Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 441 Today
» 642 Yesterday
» 4765 Week
» 11473 Month
» 164426 Year
» 1829802 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bradford Hammerton Street


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Bradford Hammerton Street Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam J51 0-6-0T 159       m/e 02/1914 (New) BFD on 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J51 0-6-0T 162       m/e 02/1914 (New) BFD on 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam J51 0-6-0T 164       m/e 03/1914 (New) BFD on 01/01/1948 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5129 on 28/12/1912 ANN Annesley (New) on 25/03/1924 BFD on 21/04/1924 NEA Neasden
Steam J39 0-6-0 2699       on 15/08/1928 (New) BFD on 09/02/1936 ARD Ardsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5135 on 04/01/1929 ARD Ardsley on 16/03/1929 BFD on 23/04/1934 ARD Ardsley
Steam B6 4-6-0 5416 on 01/10/1928 ARD Ardsley on 15/06/1929 BFD on 01/06/1934 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam B6 4-6-0 5053 on 30/04/1928 ARD Ardsley on 01/02/1930 BFD on 26/06/1934 SHF Sheffield Neepsend
Steam B6 4-6-0 5052 on 07/02/1928 ARD Ardsley on 13/05/1930 BFD on 10/09/1930 ARD Ardsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6178 on 31/12/1929 ARD Ardsley on 04/10/1930 BFD on 15/08/1939 Withdrawn
Steam B6 4-6-0 5052 on 10/09/1930 ARD Ardsley on 29/12/1930 BFD on 14/04/1931 ARD Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 1289 on 07/10/1929 ARD Ardsley on 30/01/1931 BFD on 10/08/1931 ARD Ardsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6174 on 16/04/1928 ARD Ardsley on 02/03/1931 BFD on 04/06/1931 ARD Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 2698 on 14/08/1928 ARD Ardsley (New) on 31/05/1933 BFD on 31/07/1933 ARD Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 1265 on 13/10/1927 STR Stratford on 07/08/1933 BFD on 01/09/1933 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 1484 on 13/10/1927 STR Stratford on 08/08/1933 BFD on 21/08/1933 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 2974 on 19/02/1932 SHF Sheffield Neepsend (New) on 18/04/1934 BFD on 30/07/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 2973 on 02/05/1934 ARD Ardsley on 05/05/1934 BFD on 02/02/1941 ARD Ardsley
Steam Q4 0-8-0 6177 on 03/12/1929 DON Doncaster on 21/11/1934 BFD on 02/02/1941 ARD Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 2700 on 17/08/1928 ARD Ardsley (New) on 15/01/1936 BFD on 17/02/1936 ARD Ardsley
Steam K2 2-6-0 4670 on 02/07/1935 MAR March on 22/01/1936 BFD on 25/01/1940 ARD Ardsley
Steam K2 2-6-0 4661 on 14/10/1935 NOR Norwich Thorpe on 09/02/1936 BFD on 02/12/1936 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam K2 2-6-0 4666 on 09/09/1935 CLK Colwick on 12/02/1936 BFD on 25/01/1940 ARD Ardsley
Steam K2 2-6-0 4678 on 30/01/1936 ARD Ardsley on 05/05/1937 BFD on 27/10/1937 ARD Ardsley
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5452 on 29/11/1935 HIT Hither Green on 06/05/1937 BFD on 16/10/1937 NEA Neasden
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5007 on 29/11/1935 HIT Hither Green on 07/05/1937 BFD on 27/11/1937 NEA Neasden
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5411 on 27/10/1917 NEA Neasden (New) on 20/05/1937 BFD on 12/11/1937 NEA Neasden
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5373 on 30/06/1928 NEA Neasden on 10/07/1937 BFD on 28/10/1937 NEA Neasden
Steam J39 0-6-0 2981 on 21/08/1935 DON Doncaster (New) on 22/02/1938 BFD on 24/07/1940 ARD Ardsley
Steam K2 2-6-0 4678 on 27/10/1937 ARD Ardsley on 09/05/1938 BFD on 25/01/1940 ARD Ardsley
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5373 on 28/10/1937 NEA Neasden on 19/05/1938 BFD on 29/07/1938 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5007 on 27/11/1937 NEA Neasden on 19/05/1938 BFD on 29/07/1938 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam Q4 0-8-0 5147 on 18/06/1932 FRO Frodingham on 27/08/1939 BFD on 02/12/1941 ARD Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 2706 on 27/06/1934 ARD Ardsley on 26/03/1941 BFD on 30/07/1945 DON Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 2707 on 01/07/1939 ARD Ardsley on 26/03/1941 BFD on 11/07/1941 ARD Ardsley
Steam B4 4-6-0 6101 on 25/01/1940 ARD Ardsley on 11/07/1941 BFD on 10/12/1942 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam J39 0-6-0 1980 on 20/07/1938 ARD Ardsley (New) on 02/12/1941 BFD on 17/09/1944 ARD Ardsley
Steam A5 4-6-2T 5006 on 16/10/1941 ARD Ardsley on 13/12/1941 BFD on 15/03/1942 ARD Ardsley
