Depot: Birkenhead Mollington Street
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Birkenhead Mollington Street | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13275 | by | 12/1934 | 7C | Holyhead | w/e | 01/06/1935 | BHD | w/e | 11/07/1936 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2976 | w/e | 25/05/1935 | 7C | Holyhead | w/e | 01/06/1935 | BHD | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13277 | w/e | 25/05/1935 | 7C | Holyhead | w/e | 01/06/1935 | BHD | w/e | 01/04/1936 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13278 | w/e | 25/05/1935 | 7C | Holyhead | w/e | 01/06/1935 | BHD | w/e | 26/11/1938 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2745 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | BHD | on | 15/06/1947 | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 22954 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 6C | on | 28/01/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6727 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 6C | on | 01/01/1948 | 7D | Rhyl | ||||
Steam | 19" Goods | 4-6-0 | 8844 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 6C | m/e | 06/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 13254 | w/e | 13/07/1935 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 28/12/1935 | BHD | w/e | 20/04/1940 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 5117 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | BHD | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4312 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | BHD | m/e | 03/1938 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6337 | on | 01/01/1934 | 44 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | BHD | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West | |
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1816 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 6C | ||||||||
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 27681 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 6C | on | 02/10/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6645 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 6C | m/e | 10/1946 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12100 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 6C | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12340 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 6C | ||||||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12423 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 6C | ||||||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6650 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 6C | m/e | 07/1947 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2970 | w/e | 15/06/1935 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 09/05/1936 | BHD | w/e | 09/10/1936 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2982 | w/e | 11/07/1936 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 02/01/1937 | BHD | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2965 | w/e | 26/09/1936 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 27/03/1937 | BHD | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2967 | w/e | 26/09/1936 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 27/03/1937 | BHD | w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2964 | w/e | 27/03/1937 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 05/06/1937 | BHD | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2968 | w/e | 21/11/1936 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 12/06/1937 | BHD | w/e | 26/11/1938 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2970 | w/e | 09/10/1936 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 19/06/1937 | BHD | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2975 | w/e | 11/07/1936 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 03/07/1937 | BHD | w/e | 26/11/1938 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2951 | w/e | 20/06/1936 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 25/09/1937 | BHD | w/e | 20/04/1940 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2976 | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 25/09/1937 | BHD | w/e | 12/10/1940 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2956 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 13/11/1937 | BHD | w/e | 19/09/1942 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2960 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 13/11/1937 | BHD | w/e | 12/06/1942 | 2D | Nuneaton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2974 | w/e | 13/11/1937 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 05/03/1938 | BHD | w/e | 10/05/1941 | 2D | Nuneaton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2979 | w/e | 13/11/1937 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 05/03/1938 | BHD | w/e | 12/10/1940 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2971 | w/e | 25/09/1937 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 25/11/1939 | BHD | w/e | 12/10/1946 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2969 | w/e | 27/03/1937 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 17/02/1940 | BHD | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2970 | w/e | 02/10/1937 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 17/02/1940 | BHD | w/e | 04/07/1959 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2976 | w/e | 12/10/1940 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 22/02/1941 | BHD | w/e | 05/04/1941 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2951 | w/e | 11/10/1941 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 29/08/1942 | BHD | w/e | 03/10/1942 | 7B | Bangor |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5655 | 4w/e | 03/11/1945 | 18 | on | 15/06/1947 | RYR | Radyr | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2140 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 18 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2052 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | BHD | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2107 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | BHD | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9651 | on | 20/06/1946 (New) | BHD | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12457 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 6C | on | 01/01/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1917 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 03/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1949 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 04/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1968 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 09/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2004 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 01/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 2006 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 12/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2052 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 05/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2089 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 09/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2104 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 05/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2106 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 08/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2108 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 12/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2129 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 03/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 28xx | 2-8-0 | 2833 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | BAN | Banbury | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 30/04/1948 | OXY | Oxley |
Steam | 3150 | 2-6-2T | 3169 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 07/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3626 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3742 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4120 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 84H | Wellington | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4121 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | SRD | Stafford Road | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4122 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4123 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4124 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHR | Chester West | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4125 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 84E | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4126 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4127 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 84E | Tyseley | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4128 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 84K | Chester West | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4129 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4337 | on | 01/01/1934 | 114 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | SRD | Stafford Road | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4353 | on | 01/01/1934 | 114 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 11/1948 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4386 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | CHR | Chester West | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 04/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 5316 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | TYS | Tyseley | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 06/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8393 | on | 01/01/1934 | SR Fact | Stafford Road Factory | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6346 | on | 01/01/1934 | 114 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6350 | on | 01/01/1934 | 54 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 6376 | on | 01/01/1934 | 44 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 6E | Chester West | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6404 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6405 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6819 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 84C | Banbury | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6878 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7714 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | m/e | 01/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8725 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9651 | on | 20/06/1946 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street (New) | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2953 | w/e | 24/07/1943 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 28/06/1947 | BHD | w/e | 20/09/1952 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11313 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11441 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12225 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12232 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12270 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12465 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 7160 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 6F | Bidston | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 7164 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 6F | Bidston | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 7166 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 6F | Bidston | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7324 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | w/e | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7389 