929 | WFD | on | 29/06/1929 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5274 | on | 31/01/1925 | NEA | Neasden | on | 28/03/1929 | WFD | on | 29/06/1929 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5341 | m/e | 06/1916 | NEA | Neasden (New) | on | 28/03/1929 | WFD | on | 19/02/1931 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5333 | on | 24/07/1919 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 05/07/1929 | WFD | on | 13/01/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 5180 | on | 26/07/1927 | DON | Doncaster | on | 08/07/1929 | WFD | on | 30/07/1930 | ARD | Ardsley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5404 | on | 15/11/1919 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 08/07/1929 | WFD | on | 10/10/1929 | KEA | Keadby |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6247 | on | 24/02/1924 | IMM | Immingham | on | 17/10/1929 | WFD | on | 04/10/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5481 | on | 17/12/1929 | NEA | Neasden | on | 15/03/1930 | WFD | on | 07/03/1938 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6538 | on | 15/10/1925 | IMM | Immingham | on | 10/04/1930 | WFD | on | 27/09/1930 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 5185 | on | 15/08/1924 | LIN | Lincoln | on | 16/06/1930 | WFD | on | 24/07/1930 | ARD | Ardsley |
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | 5180 | on | 30/07/1930 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 21/08/1930 | WFD | on | 19/04/1943 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6570 | on | 05/11/1929 | NEA | Neasden | on | 13/02/1931 | WFD | on | 19/09/1941 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5404 | on | 01/11/1930 | IMM | Immingham | on | 04/03/1931 | WFD | on | 02/09/1942 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5406 | on | 21/07/1924 | DON | Doncaster | on | 05/03/1931 | WFD | on | 03/08/1943 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5342 | on | 11/05/1929 | MAR | March | on | 08/03/1931 | WFD | on | 17/03/1931 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5471 | on | 10/02/1932 | ANN | Annesley | on | 01/01/1935 | WFD | on | 08/01/1938 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5460 | on | 02/12/1921 | NEA | Neasden | on | 08/10/1935 | WFD | on | 05/09/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5461 | on | 12/09/1934 | NEA | Neasden | on | 10/10/1935 | WFD | on | 10/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5465 | on | 10/02/1926 | GOR | Gorton | on | 11/10/1935 | WFD | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5482 | on | 17/12/1925 | GOR | Gorton | on | 18/10/1935 | WFD | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5479 | on | 07/09/1935 | LIN | Lincoln | on | 07/02/1936 | WFD | on | 07/11/1942 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5078 | on | 20/10/1932 | GOR | Gorton | on | 20/02/1936 | WFD | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5484 | on | 30/06/1930 | GOR | Gorton | on | 21/01/1937 | WFD | on | 27/11/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5073 | on | 09/08/1931 | GOR | Gorton | on | 22/01/1937 | WFD | on | 24/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5072 | on | 09/05/1929 | GOR | Gorton | on | 05/03/1937 | WFD | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 5449 | on | 22/04/1924 | NEA | Neasden | on | 03/10/1938 | WFD | on | 03/12/1938 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 5165 | on | 21/04/1924 | NEA | Neasden | on | 04/10/1938 | WFD | on | 17/08/1939 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 5449 | on | 03/12/1938 | NEA | Neasden | on | 25/06/1939 | WFD | on | 31/07/1939 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | 6169 | on | 11/12/1935 | IMM | Immingham | on | 21/07/1939 | WFD | on | 12/07/1942 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | 6164 | on | 13/04/1935 | IMM | Immingham | on | 24/07/1939 | WFD | on | 03/04/1942 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | 6165 | on | 28/11/1938 | IMM | Immingham | on | 25/07/1939 | WFD | on | 25/03/1942 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 5169 | on | 27/05/1911 | NEA | Neasden (New) | on | 06/12/1939 | WFD | on | 30/12/1939 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 5450 | on | 18/07/1927 | NEA | Neasden | on | 06/12/1939 | WFD | on | 30/12/1939 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5036 | on | 05/12/1939 | NEA | Neasden | on | 24/12/1939 | WFD | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5276 | on | 18/01/1941 | NEA | Neasden | on | 02/02/1941 | WFD | on | 27/09/1941 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5336 | on | 26/10/1939 | NEA | Neasden | on | 02/02/1941 | WFD | on | 27/09/1941 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5340 | on | 15/01/1938 | NEA | Neasden | on | 02/02/1941 | WFD | on | 27/09/1941 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5341 | on | 18/11/1939 | NEA | Neasden | on | 02/02/1941 | WFD | on | 27/09/1941 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5342 | on | 17/03/1931 | NEA | Neasden | on | 02/02/1941 | WFD | on | 27/09/1941 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5344 | on | 29/12/1935 | NEA | Neasden | on | 02/02/1941 | WFD | on | 27/09/1941 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5466 | on | 30/03/1929 | NEA | Neasden | on | 09/02/1941 | WFD | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5468 | on | 09/10/1935 | NEA | Neasden | on | 09/02/1941 | WFD | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5459 | on | 18/07/1929 | NEA | Neasden | on | 27/09/1941 | WFD | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5474 | on | 16/06/1927 | NEA | Neasden | on | 27/09/1941 | WFD | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6205 | on | 23/11/1940 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 18/07/1942 | WFD | on | 03/08/1943 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5391 | on | 24/11/1940 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 18/07/1942 | WFD | on | 03/09/1942 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B3 | 4-6-0 | 6164 | on | 03/04/1942 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 19/07/1942 | WFD | on | 21/11/1942 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6621 | on | 25/11/1940 | IMM | Immingham | on | 20/07/1942 | WFD | on | 03/02/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6639 | on | 22/11/1940 | IMM | Immingham | on | 20/07/1942 | WFD | on | 03/04/1944 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6629 | on | 22/11/1940 | IMM | Immingham | on | 21/07/1942 | WFD | on | 03/04/1944 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6258 | on | 23/11/1940 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 23/07/1942 | WFD | on | 07/05/1944 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6573 | on | 28/11/1940 | CLK | Colwick | on | 23/07/1942 | WFD | on | 03/08/1943 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6586 | on | 22/11/1940 | CLK | Colwick | on | 24/07/1942 | WFD | on | 04/09/1942 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6540 | on | 23/11/1940 | CLK | Colwick | on | 30/07/1942 | WFD | on | 03/02/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5343 | on | 09/02/1929 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 04/08/1942 | WFD | on | 22/01/1943 | 13D | Shoeburyness |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5344 | on | 27/09/1941 | NEA | Neasden | on | 04/08/1942 | WFD | on | 31/01/1943 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5275 | on | 27/04/1940 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 05/08/1942 | WFD | on | 31/01/1943 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5274 | on | 29/06/1929 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 06/08/1942 | WFD | on | 19/01/1943 | 13D | Shoeburyness |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6209 | on | 24/11/1940 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 06/08/1942 | WFD | on | 07/05/1944 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5367 | on | 29/10/1937 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 07/08/1942 | WFD | on | 21/06/1943 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5458 | on | 01/04/1926 | GOR | Gorton | on | 02/11/1942 | WFD | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6524 | on | 21/11/1940 | LNG | Langwith Junction | on | 12/01/1943 | WFD | on | 25/01/1943 | THJ | Thornton Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6633 | on | 23/11/1940 | IMM | Immingham | on | 12/01/1943 | WFD | on | 25/01/1943 | THJ | Thornton Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6562 | on | 23/11/1940 | IMM | Immingham | on | 21/01/1943 | WFD | on | 10/03/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6231 | on | 23/11/1940 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 28/01/1943 | WFD | on | 10/03/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6275 | on | 23/11/1940 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 28/01/1943 | WFD | on | 21/03/1943 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6566 | on | 21/11/1940 | DON | Doncaster | on | 29/01/1943 | WFD | on | 20/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6365 | on | 22/11/1940 | GOR | Gorton | on | 30/01/1943 | WFD | on | 10/02/1943 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6265 | on | 23/11/1940 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 30/01/1943 | WFD | on | 08/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6321 | on | 25/11/1940 | ANN | Annesley | on | 31/01/1943 | WFD | on | 10/03/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6336 | on | 24/11/1940 | CLK | Colwick | on | 01/02/1943 | WFD | on | 21/03/1943 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6220 | on | 24/11/1940 | ANN | Annesley | on | 03/02/1943 | WFD | on | 10/02/1943 | DFU | Dunfermline Upper |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6245 | on | 23/11/1940 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 03/02/1943 | WFD | on | 10/03/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6350 | on | 22/11/1940 | GOR | Gorton | on | 03/02/1943 | WFD | on | 21/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6594 | on | 24/11/1940 | DON | Doncaster | on | 04/02/1943 | WFD | on | 10/03/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6595 | on | 23/11/1940 | DON | Doncaster | on | 04/02/1943 | WFD | on | 10/03/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5344 | on | 31/01/1943 | NEA | Neasden | on | 15/02/1943 | WFD | on | 21/06/1943 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 5337 | on | 10/03/1923 | IMM | Immingham | on | 18/02/1943 | WFD | on | 21/06/1943 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5467 | on | 16/07/1929 | IMM | Immingham | on | 03/05/1943 | WFD | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5034 | on | 17/03/1939 | IMM | Immingham | on | 03/05/1943 | WFD | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5035 | on | 01/11/1942 | IMM | Immingham | on | 03/05/1943 | WFD | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5477 | on | 09/08/1942 | IMM | Immingham | on | 03/05/1943 | WFD | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5478 | on | 19/07/1929 | IMM | Immingham | on | 03/05/1943 | WFD | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5473 | on | 01/11/1942 | IMM | Immingham | on | 29/05/1943 | WFD | on | 30/10/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5458 | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | Annesley | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | on | 05/07/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5467 | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | Annesley | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | on | 05/07/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5034 | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | Annesley | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | on | 05/07/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5035 | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | Annesley | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | on | 05/07/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5477 | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | Annesley | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | on | 05/07/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5478 | on | 24/05/1943 | ANN | Annesley | on | 21/06/1943 | WFD | on | 05/07/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6495 | on | 25/01/1933 | ANN | Annesley | on | 07/05/1944 | WFD | on | 14/03/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6358 | on | 01/01/1935 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 07/05/1944 | WFD | on | 07/04/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6496 | on | 26/01/1933 | ANN | Annesley | on | 07/05/1944 | WFD | on | 07/04/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6641 | on | 19/06/1937 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 07/05/1944 | WFD | on | 07/04/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5391 | on | 23/01/1944 | DON | Doncaster | on | 10/08/1944 | WFD | on | 03/02/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6364 | on | 29/08/1943 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 10/08/1944 | WFD | on | 07/04/1946 | FRO | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6357 | on | 01/01/1935 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 10/08/1944 | WFD | on | 07/04/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6308 | on | 12/02/1944 | DON | Doncaster | on | 10/08/1944 | WFD | on | 03/02/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5355 | on | 14/12/1937 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 11/08/1944 | WFD | on | 03/02/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5381 | on | 06/09/1927 | ANN | Annesley | on | 11/08/1944 | WFD | on | 28/04/1946 | FRO | Frodingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6589 | on | 29/07/1938 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | on | 11/08/1944 | WFD | on | 03/02/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6299 | on | 14/03/1929 | ANN | Annesley | on | 11/08/1944 | WFD | on | 06/01/1946 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6276 | on | 06/02/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 06/09/1944 | WFD | on | 03/02/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5155 | on | 30/01/1924 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 07/09/1944 | WFD | on | 03/02/1946 | DON | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6347 | on | 12/04/1924 | DON | Doncaster | on | 07/09/1944 | WFD | on | 06/01/1946 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6338 | on | 23/01/1944 | DON | Doncaster | on | 07/09/1944 | WFD | on | 07/04/1946 | LNG | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6521 | on | 23/01/1944 | DON | Doncaster | on | 07/09/1944 | WFD | on | 03/02/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6635 | on | 21/11/1942 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 07/09/1944 | WFD | on | 04/08/1946 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6200 | on | 12/05/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 18/08/1946 | WFD | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3752 | on | 25/11/1945 | GOR | Gorton | on | 18/08/1946 | WFD | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6351 | on | 12/05/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 18/08/1946 | WFD | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 6555 | on | 08/07/1945 | GOR | Gorton | on | 18/08/1946 | WFD | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 6374 | on | 23/09/1945 | GOR | Gorton | on | 18/08/1946 | WFD | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3706 | on | 12/05/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 18/08/1946 | WFD | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6304 | on | 12/05/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 18/08/1946 | WFD | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3868 | on | 04/12/1931 | GOR | Gorton | on | 18/08/1946 | WFD | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3887 | on | 12/05/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 18/08/1946 | WFD | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 3890 | on | 14/07/1946 | GOR | Gorton | on | 18/08/1946 | WFD | on | 20/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 70844 | on | 04/01/1946 | WD | on | 26/10/1946 | WFD | on | 01/02/1958 | 91E | To Eastern Region | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1078 | on | 23/09/1946 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 02/03/1947 | WFD | on | 19/06/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1085 | on | 11/10/1946 