Steam B4 4-6-0 6101 on 28/03/1943 ARD Ardsley on 30/06/1943 BFD on 07/07/1943 ARD Ardsley
Steam K2 2-6-0 4633 on 25/07/1943 DON Doncaster on 30/07/1945 BFD on 30/12/1945 ARD Ardsley
Steam K2 2-6-0 4679 on 04/04/1942 DON Doncaster on 30/07/1945 BFD on 02/12/1945 ARD Ardsley
Steam K2 2-6-0 4642 on 30/07/1945 ARD Ardsley on 19/08/1945 BFD on 02/12/1945 ARD Ardsley
Steam B4 4-6-0 6099 on 25/06/1945 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) on 02/12/1945 BFD on 19/05/1946 ARD Ardsley
Steam B4 4-6-0 6101 on 07/07/1943 ARD Ardsley on 02/12/1945 BFD on 19/05/1946 ARD Ardsley
Steam B4 4-6-0 6102 on 28/02/1940 ARD Ardsley on 02/12/1945 BFD on 19/05/1946 ARD Ardsley
Steam K2 2-6-0 4633 on 30/12/1945 ARD Ardsley on 30/06/1946 BFD on 18/08/1946 CLK Colwick
Steam Q4 0-8-0 3217 on 21/10/1936 ARD Ardsley on 30/06/1946 BFD on 04/06/1950 37A Ardsley
Steam J39 0-6-0 2696 on 13/05/1942 CLK Colwick on 18/08/1946 BFD on 16/11/1947 ARD Ardsley
Steam B5 4-6-0 1688 on 18/03/1940 MEX Mexborough on 17/06/1947 BFD on 07/09/1947 MEX Mexborough
Steam B1 4-6-0 1033       on 29/08/1947 (New) BFD on 21/09/1947 COP Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam B1 4-6-0 1229 on 02/09/1947 ARD Ardsley (New) on 21/09/1947 BFD on 29/06/1964 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 1230 on 04/09/1947 ARD Ardsley (New) on 21/09/1947 BFD on 19/11/1962 Withdrawn
Steam J6 0-6-0 4170       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J6 0-6-0 4203       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J6 0-6-0 4205       on 01/01/1948 BFD 3w/e 16/06/1956 37A Ardsley
Steam J6 0-6-0 4226       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J6 0-6-0 4268       on 01/01/1948 BFD 3w/e 16/06/1956 37A Ardsley
Steam J6 0-6-0 4271       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 22/03/1952 37A Ardsley
Steam J6 0-6-0 4274       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 22/03/1952 37A Ardsley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8892 m/e 02/1914 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street (New) on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8895 m/e 02/1914 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street (New) on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 21/09/1957 56B Ardsley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8897 m/e 03/1914 BFD Bradford Hammerton Street (New) on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8898 m/e 03/1914 ARD Ardsley (New) on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 21/09/1957 56B Ardsley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8902 m/e 12/1914 ARD Ardsley (New) on 01/01/1948 BFD 5w/e 21/03/1953 37A Ardsley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8906 m/e 04/1915 ARD Ardsley (New) on 01/01/1948 BFD 5w/e 21/03/1953 34B Hornsey
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8908 m/e 06/1915 ARD Ardsley (New) on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8912 m/e 07/1919 ARD Ardsley (New) on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8922 m/e 11/1922 ARD Ardsley (New) on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8923 m/e 11/1922 ARD Ardsley (New) on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8932       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8933       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8934       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8940       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8941       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 16/05/1953 37A Ardsley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8942       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8943       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8944       on 01/01/1948 BFD 3w/e 31/05/1950 36A Doncaster
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8959       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 19/10/1957 56B Ardsley
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8961       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 18/10/1952 34B Hornsey
Steam J50 0-6-0T 8969       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9437       on 01/01/1948 BFD on 19/07/1954 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9443       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 14/12/1957 56B Ardsley