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7450 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7472 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 7C | Holyhead | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7507 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 6K | Rhyl | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7530 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7672 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 6F | Bidston | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7674 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 7C | Holyhead | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1714 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | on | 15/05/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1734 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1780 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | m/e | 02/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 1818 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | on | 26/06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | 1853 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | w/e | 16/10/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9339 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9094 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 2F | Coventry | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9101 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9172 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9244 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2A | Rugby | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9246 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 2E | Warwick | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9256 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9258 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 101 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 6K | Rhyl | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 102 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 104 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 2B | Nuneaton | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 110 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 121 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | on | 21/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 129 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 3E | Monument Lane | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 131 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | on | 21/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 132 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 136 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 11A | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9072 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 6C | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9220 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 6C | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52208 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 6C | m/e | 10/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77040 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | m/e | 30/04/1948 | BHD | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77151 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | m/e | 30/04/1948 | BHD | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1417 | on | 15/06/1947 | OSY | Oswestry | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | BHD | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 85D | Kidderminster |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12432 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 6C | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 2981 | w/e | 29/03/1941 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 05/03/1949 | BHD | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6831 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | BHD | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6844 | on | 15/06/1947 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | BHD | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6859 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | BHD | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6860 | on | 15/06/1947 | TYS | Tyseley | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | BHD | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7627 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 6C | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7628 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 6C | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2156 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | BHD | m/e | 02/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5103 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | SRD | Stafford Road | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | BHD | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | CHR | Chester West |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49262 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 6C | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4124 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | BHD | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42961 | w/e | 30/09/1939 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 17/09/1949 | BHD | w/e | 24/04/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8106 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 6C | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48446 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 6C | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8448 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 6C | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8455 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 6C | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48491 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 6C | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48673 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 6C | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48061 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 6C | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 2D | Nuneaton | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48257 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 6C | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8477 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 6C | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52163 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 6C | m/e | 09/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2067 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | WLN | Wellington | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | BHD | m/e | 11/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8477 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 6C | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49081 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 6C | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49118 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 6C | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49229 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 6C | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 5C | Stafford |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40207 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 6C | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2152 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 6C | m/e | 11/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48247 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 6C | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6B | Mold Junction | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48344 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 6C | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48691 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 6C | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2092 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 6C | m/e | 08/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1621 | on | 21/06/1950 (New) | 6C | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 6841 | on | 15/06/1947 | BAN | Banbury | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 6C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 82B | St Philips Marsh |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48684 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | w/e | 15/07/1950 | 6C | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5176 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHR | Chester West | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 6C | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5176 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 6C | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42973 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 6C | w/e | 20/06/1953 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40209 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 6C | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48327 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 6C | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40209 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 6C | on | 28/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48327 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 6C | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77015 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 6C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77064 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 6C | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48719 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6C | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48726 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6C | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48718 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 6C | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48720 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 6C | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52233 | w/e | 15/07/1950 | 7D | Rhyl | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 6C | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52233 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 6C | w/e | 03/11/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48249 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 6C | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48249 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6C | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48718 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6C | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48719 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6C | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48720 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6C | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48726 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 6C | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3D | Aston |