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 02/03/1947 | WFD | on | 09/03/1947 | NEA | Neasden |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1063 | on | 10/08/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall (New) | on | 27/04/1947 | WFD | on | 19/06/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1066 | on | 19/08/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall (New) | on | 27/04/1947 | WFD | on | 19/06/1949 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1087 | on | 16/10/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall (New) | on | 27/04/1947 | WFD | on | 14/11/1948 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1088 | on | 18/10/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall (New) | on | 27/04/1947 | WFD | on | 13/03/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1108 | on | 16/12/1946 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall (New) | on | 08/05/1947 | WFD | on | 13/03/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1131 | on | 25/02/1947 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 04/06/1947 | WFD | on | 19/06/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1141 | on | 23/04/1947 | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | on | 16/06/1947 | WFD | on | 14/11/1948 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3761 | on | 07/05/1944 | ANN | Annesley | on | 29/06/1947 | WFD | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3735 | on | 01/04/1945 | ANN | Annesley | on | 29/06/1947 | WFD | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3694 | on | 21/02/1929 | ANN | Annesley | on | 29/06/1947 | WFD | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3853 | on | 03/12/1944 | ANN | Annesley | on | 29/06/1947 | WFD | on | 12/10/1947 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 9069 | on | 20/01/1941 | NEA | Neasden | on | 14/08/1947 | WFD | on | 07/07/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | 9050 | on | 30/04/1947 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 17/08/1947 | WFD | on | 12/03/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 8891 | m/e | 02/1914 | ARD | Ardsley (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | WFD | w/e | 25/06/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 8894 | m/e | 02/1914 | ARD | Ardsley (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | WFD | w/e | 25/06/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 8920 | m/e | 10/1922 | ARD | Ardsley (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | WFD | w/e | 25/06/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1829 | on | 01/01/1948 | WFD | m/e | 07/1949 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1839 | on | 01/01/1948 | WFD | w/e | 25/06/1949 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1870 | on | 01/01/1948 | WFD | m/e | 07/1949 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1908 | m/e | 11/1935 | MAR | March | on | 01/01/1948 | WFD | m/e | 07/1949 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1913 | on | 01/01/1948 | WFD | m/e | 07/1949 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1943 | on | 01/01/1948 | WFD | w/e | 18/09/1948 | ANN | Annesley | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1956 | m/e | 11/1935 | GOR | Gorton | on | 01/01/1948 | WFD | m/e | 07/1949 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9269 | on | 01/01/1948 | WFD | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9310 | on | 01/01/1948 | WFD | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9312 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 08/05/1948 | WFD | w/e | 09/04/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9324 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 08/05/1948 | WFD | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60817 | on | 28/11/1943 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 07/11/1948 | WFD | w/e | 13/11/1948 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60818 | on | 28/11/1943 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 07/11/1948 | WFD | w/e | 13/11/1948 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60820 | on | 28/11/1943 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 11/11/1948 | WFD | w/e | 13/11/1948 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60817 | on | 07/11/1948 | WFD | Woodford Halse | w/e | 13/11/1948 | WFD | on | 05/05/1957 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60818 | on | 07/11/1948 | WFD | Woodford Halse | w/e | 13/11/1948 | WFD | on | 28/01/1951 | 34A | Kings Cross |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60820 | on | 11/11/1948 | WFD | Woodford Halse | w/e | 13/11/1948 | WFD | on | 28/01/1951 | 35A | New England |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 853 | on | 22/01/1945 | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | on | 16/12/1948 | WFD | w/e | 18/12/1948 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 853 | on | 16/12/1948 | WFD | Woodford Halse | w/e | 18/12/1948 | WFD | on | 02/09/1951 | 35A | New England |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61088 | w/e | 19/03/1949 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 03/04/1949 | WFD | w/e | 09/04/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61088 | on | 03/04/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | w/e | 09/04/1949 | WFD | on | 19/06/1949 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60830 | on | 11/03/1944 | DON | Doncaster | on | 19/06/1949 | WFD | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60831 | on | 30/09/1938 | DON | Doncaster | on | 19/06/1949 | WFD | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60832 | on | 28/05/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 19/06/1949 | WFD | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 61650 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 61651 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 1664 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 1669 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | ANN | Annesley | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9263 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69360 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60830 | on | 19/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | on | 24/06/1951 | 35A | New England |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60831 | on | 19/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | on | 15/03/1953 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60832 | on | 19/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | on | 11/02/1951 | 35A | New England |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60826 | on | 05/06/1947 | DON | Doncaster | on | 26/06/1949 | WFD | w/e | 02/07/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77042 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | w/e | 23/07/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77047 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | w/e | 23/07/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77372 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | CLK | Colwick | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | w/e | 23/07/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78514 | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | w/e | 23/07/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 61650 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 61651 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 1664 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 30A | Stratford |
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 1669 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | w/e | 09/04/1950 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9263 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69360 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60826 | on | 26/06/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | w/e | 02/07/1949 | WFD | on | 05/03/1951 | 35A | New England |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77042 | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | w/e | 23/07/1949 | WFD | w/e | 22/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77047 | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | w/e | 23/07/1949 | WFD | w/e | 28/01/1950 | CLK | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77372 | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | w/e | 23/07/1949 | WFD | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78514 | m/e | 07/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | w/e | 23/07/1949 | WFD | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16A | Toton |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69286 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | ANN | Annesley | m/e | 30/11/1949 | WFD | w/e | 10/12/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64375 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 03/12/1949 | WFD | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 34E | Neasden |