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9447       on 01/01/1948 BFD on 26/10/1956 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9448       on 01/01/1948 BFD w/e 12/01/1953 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9449       on 01/01/1948 BFD on 19/04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9454       on 01/01/1948 BFD w/e 07/02/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9459       on 01/01/1948 BFD on 28/03/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9464       on 01/01/1948 BFD on 08/08/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9474       on 01/01/1948 BFD 4w/e 19/10/1957 56B Ardsley
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9478       on 01/01/1948 BFD on 12/12/1956 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9479       on 01/01/1948 BFD w/e 27/10/1952 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9482       on 01/01/1948 BFD on 30/08/1954 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9483       on 01/01/1948 BFD 5w/e 24/03/1951 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam N1 0-6-2T 9485       on 01/01/1948 BFD w/e 01/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9253       on 01/01/1948 BFD 3w/e 31/05/1950 40A Lincoln
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9256       on 01/01/1948 BFD 3w/e 31/05/1950 40F Boston
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9261       on 01/01/1948 BFD 3w/e 31/05/1950 40F Boston
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9280       on 01/01/1948 BFD 3w/e 31/05/1950 40F Boston
Steam B1 4-6-0 1294       on 01/03/1948 (New) BFD on 13/09/1953 65A Eastfield
Steam B1 4-6-0 61267 on 12/12/1947 ARD Ardsley (New) on 10/04/1949 BFD on 16/06/1957 56A Wakefield
Steam B1 4-6-0 1268 on 16/12/1947 ARD Ardsley (New) on 10/04/1949 BFD on 16/06/1957 56A Wakefield
Steam L1 2-6-4T 67762       m/e 07/1949 BFD w/e 01/11/1958 9G Gorton
Steam C14 4-4-2T 67447 on 01/01/1948 IPS Ipswich 3w/e 31/05/1950 37C 4w/e 21/07/1951 39A Gorton
Steam C14 4-4-2T 67450 on 01/01/1948 IPS Ipswich 3w/e 31/05/1950 37C 4w/e 21/07/1951 39A Gorton
Steam B1 4-6-0 1296 on 06/03/1948 ARD Ardsley (New) on 04/06/1950 37C on 16/06/1957 56A Wakefield
Steam B1 4-6-0 61031 on 04/06/1950 37A Ardsley on 13/05/1951 37C on 12/01/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69432 on 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 21/07/1951 37C w/e 08/11/1954 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69434 on 01/01/1948 KX Kings Cross 4w/e 21/07/1951 37C 4w/e 16/02/1957 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69439 on 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 21/07/1951 37C on 11/11/1955 Withdrawn
Steam B1 4-6-0 61145 on 30/09/1951 37A Ardsley on 18/11/1951 37C on 06/12/1953 36A Doncaster
Steam J39 0-6-0 64903 on 23/12/1951 37A Ardsley on 16/03/1952 37C on 12/01/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J39 0-6-0 64907 on 18/09/1949 ARD Ardsley on 16/03/1952 37C on 12/01/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam B1 4-6-0 61384 on 17/10/1951 37A Ardsley (New) on 20/07/1952 37C on 19/10/1952 30A Stratford
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69442 on 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 4w/e 13/12/1952 37C on 06/09/1953 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69433 on 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 5w/e 21/03/1953 37C w/e 27/12/1954 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69475 on 01/01/1948 HSY Hornsey 5w/e 21/03/1953 37C 4w/e 21/08/1954 34C Hatfield
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69337 4w/e 23/09/1950 37A Ardsley 4w/e 16/05/1953 37C 4w/e 20/06/1953 36B Mexborough
Steam O4 2-8-0 63920 on 22/09/1952 37A Ardsley on 06/12/1953 37C on 05/01/1958 56B Ardsley
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69436 on 01/01/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 21/08/1954 37C on 11/07/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69471 on 01/01/1948 COP Copley Hill (Leeds) 4w/e 21/08/1954 37C on 16/01/1956 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69455 on 01/01/1948 HAT Hatfield 4w/e 19/03/1955 37C w/e 16/05/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69475 4w/e 21/08/1954 34C Hatfield 4w/e 19/03/1955 37C on 11/04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69441 5w/e 24/04/1954 38A Colwick 5w/e 23/04/1955 37C w/e 30/05/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69451 4w/e 23/01/1954 38A Colwick 5w/e 23/04/1955 37C on 12/10/1955 Withdrawn
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69467 5w/e 24/04/1954 38A Colwick 5w/e 23/04/1955 37C on 02/07/1956 Withdrawn
Steam N7 0-6-2T 69696 4w/e 23/10/1954 37B Copley Hill (Leeds) 5w/e 23/07/1955 37C 4w/e 21/04/1956 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam N1 0-6-2T 69457 3w/e 12/11/1955 37A Ardsley 4w/e 21/04/1956 37C 4w/e 16/03/1957 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam J39 0-6-0 64801 on 30/09/1943 ARD Ardsley on 27/05/1956 37C on 12/01/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam B1 4-6-0 61320 on 16/06/1956 25A Wakefield on 23/09/1956 56G on 15/09/1957 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41251       4w/e 16/02/1957 56G 4w/e 16/03/1957 56A Wakefield
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3455       on 23/05/1957 (New) 56G 4w/e 19/07/1958 52E Percy Main
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3454       on 27/05/1957 (New) 56G 5w/e 20/07/1957 55B Stourton
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3456       on 31/05/1957 (New) 56G w/e 20/06/1959 51A Darlington
Steam J39 0-6-0 64796 on 01/02/1936 ARD Ardsley on 16/06/1957 56G on 12/01/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J39 0-6-0 64872 on 30/04/1950 37A Ardsley on 16/06/1957 56G on 12/01/1958 56F Low Moor
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3457 on 06/06/1957 55B Stourton (New) 5w/e 20/07/1957 56G w/e 18/07/1959 55F Manningham
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42072 4w/e 13/11/1954 52A Gateshead 5w/e 20/07/1957 56G 4w/e 21/09/1957 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42073 5w/e 18/12/1954 52A Gateshead 5w/e 20/07/1957 56G 4w/e 21/09/1957 56E Sowerby Bridge
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42093 5w/e 18/12/1954 52A Gateshead 5w/e 20/07/1957 56G 4w/e 21/09/1957 55F Manningham
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42094 5w/e 18/12/1954 52A Gateshead 5w/e 20/07/1957 56G 4w/e 21/09/1957 56E Sowerby Bridge
Steam B1 4-6-0 61131 on 19/10/1952 37A Ardsley on 15/09/1957 56G on 12/01/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam B1 4-6-0 61382 on 18/09/1951 37A Ardsley (New) on 15/09/1957 56G on 12/01/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam B1 4-6-0 61383 on 03/10/1951 37A Ardsley (New) on 15/09/1957 56G on 12/01/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J39 0-6-0 64791 on 29/01/1950 NEV Neville Hill on 15/09/1957 56G on 12/01/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J39 0-6-0 64886 on 02/09/1951 50B Neville Hill on 15/09/1957 56G on 12/01/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J39 0-6-0 64947 on 25/04/1954 50F Malton on 15/09/1957 56G on 12/01/1958 56F Low Moor
Steam J50 0-6-0T 68895 4w/e 21/09/1957 56B Ardsley 4w/e 19/10/1957 56G 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2260       on 10/12/1957 (New) 56G 4w/e 20/05/1967 55B Stourton
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2261       on 12/12/1957 (New) 56G 4w/e 20/05/1967 55B Stourton
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2264       on 28/12/1957 (New) 56G 4w/e 20/05/1967 55H Neville Hill
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2265       on 28/12/1957 (New) 56G on 15/03/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8010 on 16/10/1957 1D Devons Road (Bow) (New) 4w/e 08/01/1958 56G 4w/e 08/02/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8011 on 29/10/1957 1D Devons Road (Bow) (New) 4w/e 08/01/1958 56G 4w/e 08/02/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 90698 4w/e 09/11/1957 56B Ardsley 4w/e 08/01/1958 56G 4w/e 08/02/1958 56F Low Moor
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8010 4w/e 08/01/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 08/02/1958 56G 4w/e 22/02/1958 1D Devons Road (Bow)
Diesel 20 Bo-Bo D8011 4w/e 08/01/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 08/02/1958 56G 4w/e 22/02/1958 1D Devons Road (Bow)
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2071       on 13/10/1959 (New) 56G w/e 18/07/1964 55F Manningham
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2072       on 31/10/1959 (New) 56G 4w/e 20/07/1968 51A Darlington
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2073       on 05/11/1959 (New) 56G 4w/e 15/07/1967 56B Healey Mills
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2074       on 11/11/1959 (New) 56G w/e 12/09/1964 55A Holbeck (MR)
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2075       on 24/11/1959 (New) 56G w/e 18/06/1960 50A York (North)
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2081       on 05/02/1960 (New) 56G w/e 08/06/1963 50B Hull Dairycoates
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2267 on 20/01/1958 55D Royston (New) w/e 23/04/1960 56G w/e 18/06/1960 55A Holbeck (MR)