Steam | 1901 | 0-6-0PT | 1964 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 6C | m/e | 02/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48764 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 6C | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48094 | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 6C | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42965 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 6C | w/e | 12/01/1952 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42977 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 6C | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49113 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 6C | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49434 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 11A | Carnforth | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 6C | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48017 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 6C | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40072 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 6C | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40144 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 6C | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 21B | Bournville |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2042 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | LLY | Llanelli | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6C | m/e | 04/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68013 | on | 01/01/1948 | IMM | Immingham | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6C | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68030 | on | 01/01/1948 | IMM | Immingham | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6C | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68034 | on | 01/01/1948 | IMM | Immingham | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 6C | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2085 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 6C | m/e | 08/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42964 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 09/02/1952 | 6C | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2099 | on | 15/06/1947 | HFD | Hereford | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6C | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42964 | w/e | 09/02/1952 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6C | w/e | 22/03/1952 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2082 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 87C | Danygraig | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 6C | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2099 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 6C | m/e | 06/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2082 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 6C | m/e | 06/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52525 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4A | Shrewsbury | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6C | w/e | 18/04/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42978 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 05/07/1952 | 6C | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42978 | w/e | 05/07/1952 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6C | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68714 | on | 01/01/1948 | BID | Bidston | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 6C | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2136 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6C | m/e | 04/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40132 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6H | Bangor | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6C | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2112 | on | 15/06/1947 | SLO | Slough | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6C | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40088 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6C | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40103 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6C | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40126 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6C | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40128 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6C | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2112 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 6C | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2112 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 6C | on | 13/09/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1457 | on | 15/06/1947 | CNYD | Croes Newydd | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 6C | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 85D | Kidderminster |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2043 | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6C | m/e | 01/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48479 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6C | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48510 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 8C | Speke Junction | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6C | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2107 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 84J | Croes Newydd | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6C | m/e | 06/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48154 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 6C | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 113 | 4-4-0 | 54471 | on | 01/01/1948 | 32A | Inverness | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 6C | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 60A | Inverness |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42964 | w/e | 22/03/1952 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 19/09/1953 | 6C | w/e | 30/10/1954 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2101 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6C | m/e | 03/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90173 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6C | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90227 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6C | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6B | Mold Junction | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90237 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6C | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90257 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 25D | Mirfield | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6C | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90667 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6C | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 47005 | on | 31/10/1953 (New) | 6C | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 10B | Preston | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 41753 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6C | w/e | 09/02/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 47006 | on | 28/11/1953 (New) | 6C | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 47007 | on | 28/11/1953 (New) | 6C | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48327 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 6C | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 47009 | on | 30/01/1954 (New) | 6C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2040 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 85A | Worcester | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 6C | m/e | 10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 47007 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 6C | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47622 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 6C | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40102 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6H | Bangor | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6C | on | 21/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2072 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6C | m/e | 07/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52270 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6C | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40135 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6C | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48106 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 6C | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47627 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6F | Bidston | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 6C | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2069 | on | 15/06/1947 | CARM | Carmarthen | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 6C | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | Wolverton Works | |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2160 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | HFD | Hereford | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 6C | m/e | 03/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42941 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 6C | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68559 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 6C | m/e | 04/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40101 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 6K | Rhyl | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6C | on | 21/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | 11116 | on | 31/12/1955 (New) | 6C | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 10A | Carnforth | ||||
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | 11117 | on | 17/01/1956 (New) | 6C | w/e | 25/05/1956 | 40B | Immingham | ||||
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | 11118 | on | 25/01/1956 (New) | 6C | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | 11119 | on | 31/01/1956 (New) | 6C | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 10A | Carnforth | ||||
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | 11120 | on | 22/02/1956 (New) | 6C | w/e | 07/01/1967 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90173 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 6C | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | 11144 | on | 27/03/1956 (New) | 6C | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | 11145 | on | 12/04/1956 (New) | 6C | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | 11146 | on | 30/04/1956 (New) | 6C | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48106 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 6C | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | 11147 | on | 31/05/1956 (New) | 6C | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41322 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 5A | Crewe North | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6C | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41323 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 6H | Bangor | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6C | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42303 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5D | Stoke | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6C | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | 11148 | on | 18/06/1956 (New) | 6C | on | 05/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84000 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6C | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84003 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6C | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42447 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 5E | Alsager | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6C | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42308 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6C | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90212 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6C | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42778 