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 69286 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | WFD | Woodford Halse | w/e | 10/12/1949 | WFD | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 61647 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIN | Lincoln | w/e | 07/01/1950 | WFD | w/e | 09/04/1950 | 32B | Ipswich |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77209 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | WFD | w/e | 28/01/1950 | CLK | Colwick | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 69560 | on | 01/01/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 38E | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 34C | Hatfield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77209 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 38E | on | 22/10/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77261 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 38E | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16A | Toton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60815 | on | 11/11/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 09/04/1950 | 38E | on | 10/06/1951 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60845 | on | 22/04/1947 | DON | Doncaster | on | 09/04/1950 | 38E | on | 02/09/1951 | 35A | New England |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64798 | on | 12/11/1947 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 16/04/1950 | 38E | on | 08/10/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64838 | on | 20/04/1947 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 16/04/1950 | 38E | on | 08/10/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90051 | on | 25/06/1950 | 38E | on | 22/10/1950 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90638 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 25/06/1950 | 38E | on | 22/10/1950 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60871 | on | 11/09/1939 | NWE | New England | on | 28/01/1951 | 38E | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60915 | on | 12/11/1944 | KX | Kings Cross | on | 28/01/1951 | 38E | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64313 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 38E | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64394 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 38E | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60871 | on | 28/01/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 38E | on | 10/08/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60915 | on | 28/01/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 38E | on | 25/07/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60859 | on | 24/12/1944 | NWE | New England | on | 11/02/1951 | 38E | on | 03/01/1954 | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64225 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 38E | on | 08/07/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64235 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 38E | on | 03/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64238 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 38E | on | 01/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64249 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 38E | on | 27/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64257 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 38E | on | 06/06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 64273 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 38E | on | 19/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60863 | on | 24/10/1946 | NWE | New England | on | 04/03/1951 | 38E | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90638 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 38A | Colwick | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 38E | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90648 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 38E | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90638 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 38E | w/e | 22/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90648 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 38E | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60863 | on | 04/03/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 38E | on | 17/05/1953 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90672 | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 38E | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16D | Nottingham |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61368 | on | 05/05/1950 | 38A | Colwick | on | 20/05/1951 | 38E | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61368 | on | 20/05/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 38E | on | 29/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61367 | on | 28/04/1950 | 38A | Colwick (New) | on | 27/05/1951 | 38E | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61367 | on | 27/05/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 38E | on | 30/12/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90574 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 38E | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90448 | w/e | 14/05/1949 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 38E | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90484 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 38E | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60890 | on | 22/09/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 10/06/1951 | 38E | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60890 | on | 10/06/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 38E | on | 15/03/1953 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90574 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 38E | w/e | 15/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90448 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 38E | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 16A | Toton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90484 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 38E | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 31B | March |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60879 | on | 06/08/1940 | NWE | New England (New) | on | 24/06/1951 | 38E | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60879 | on | 24/06/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 38E | on | 16/06/1957 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60878 | on | 12/07/1940 | NWE | New England (New) | on | 02/09/1951 | 38E | on | 28/02/1954 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60966 | on | 29/01/1950 | NWE | New England | on | 02/09/1951 | 38E | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60876 | on | 30/05/1940 | NWE | New England (New) | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 38E | on | 30/08/1953 | 37A | Ardsley |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60966 | on | 02/09/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 38E | on | 08/02/1953 | 35A | New England |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90532 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 38E | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90043 | w/e | 14/05/1949 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 38E | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90411 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 38A | Colwick | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 38E | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90697 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 38E | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61110 | on | 22/01/1950 | CLK | Colwick | on | 30/09/1951 | 38E | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61376 | on | 12/04/1951 | 38A | Colwick (New) | on | 30/09/1951 | 38E | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90187 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 38A | Colwick | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 38E | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61110 | on | 30/09/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 38E | on | 25/11/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61376 | on | 30/09/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 38E | on | 30/12/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90532 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 38E | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90187 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 38E | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90043 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 38E | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90411 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 38E | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90697 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 38E | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16A | Toton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90499 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 38E | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 38A | Colwick | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61381 | on | 07/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick (New) | on | 25/11/1951 | 38E | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61381 | on | 25/11/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 38E | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61381 | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 38E | on | 28/02/1954 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64433 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 38E | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 67408 | on | 01/01/1948 | GOR | Gorton | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 38E | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64428 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 38E | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 67408 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 38E | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64428 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 38E | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61078 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 11/05/1952 | 38E | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61078 | on | 11/05/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38E | on | 06/07/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90369 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 38E | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90369 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 38E | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64331 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 38E | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61111 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | CLK | Colwick | on | 07/09/1952 | 38E | on | 14/09/1952 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61078 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 14/09/1952 | 38E | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60871 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 14/09/1952 | 38E | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64331 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 38E | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61078 | on | 14/09/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 38E | on | 08/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60871 | on | 14/09/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 38E | on | 09/10/1955 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90007 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 38E | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90263 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 38E | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90263 | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 38E | Woodford Halse | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 38E | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90486 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 38E | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 16D | Nottingham |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60820 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 35A | New England | on | 08/02/1953 | 38E | on | 17/05/1953 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 69621 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 38E | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60890 | on | 15/03/1953 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 26/04/1953 | 38E | on | 15/08/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60800 | on | 13/06/1936 | KX | Kings Cross (New) | on | 17/05/1953 | 38E | on | 28/06/1953 | 34A | Kings Cross |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64418 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 38E | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60831 | on | 17/05/1953 | 34A | Kings Cross | on | 28/06/1953 | 38E | on | 01/09/1957 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13065 | on | 24/10/1953 (New) | 38E | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 30A | Stratford | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13066 | on | 24/10/1953 (New) | 38E | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1H | Northampton | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90474 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | IMM | Immingham | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 38E | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13067 | on | 21/11/1953 (New) | 38E | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13068 | on | 21/11/1953 (New) | 38E | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13069 | on | 21/11/1953 (New) | 38E | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61192 | on | 27/05/1953 | 38A | Colwick | on | 27/06/1954 | 38E | on | 24/09/1960 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61283 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 38A | Colwick | on | 07/11/1954 | 38E | on | 20/02/1955 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61381 | on | 28/02/1954 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 07/11/1954 | 38E | on | 20/02/1955 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61111 | on | 28/01/1953 | 38A | Colwick | on | 09/01/1955 | 38E | on | 06/02/1955 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90299 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 38E | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 16A | Toton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90403 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 38E | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67789 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 34E | Neasden | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 38E | w/e | 13/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76035 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 38E | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64300 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 38E | on | 16/09/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64431 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 38E | on | 24/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60815 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 36A | Doncaster | on | 09/10/1955 | 38E | on | 17/11/1957 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90208 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 38E | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 31B | March |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90433 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 38E | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16A | Toton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90491 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | CLK | Colwick | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 38E | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 