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2089       on 05/05/1960 (New) 56G on 06/11/1987 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2090       on 05/05/1960 (New) 56G w/e 11/11/1972 55B York (North)
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2091       on 26/05/1960 (New) 56G on 21/03/1974 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2095 on 15/06/1960 50A York (North) (New) w/e 25/06/1960 56G w/e 27/06/1964 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2096 on 16/06/1960 50A York (North) (New) w/e 25/06/1960 56G 2w/e 25/07/1976 TE Thornaby
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2097 on 18/06/1960 50A York (North) (New) w/e 25/06/1960 56G 4w/e 22/04/1967 56B Healey Mills
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2150 on 10/06/1960 50A York (North) (New) w/e 02/07/1960 56G w/e 12/01/1963 55H Neville Hill
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2152 on 22/06/1960 50A York (North) (New) w/e 02/07/1960 56G 4w/e 22/04/1967 56B Healey Mills
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2094 on 28/06/1960 50A York (North) (New) w/e 09/07/1960 56G 4w/e 20/07/1968 52A Gateshead
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2098 on 02/07/1960 50A York (North) (New) w/e 09/07/1960 56G w/e 01/06/1963 50B Hull Dairycoates
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2104 on 24/09/1960 50A York (North) (New) w/e 01/10/1960 56G w/e 15/10/1960 52E Percy Main
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2309 on 12/12/1960 51A Darlington (New) w/e 24/06/1961 56G 4w/e 22/04/1967 56A Wakefield
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2173 on 14/12/1960 50B Hull Dairycoates (New) w/e 15/09/1962 56G 4w/e 22/04/1967 56B Healey Mills
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3230 on 29/12/1955 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) w/e 01/06/1963 56G 4w/e 08/10/1966 56B Healey Mills
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3235 w/e 19/01/1963 50B Hull Dairycoates w/e 01/06/1963 56G w/e 19/10/1963 55A Holbeck (MR)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3231 on 30/12/1955 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) w/e 08/06/1963 56G 4w/e 08/10/1966 56B Healey Mills
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2248 w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main w/e 22/06/1963 56G w/e 12/09/1964 55A Holbeck (MR)
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3376 on 23/08/1957 55D Royston (New) w/e 22/06/1963 56G on 21/12/1977 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3873 on 19/03/1960 51L Thornaby (New) w/e 22/06/1963 56G 4w/e 08/10/1966 56B Healey Mills
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3456 w/e 20/06/1959 51A Darlington w/e 03/08/1963 56G 4w/e 08/10/1966 56B Healey Mills
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3381 w/e 13/06/1964 55D Royston w/e 27/06/1964 56G on 19/12/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3457 w/e 18/07/1959 55F Manningham w/e 18/07/1964 56G 4w/e 08/10/1966 56B Healey Mills
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3071 w/e 12/09/1964 50B Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 19/06/1965 56G 4w/e 08/10/1966 56B Healey Mills
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2593 w/e 11/01/1964 56B Ardsley 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G 4w/e 22/04/1967 64B Haymarket
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2595 w/e 18/06/1960 56B Ardsley 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G 4w/e 22/04/1967 64B Haymarket
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2596 w/e 18/06/1960 56B Ardsley 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G 4w/e 22/04/1967 64B Haymarket
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2597 w/e 09/07/1960 56B Ardsley 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G 4w/e 22/04/1967 64B Haymarket
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2603 on 16/09/1960 56B Ardsley (New) 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G w/e 11/12/1965 6J Holyhead
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2604 on 30/09/1960 56B Ardsley (New) 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G w/e 11/12/1965 6J Holyhead
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2605 on 24/09/1960 56B Ardsley (New) 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G w/e 11/12/1965 6J Holyhead
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2606 on 08/10/1960 56B Ardsley (New) 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G w/e 11/12/1965 6J Holyhead
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2607 on 18/10/1960 56B Ardsley (New) 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G w/e 11/12/1965 6G Llandudno Junction
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2608 on 09/12/1960 56B Ardsley (New) 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G 4w/e 22/04/1967 64B Haymarket
Diesel 05 0-6-0 D2617 w/e 20/01/1962 56B Ardsley 4w/e 06/11/1965 56G 4w/e 22/04/1967 64B Haymarket
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2273 on 18/04/1958 55A Holbeck (MR) (New) 4w/e 10/09/1966 56G on 16/10/1967 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2095 w/e 27/06/1964 55G Huddersfield Hillhouse 4w/e 28/01/1967 56G w/e 14/12/1968 55A Holbeck (MR)
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2262 w/e 13/06/1964 55E Normanton 4w/e 28/01/1967 56G 4w/e 09/09/1967 50D Goole
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2045 w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main 4w/e 25/02/1967 56G 4w/e 04/11/1967 55H Neville Hill
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2061 on 20/06/1959 52A Gateshead (New) 4w/e 25/02/1967 56G 4w/e 24/02/1968 51L Thornaby
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2148 w/e 16/07/1960 52A Gateshead 4w/e 25/02/1967 56G 4w/e 22/04/1967 56B Healey Mills
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2164 w/e 08/06/1963 52A Gateshead 4w/e 25/02/1967 56G 4w/e 22/04/1967 56B Healey Mills
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2166 w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main 4w/e 25/02/1967 56G 4w/e 22/04/1967 56B Healey Mills
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2313 w/e 08/06/1963 52E Percy Main 4w/e 25/02/1967 56G 4w/e 22/04/1967 56A Wakefield
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2044 w/e 26/09/1964 55F Manningham 4w/e 20/05/1967 56G 4w/e 24/02/1968 51A Darlington
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2102 4w/e 28/01/1967 55F Manningham 4w/e 20/05/1967 56G 4w/e 20/07/1968 51A Darlington
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2161 w/e 14/11/1964 55F Manningham 4w/e 20/05/1967 56G 4w/e 20/07/1968 55G Knottingley
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2204 4w/e 07/10/1967 51L Thornaby 4w/e 07/10/1967 56G on 31/12/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2248 w/e 12/09/1964 55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 07/10/1967 56G w/e 14/12/1968 55H Neville Hill
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2340 4w/e 23/04/1966 51C West Hartlepool 4w/e 07/10/1967 56G on 13/10/1968 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2158 4w/e 09/09/1967 50D Goole 4w/e 25/05/1968 55F w/e 04/04/1970 30E Colchester
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2260 4w/e 09/09/1967 55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 25/05/1968 55F on 24/10/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2261 4w/e 09/09/1967 55A Holbeck (MR) 4w/e 25/05/1968 55F on 15/03/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2063 on 14/07/1959 50A York (North) (New) 4w/e 22/06/1968 55F w/e 12/04/1969 55B York (North)
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2271 4w/e 20/05/1967 55D Royston 4w/e 20/07/1968 55F on 31/12/1969 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2272 4w/e 20/05/1967 55D Royston 4w/e 20/07/1968 55F on 24/10/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2371 on 31/12/1958 32C Lowestoft (New) w/e 28/09/1968 55F 2w/e 24/03/1973 55C Healey Mills
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2111 on 25/11/1960 50A York (North) (New) w/e 12/04/1969 55F w/e 11/11/1972 55B York (North)
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2244 on 12/11/1956 50B Neville Hill (New) w/e 01/11/1969 55F on 29/06/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2248 w/e 14/12/1968 55H Neville Hill w/e 01/11/1969 55F on 29/06/1970 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2051 on 27/01/1959 53A Hull Dairycoates (New) w/e 04/04/1970 55F w/e 13/03/1971 30E Colchester
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3547 w/e 28/02/1970 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 16/01/1971 55F on 16/10/1983 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 D3294 4w/e 20/07/1968 55D Royston w/e 13/03/1971 55F on 27/07/1988 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 D2162 4w/e 25/02/1967 55A Holbeck (MR) w/e 11/11/1972 55F on 23/05/1989 Withdrawn
Diesel 08 0-6-0 08548 2w/e 11/01/1975 DR Doncaster w/e 27/09/1975 HS on 19/12/1982 Withdrawn
Diesel 03 0-6-0 03371 2w/e 08/09/1973 YK York (North) 2w/e 25/07/1976 HS on 26/11/1987 Withdrawn