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6C | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42597 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6C | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42599 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6C | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42608 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6C | on | 22/08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42493 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6C | on | 02/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42120 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6C | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47627 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 6J | Holyhead | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 6C | w/e | 09/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80063 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 6C | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 63B | Stirling |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80086 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 6C | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48120 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 6C | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42888 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 6C | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90369 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 2E | Northampton | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6C | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90392 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 2E | Northampton | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6C | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48152 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 21A | Saltley | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6C | w/e | 25/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48257 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6C | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48349 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6C | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48767 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6C | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42979 | w/e | 31/10/1953 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6C | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42980 | w/e | 11/01/1941 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6C | w/e | 03/08/1957 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42787 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6C | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2069 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | Wolverton Works | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 6C | m/e | 04/1959 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47530 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 6C | w/e | 28/10/1961 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40202 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 6C | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40136 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 6C | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41324 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 6C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 47005 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 10B | Preston | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6C | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80062 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 6C | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 63B | Stirling |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48372 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6C | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48655 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6C | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44593 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6C | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40202 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6C | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48349 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 6C | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73032 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6C | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73039 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6C | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47160 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6C | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47164 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6C | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44917 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 71G | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6C | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45440 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 6C | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40157 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6C | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44917 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6C | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 11124 | w/e | 11/10/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 18/10/1958 | 6C | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47431 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6C | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41212 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 6C | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47338 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 2D | Coventry | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 6C | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47497 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 6C | w/e | 22/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47565 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 6C | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47674 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 6C | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47677 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 6C | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48260 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 6C | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42856 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 6C | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42894 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 6C | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80090 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 6C | 4w/e | 13/02/1960 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45440 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 28/03/1959 | 6C | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48046 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 9G | Northwich | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6C | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48206 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6C | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48348 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6C | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48408 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48441 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6C | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40076 | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6C | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40078 | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6C | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40116 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6E | Chester West | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6C | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47164 | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 6C | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42970 | w/e | 17/02/1940 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 04/07/1959 | BHD | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | D2508 | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 6C | on | 13/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42848 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 6C | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42441 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 6C | on | 11/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42602 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 6C | on | 26/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42779 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 3D | Aston | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 6C | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42970 | w/e | 04/07/1959 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 6C | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47372 | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 6C | w/e | 05/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41226 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 6C | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41322 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 6C | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80094 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 6C | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80095 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 6C | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90317 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6C | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90257 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6C | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42077 | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 74C | Dover Marine | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 6C | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42078 | 8w/e | 05/02/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 6C | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84001 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6D | Chester Northgate | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 6C | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42804 | 4w/e | 29/10/1955 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 6C | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42877 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 6C | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42973 | w/e | 20/06/1953 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6C | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42209 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30C | Ardrossan | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6C | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42210 | on | 01/01/1948 | 30C | Ardrossan | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 12C | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42211 | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 67A | Corkerhill | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6C | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42597 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 6C | on | 23/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40202 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 6C | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90606 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6C | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42981 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6C | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42454 