31B | March |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43063 | on | 10/11/1950 | 35A | New England (New) | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 38E | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43106 | on | 10/04/1951 | 31D | South Lynn (New) | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 38E | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61841 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 31B | March | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 38E | w/e | 31/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61842 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 31B | March | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 38E | on | 21/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61843 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 31B | March | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 38E | w/e | 03/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61853 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 31B | March | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 38E | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61866 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAR | March | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 38E | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90346 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 38E | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16A | Toton |
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 64438 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 38E | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 38A | Colwick |
Diesel | D3/14 | 0-6-0 | 15004 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 31B | March | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 38E | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 35A | New England |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67771 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 38A | Colwick | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 38E | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90066 | on | 29/01/1956 | 38A | Colwick | on | 10/02/1957 | 38E | w/e | 25/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61271 | on | 20/09/1953 | 38A | Colwick | on | 16/06/1957 | 38E | on | 30/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61804 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38A | Colwick | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 38E | w/e | 31/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61838 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38A | Colwick | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 38E | on | 21/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61186 | on | 15/02/1953 | 38A | Colwick | on | 01/09/1957 | 38E | on | 05/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 60815 | on | 17/11/1957 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 08/12/1957 | 38E | on | 25/07/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61966 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 39A | Gorton | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 38E | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61809 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 38E | w/e | 03/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61824 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 38A | Colwick | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 38E | on | 05/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90065 | on | 01/02/1958 | 91E | To Eastern Region | on | 23/02/1958 | 2G | w/e | 28/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67740 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2F | w/e | 08/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43330 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 2F | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43389 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 2F | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43394 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 2F | on | 09/07/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61882 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 2F | on | 28/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61028 | on | 12/02/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 02/07/1959 | 2F | on | 08/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61832 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | GOR | Gorton | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 2F | w/e | 03/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61913 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | GOR | Gorton | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 2F | w/e | 17/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90251 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 18B | Westhouses | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 2F | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 18B | Westhouses |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90701 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 18B | Westhouses | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 2F | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92013 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 2F | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 16D | Annesley |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90524 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 18B | Westhouses | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 2F | w/e | 25/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61187 | on | 26/12/1954 | 34E | Neasden | on | 03/10/1959 | 2F | on | 09/01/1960 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61106 | on | 08/12/1957 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 04/11/1959 | 2F | on | 02/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42335 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14C | St Albans | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 2F | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42336 | on | 23/10/1959 | 14C | St Albans | on | 07/11/1959 | 2F | on | 01/02/1960 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42349 | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 18C | Hasland | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 2F | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61085 | on | 01/06/1958 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 07/11/1959 | 2F | on | 06/10/1960 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12072 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 2F | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90563 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 18B | Westhouses | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 2F | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 16D | Nottingham |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42437 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2F | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42453 | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2F | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42456 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2F | on | 24/04/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3861 | on | 21/11/1959 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 2F | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 16D | Annesley |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61910 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 39A | Gorton | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 2F | w/e | 21/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67743 | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 2F | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61865 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 39A | Gorton | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 2F | m/e | 06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12072 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 2F | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64742 | on | 05/11/1943 | GOR | Gorton | on | 01/06/1960 | 2F | w/e | 21/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64747 | on | 28/08/1959 | 9G | Gorton | on | 01/06/1960 | 2F | w/e | 10/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64809 | on | 27/10/1957 | 39A | Gorton | on | 01/06/1960 | 2F | w/e | 27/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61851 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 12C | Carlisle Canal | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2F | w/e | 25/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3059 | on | 11/09/1954 | 15A | Wellingborough (New) | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 2F | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3059 | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 27/05/1961 | 2F | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67781 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 2F | w/e | 13/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61011 | on | 17/07/1960 | 9G | Gorton | on | 05/08/1961 | 2F | on | 13/01/1962 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45223 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 16D | Annesley | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 2F | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3056 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 2F | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61192 | on | 24/09/1960 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 12/03/1962 | 2F | on | 08/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61116 | on | 24/09/1960 | 14D | Neasden | on | 15/03/1962 | 2F | on | 10/03/1963 | 65A | Eastfield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61136 | on | 16/11/1959 | 14D | Neasden | on | 15/03/1962 | 2F | on | 22/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3059 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 2F | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61063 | on | 30/09/1960 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 17/03/1962 | 2F | on | 26/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61187 | on | 13/11/1961 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 17/03/1962 | 2F | on | 03/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61206 | on | 13/11/1961 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 17/03/1962 | 2F | on | 03/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61380 | on | 25/01/1953 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 17/03/1962 | 2F | on | 26/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67710 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 2F | w/e | 13/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 67733 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 2F | w/e | 13/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64955 | on | 25/11/1960 | 9G | Gorton | on | 05/04/1962 | 2F | w/e | 21/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73010 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 2F | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73032 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 2F | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73045 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 2F | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73053 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 2F | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76044 | m/e | 08/1954 | 34E | Neasden (New) | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 2F | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42250 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 34E | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 2F | on | 12/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42251 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 34E | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 2F | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42252 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 34E | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 2F | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42253 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 34E | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 2F | on | 22/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42281 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 2F | w/e | 27/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42157 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 2F | on | 20/07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42178 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 2F | on | 29/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76052 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2F | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42568 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 17C | Rowsley | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 2F | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 17C | Rowsley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42291 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 17C | Rowsley | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 2F | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 17C | Rowsley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61008 | on | 26/09/1959 | 26B | Agecroft | on | 21/07/1962 | 2F | on | 16/03/1963 | 65A | Eastfield |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61269 | on | 03/10/1959 | 26B | Agecroft | on | 21/07/1962 | 2F | on | 19/11/1962 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61369 | on | 03/10/1959 | 26B | Agecroft | on | 21/07/1962 | 2F | on | 17/11/1962 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64727 | on | 08/11/1958 | 9G | Gorton | on | 30/07/1962 | 2F | w/e | 27/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64875 | on | 08/11/1958 | 9G | Gorton | on | 30/07/1962 | 2F | w/e | 20/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61039 | on | 11/09/1960 | 50A | York (North) | on | 06/08/1962 | 2F | on | 10/11/1962 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73000 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 2F | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76087 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 2F | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44688 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 2F | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 17B | Burton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44691 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 14E | Bedford | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 2F | w/e | 10/08/1963 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44846 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 2F | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 16D | Annesley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45238 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 14E | Bedford | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 2F | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45285 | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 2F | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45335 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 2F | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45342 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 2F | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44667 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 2F | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45262 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 2F | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3058 | on | 11/09/1954 | 15A | Wellingborough (New) | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 2F | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73066 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 2F | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73159 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 2F | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48650 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2F | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90589 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2F | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90669 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 2F | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48385 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 2F | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 1H | Northampton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48386 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 2F | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48121 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 2F | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90570 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 2F | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48387 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 2F | w/e | 23/01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73069 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 2F | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48002 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | Annesley | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 2F | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48007 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 16D | Annesley | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 2F | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48010 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 2F | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73156 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 2F | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3058 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 2F | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44777 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 2F | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45116 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 2F | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45279 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 2F | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45444 | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 2F | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48336 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 15B | Kettering | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 2F | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48611 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 15B | Kettering | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 2F | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48005 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 17C | Rowsley | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 2F | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48081 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 17C | Rowsley | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 2F | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48027 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 2F | w/e | 20/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48061 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 15A | Wellingborough | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 2F | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 2F | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48088 | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 17C | Rowsley | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 2F | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48654 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 17D | Rowsley | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 2F | w/e | 26/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48727 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 16D | Annesley | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 2F | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73053 | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 14E | Bedford | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 2F | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 6D | Shrewsbury |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73071 | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 14E | Bedford | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 2F | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48011 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 16D | Annesley | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 2F | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48527 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 03/08/1963 | 2F | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48517 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 10/08/1963 | 2F | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42082 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 10/08/1963 | 2F | on | 19/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48600 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 1G | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73011 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1G | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73073 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1G | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73157 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 1G | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 2B | Oxley |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90237 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16A | Toton | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90563 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 16D | Nottingham | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90570 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90589 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90218 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16A | Toton | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90346 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16A | Toton | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90040 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16D | Nottingham | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90299 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 16A | Toton | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90433 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16A | Toton | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90365 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16A | Toton | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90448 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 16A | Toton | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90486 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 16D | Nottingham | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90669 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90672 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16D | Nottingham | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90697 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16A | Toton | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90516 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16A | Toton | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90520 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16A | Toton | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42103 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 1G | on | 22/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44762 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1G | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44763 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1G | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44764 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1G | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44814 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1F | Rugby | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1G | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45027 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 2J | Aston | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 1G | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48757 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 1G | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 1E | Bletchley |
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | D4111 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 1G | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 1F | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48035 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 1G | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 2F | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48506 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 1H | Northampton | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 1G | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |