Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 929 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1837 Week
» 12982 Month
» 112767 Year
» 1778143 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Keadby


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Keadby Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam Q4 0-8-0 139       m/e 02/1904 (New) KEA on 10/01/1930 IMM Immingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 140       m/e 02/1904 (New) KEA on 18/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 143       m/e 03/1904 (New) KEA on 03/12/1929 DON Doncaster
Steam Q4 0-8-0 147       m/e 03/1904 (New) KEA on 18/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 150       m/e 04/1904 (New) KEA on 18/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 153       m/e 05/1904 (New) KEA on 18/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 1074       m/e 07/1905 (New) KEA on 08/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 1144       m/e 04/1907 (New) KEA on 02/08/1930 IMM Immingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 39       m/e 02/1909 (New) KEA on 18/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 63       m/e 07/1909 (New) KEA on 01/11/1930 IMM Immingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 956       m/e 08/1910 (New) KEA on 07/11/1931 IMM Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 1206 on 07/09/1912 GRI Grimsby m/e 1920 KEA on 24/04/1924 IMM Immingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 160 on 11/01/1913 MEX Mexborough on 23/02/1920 KEA on 01/11/1927 ARD Ardsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 57 on 10/11/1916 MEX Mexborough m/e 1922 KEA on 30/10/1930 IMM Immingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 1076 on 08/11/1919 MEX Mexborough m/e 1922 KEA on 11/11/1927 ARD Ardsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 162 on 18/10/1912 MEX Mexborough m/e 1922 KEA on 12/10/1930 IMM Immingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 1178 on 29/04/1911 MEX Mexborough m/e 1922 KEA on 31/12/1929 ARD Ardsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 85 on 05/05/1916 MEX Mexborough m/e 10/1922 KEA on 29/10/1929 IMM Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 1240 on 20/10/1922 IMM Immingham m/e 1923 KEA on 09/06/1924 IMM Immingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 164 on 27/04/1912 MEX Mexborough m/e 1923 KEA on 18/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 353 on 24/03/1922 GOR Gorton on 06/01/1924 KEA on 07/12/1927 LIN Lincoln
Steam O4 2-8-0 377 on 18/11/1921 GOR Gorton on 06/01/1924 KEA on 04/12/1927 LIN Lincoln
Steam O4 2-8-0 394 on 07/07/1922 GOR Gorton on 06/01/1924 KEA on 26/10/1927 CLK Colwick
Steam O4 2-8-0 396 on 14/05/1920 GOR Gorton on 06/01/1924 KEA on 12/03/1927 DON Doncaster
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5062 on 02/03/1929 IMM Immingham on 10/06/1929 KEA on 10/04/1931 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5151 on 08/03/1929 IMM Immingham on 13/06/1929 KEA on 18/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam L3 2-6-4T 5273 on 10/03/1923 IMM Immingham on 24/06/1929 KEA on 30/11/1929 IMM Immingham
Steam L3 2-6-4T 5367 on 10/03/1923 IMM Immingham on 24/06/1929 KEA on 21/11/1929 IMM Immingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6140 on 26/01/1927 CLK Colwick on 11/09/1929 KEA on 25/03/1931 IMM Immingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6177 on 03/03/1929 IMM Immingham on 20/09/1929 KEA on 03/12/1929 DON Doncaster
Steam O4 2-8-0 6278 on 14/09/1929 IMM Immingham on 27/09/1929 KEA on 29/06/1931 IMM Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 5404 on 08/07/1929 WFD Woodford Halse on 10/10/1929 KEA on 01/11/1930 IMM Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6518 on 13/11/1925 WFD Woodford Halse on 10/10/1929 KEA on 09/04/1932 IMM Immingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6076 on 11/11/1927 ARD Ardsley on 10/10/1929 KEA on 22/03/1930 ARD Ardsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5163 on 17/01/1928 ARD Ardsley on 10/10/1929 KEA on 12/12/1930 IMM Immingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5964 on 01/10/1927 ARD Ardsley on 10/10/1929 KEA on 18/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5356 on 31/01/1928 ARD Ardsley on 12/10/1929 KEA on 18/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6073 on 15/10/1927 ARD Ardsley on 16/10/1929 KEA on 01/04/1930 ARD Ardsley
Steam O4 2-8-0 6243 on 20/10/1922 IMM Immingham on 15/11/1929 KEA on 12/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6568 on 23/06/1927 IMM Immingham on 27/02/1930 KEA on 17/03/1932 IMM Immingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6572 on 10/09/1927 IMM Immingham on 27/02/1930 KEA on 12/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 5352 on 06/01/1924 IMM Immingham on 04/11/1930 KEA on 12/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6242 m/e 12/1912 IMM Immingham (New) on 06/11/1930 KEA on 12/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6248 on 17/11/1922 IMM Immingham on 06/11/1930 KEA on 12/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6569 on 03/06/1927 IMM Immingham on 07/01/1931 KEA on 12/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6223 on 06/06/1929 IMM Immingham on 16/06/1931 KEA on 12/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6215 on 04/06/1929 IMM Immingham on 23/07/1931 KEA on 12/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6250 on 17/11/1922 IMM Immingham on 12/08/1931 KEA on 12/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6237 on 01/11/1914 IMM Immingham on 22/12/1931 KEA on 12/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6362 on 07/12/1929 IMM Immingham on 17/03/1932 KEA on 12/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6366 on 25/10/1929 IMM Immingham on 14/04/1932 KEA on 12/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam O4 2-8-0 6515 on 22/10/1925 IMM Immingham on 11/06/1932 KEA on 12/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5085 on 29/10/1929 IMM Immingham on 11/06/1932 KEA on 18/06/1932 FRO Frodingham
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5139 on 10/01/1930 IMM Immingham on 11/06/1932 KEA on 18/06/1932 FRO Frodingham