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6C | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42459 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6C | on | 23/01/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42932 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 6C | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40107 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40122 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40137 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40157 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6C | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40201 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 6C | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42946 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 6C | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42814 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 6C | on | 21/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42858 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 6C | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42923 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42934 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42936 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 6C | on | 10/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47160 | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 6C | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42776 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 6C | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42944 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 6C | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48257 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 6C | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48423 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 6C | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42357 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 6C | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42542 | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 6C | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42583 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 6C | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42606 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 6C | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42658 | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 6C | w/e | 29/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47164 | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 6C | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90192 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 86G | Pontypool Road | on | 26/02/1961 | 6C | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 8D | Widnes |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2385 | on | 24/03/1961 (New) | 6C | w/e | 02/09/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2388 | on | 06/04/1961 (New) | 6C | w/e | 02/05/1970 | 16C | Derby | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47659 | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 6C | w/e | 24/02/1962 | Wolverton Works | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48262 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6C | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48292 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6C | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48476 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6C | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42958 | w/e | 20/09/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6C | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42968 | w/e | 03/05/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6C | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42877 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 6C | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | D2/12 | 0-6-0 | D2510 | on | 28/08/1961 (New) | 6C | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 1E | Bletchley | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2374 | on | 11/08/1961 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (New) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6C | on | 11/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2375 | on | 22/08/1961 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (New) | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6C | on | 11/05/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41226 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6K | Rhyl | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6C | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48697 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 6C | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5D | Stoke |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2376 | on | 07/09/1961 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (New) | w/e | 30/09/1961 | 6C | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 16C | Derby |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42950 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 6C | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42971 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 6C | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42797 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 6C | w/e | 10/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48648 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 6C | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90566 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 6C | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42772 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 6C | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42853 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 6C | on | 15/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47478 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | Wolverton Works | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 6C | w/e | 17/03/1962 | Wolverton Works | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47659 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | Wolverton Works | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 6C | w/e | 26/11/1966 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42747 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 6C | w/e | 02/03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42785 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 6C | on | 23/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42810 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 6C | on | 14/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90227 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 6C | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42923 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6C | on | 25/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90157 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 12H | Tebay | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42773 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | w/e | 24/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42786 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | w/e | 03/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42852 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | on | 25/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42854 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | on | 16/11/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42859 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | on | 31/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42870 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | w/e | 02/03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42885 | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | on | 07/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42935 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | w/e | 12/01/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42939 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6C | w/e | 23/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42351 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 6C | on | 25/08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42394 | 4w/e | 17/06/1961 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | on | 12/08/1962 | 6C | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Diesel | D2/7 | 0-6-0 | D2502 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 25/08/1962 | 6C | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42783 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 6C | on | 14/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48258 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 6C | w/e | 28/03/1964 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48312 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 6C | w/e | 13/02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48554 | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 6C | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48094 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 6C | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48326 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 6C | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48373 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 6C | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42943 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 6C | on | 09/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42944 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 6C | w/e | 27/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42892 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 6C | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48131 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 6C | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48290 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 6C | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48422 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 6C | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48154 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6C | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48446 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6C | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45567 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 6C | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42934 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 6C | on | 10/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42933 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 6C | w/e | 30/03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92045 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | w/e | 16/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92046 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | w/e | 21/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92047 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92165 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92166 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92167 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47160 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | w/e | 26/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47164 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 99H | Horwich Works |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47343 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | w/e | 05/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47495 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | w/e | 25/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47622 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47628 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 5F | Uttoxeter |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47674 | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 6F | Bidston | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 6C | w/e | 17/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48348 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 6C | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48435 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 6C | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42350 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 6C | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42566 | on | 12/08/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 6C | on | 22/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42952 | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6C | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42937 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6C | on | 22/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44126 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44208 | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44308 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44309 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | w/e | 20/07/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44395 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44593 | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 6C | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42782 | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 8H | on | 03/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42858 | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 8H | on | 25/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48085 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48646 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42950 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42951 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42970 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42978 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 8H | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 5E | Nuneaton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48629 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 8H | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 2E | Saltley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42075 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 6H | Bangor | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 8H | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42753 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 8H | on | 28/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42856 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 8H | on | 21/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42777 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8H | on | 14/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42586 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 8H | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48033 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 18B | Westhouses | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 8H | w/e | 24/06/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92057 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8H | w/e | 02/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92157 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8H | w/e | 19/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42730 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 8H | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42765 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 28B | Fleetwood | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 8H | on | 10/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47533 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 8H | w/e | 26/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42707 | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 8H | on | 19/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42827 | on | 01/01/1948 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 8H | on | 21/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42900 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 8H | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42586 | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 8H | on | 14/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47272 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 18C | Hasland | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 8H | w/e | 18/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47423 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18C | Hasland | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 8H | m/e | 07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47461 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 8H | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 16C | Derby |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42894 | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 8H | on | 05/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42086 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 8H | on | 01/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47447 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 8H | w/e | 17/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48611 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 2F | Woodford Halse | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | w/e | 05/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48623 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48647 | w/e | 28/03/1964 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48648 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48668 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48727 | w/e | 28/03/1964 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48771 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8H | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92085 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 8H | w/e | 24/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92107 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 8H | w/e | 25/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42705 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 8H | on | 26/12/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42848 | w/e | 20/10/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 8H | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42886 | w/e | 20/10/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 8H | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42924 | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 8H | on | 26/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2213 | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 8H | on | 17/08/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2218 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 8H | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2220 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 8H | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48479 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 8H | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42104 | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 8H | on | 02/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92020 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 8H | w/e | 21/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92084 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92089 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 8H | w/e | 18/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92111 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 8H | w/e | 28/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92127 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 8H | w/e | 19/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42121 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 8H | on | 09/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48062 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 8H | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48017 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 8E | Northwich | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48323 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48340 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 9G | Northwich | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48447 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48605 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 9G | Northwich | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48716 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 8E | Northwich | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 8H | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92100 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 8H | w/e | 13/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92101 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 8H | w/e | 14/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92102 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92103 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 8H | w/e | 27/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92105 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 8H | w/e | 14/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92106 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 8H | w/e | 29/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92108 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92109 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92112 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92120 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 8H | w/e | 08/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92121 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 8H | w/e | 29/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92122 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92123 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 8H | w/e | 28/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92133 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 8H | w/e | 22/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92134 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 8H | w/e | 10/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42156 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 8H | on | 05/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92048 | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 8H | w/e | 16/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92059 | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 8H | w/e | 17/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92070 | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92104 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 8H | w/e | 25/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92131 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 8H | w/e | 23/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92014 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 16D | Annesley | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | w/e | 14/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92026 | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92069 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92083 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 16B | Annesley | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | w/e | 18/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92090 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | w/e | 20/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92092 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | w/e | 22/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92094 | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 16D | Annesley | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92159 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | w/e | 22/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92162 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92086 | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92163 | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42606 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 8H | on | 15/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92023 | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92021 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92024 | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92032 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 8H | w/e | 15/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92088 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16A | Toton | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92113 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16G | Westhouses | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 8H | w/e | 07/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92011 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 38B | Annesley | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42828 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 10H | Lower Darwen | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 8H | on | 16/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42878 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 10H | Lower Darwen | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 8H | on | 18/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42812 | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 8H | on | 18/06/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42831 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 8H | on | 18/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42581 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 8H | on | 19/03/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42700 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 8H | on | 19/03/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42734 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 20/11/1965 | 8H | on | 05/03/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42616 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 10A | Carnforth | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 8H | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 91E | To Eastern Region |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92049 | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92160 | w/e | 13/03/1965 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42727 | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 8H | on | 07/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42942 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 19/03/1966 | 8H | on | 21/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42613 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 26/03/1966 | 8H | on | 22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42647 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 8H | on | 13/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42548 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 8H | on | 04/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42087 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 8H | on | 08/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2238 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 85A | Worcester | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 8H | on | 27/07/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92073 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 2D | Banbury | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92203 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 84C | Banbury | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2198 | on | 22/06/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill (New) | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 8H | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2219 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 85A | Worcester | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8H | on | 06/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2235 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 85A | Worcester | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8H | on | 06/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92151 | on | 31/10/1957 | 21A | Saltley (New) | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8H | w/e | 22/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92152 | on | 31/10/1957 | 21A | Saltley (New) | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42587 | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 8H | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92002 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92029 | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92234 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42133 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 8H | on | 01/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2199 | on | 29/06/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction (New) | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 8H | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2372 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 8H | w/e | 11/04/1970 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2393 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 8H | on | 31/12/1969 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44963 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 8H | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45232 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2240 | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 8H | on | 20/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44730 | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45436 | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 8H | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42663 | w/e | 03/12/1966 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 18/02/1967 | 8H | on | 18/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92022 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 25/02/1967 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92025 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 25/02/1967 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44780 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 18/03/1967 | 8H | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44897 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 18/03/1967 | 8H | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44844 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44913 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 8H | w/e | 29/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45130 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45280 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45405 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 22/07/1967 | 8H | w/e | 26/08/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44840 | w/e | 15/04/1967 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44859 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44876 | w/e | 15/04/1967 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45292 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45299 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 8H | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2389 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 20/07/1968 | 8H | w/e | 07/12/1968 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2383 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 27/07/1968 | 8H | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2198 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton | w/e | 02/11/1968 | 8H | w/e | 15/03/1969 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2385 | w/e | 17/05/1969 | 8J | Allerton | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 8H | w/e | 31/01/1970 | To Store | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2117 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton | w/e | 31/01/1970 | 8H | w/e | 09/05/1970 | To Store | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3103 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 14/02/1970 | 8H | m/e | 04/1977 | CH | Chester West |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3102 | w/e | 24/01/1970 | 8J | Allerton | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 8H | w/e | 08/01/1972 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3104 | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 8J | Allerton | w/e | 14/03/1970 | 8H | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3605 | w/e | 07/03/1970 | 8J | Allerton | w/e | 28/03/1970 | 8H | m/e | 04/1977 | CH | Chester West |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3425 | w/e | 18/04/1970 | 8J | Allerton | w/e | 09/05/1970 | 8H | w/e | 08/07/1972 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3832 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 8H | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D4157 | w/e | 16/11/1968 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 8H | m/e | 04/1977 | CH | Chester West |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12071 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 10/10/1970 | 8H | w/e | 14/11/1970 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3858 | w/e | 10/01/1970 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 14/11/1970 | 8H | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3176 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 8H | w/e | 12/10/1974 | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3833 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 08/05/1971 | 8H | w/e | 17/11/1973 | BY | Bletchley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3104 | 2w/e | 01/01/1972 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 2w/e | 01/01/1972 | 8H | m/e | 04/1977 | CH | Chester West |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3832 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 28/10/1972 | 8H | m/e | 04/1977 | CH | Chester West |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08069 | w/e | 24/11/1973 | HD | Holyhead | w/e | 03/08/1974 | BC | m/e | 04/1977 | CH | Chester West |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08300 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | 8J | Allerton | m/e | 02/1977 | BC | m/e | 04/1977 | CH | Chester West |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08025 | m/e | 11/1976 | BS | Bescot | m/e | 03/1977 | BC | m/e | 04/1977 | CH | Chester West |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08465 | w/e | 15/08/1970 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | m/e | 03/1977 | BC | m/e | 04/1977 | CH | Chester West |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03189 | w/e | 07/12/1968 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | on | 25/10/1981 | BC | on | 16/03/1986 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03170 | w/e | 30/08/1969 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 08/11/1981 | BC | on | 03/1989 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 03196 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | CR | Colchester | on | 08/11/1981 | BC | on | 12/06/1983 | Withdrawn |