Depot: Bricklayers Arms
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Bricklayers Arms | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31271 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 02/1904 | 73B | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1179 | q/e | 12/1935 | BA | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 798 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 799 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72B | Salisbury | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 921 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 74B | Ramsgate | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 922 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 74E | St Leonards | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 923 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 74E | St Leonards | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 928 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 929 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 930 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 3w/e | 01/11/1955 | 74E | St Leonards | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 931 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 932 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | STL | St Leonards | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 933 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 934 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 935 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 936 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 937 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 938 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 939 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1036 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | w/e | 10/03/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1159 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 1162 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 74A | Ashford | ||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1166 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 73E | Faversham | ||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1175 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1176 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 10/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1275 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 03/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1315 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 73E | Faversham | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 1324 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 73E | Faversham | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 1326 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73E | Faversham | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 1328 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | STL | St Leonards | ||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1491 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 1500 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 1533 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 06/05/1960 | 73J | Tonbridge | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 1541 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | w/e | 07/04/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 1542 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 74C | Dover Marine | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 1546 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 02/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1547 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 1550 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 74D | Tonbridge | ||||
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 1758 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 1759 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | ||||
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 1782 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 74B | Ramsgate | ||||
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 1783 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 74B | Ramsgate | ||||
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 1784 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 1785 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 74A | Ashford | ||||
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 1786 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 1787 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 74A | Ashford | ||||
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 1788 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 1789 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1824 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1825 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1826 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1865 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 09/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1901 | q/e | 12/1935 | GFD | Guildford | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | P | 02/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1902 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | P | 02/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2075 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 6w/e | 12/12/1949 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | ||||
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2076 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | BTN | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2077 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | EBN | Eastbourne | ||||
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2085 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | 3B | Three Bridges | ||||
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2087 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | ||||
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2089 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | ||||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 2097 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 9E | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 2128 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 6w/e | 12/12/1949 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 2141 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 10/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 2142 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 2151 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 2165 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 2166 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 2168 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 2170 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 2408 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 70B | Feltham | ||||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 2410 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 73H | Dover Marine | ||||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 2412 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 2413 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 2415 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 73H | Dover Marine | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2442 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2446 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2448 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75B | Redhill | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 2453 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 2454 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | TON | Tonbridge | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 2458 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | w/e | 09/03/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 2459 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | on | 02/06/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 2460 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 2461 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | w/e | 06/04/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 2462 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | w/e | 11/05/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2463 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75D | Horsham | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2467 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | P | 02/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2468 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 5w/e | 04/09/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2469 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | P | 02/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2472 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | P | 02/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2474 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 2w/e | 10/10/1961 | 75E | Three Bridges | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2524 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 02/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2525 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2549 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 71D | Fratton | ||||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2551 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | w/e | 06/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2564 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 75E | Three Bridges | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2565 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 06/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2578 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||||
Steam | S | 0-4-0ST | 1685 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1687 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1693 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1102 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 05/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1033 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73G | |||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1723 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 70C | Guildford | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1724 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1725 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 75D | Horsham | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1223 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1460 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1090 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | GFD | Guildford | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1584 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1277 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | TON | Tonbridge | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1280 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 74D | Tonbridge | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1287 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1294 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | GFD | Guildford | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1297 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 74B | Ramsgate | ||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 31388 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 07/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 31389 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 31395 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 06/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 31397 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 06/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 31398 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 1425 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 6w/e | 12/12/1949 | DOV | Dover Marine | ||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 31428 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 31429 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 31093 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | DOV | Dover Marine | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4941 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1901 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | P | 02/01/1948 | BA | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 1902 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | P | 02/01/1948 | BA | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2467 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | P | 02/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75D | Horsham |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2469 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | P | 02/01/1948 | BA | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 75D | Horsham |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2472 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | P | 02/01/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1514 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | BA | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1516 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | BA | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | AFD | Ashford |
Steam | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1160 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | BA | m/e | 02/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1163 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | BA | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1165 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | BA | 2w/e | 20/05/1950 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1179 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | BA | m/e | 10/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1547 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | BA | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | BA | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 918 | on | 01/01/1948 | RAM | Ramsgate | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BA | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | RAM | Ramsgate |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30919 | on | 01/01/1948 | RAM | Ramsgate | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BA | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | RAM | Ramsgate |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 920 | on | 01/01/1948 | RAM | Ramsgate | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BA | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1157 | P | 02/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BA | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1175 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BA | m/e | 10/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 1763 | on | 01/01/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BA | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | TON | Tonbridge |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 1273 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | RED | Redhill | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | BA | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | FAV | Faversham |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 1817 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | BA | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | RED | Redhill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 70878 | on | 04/11/1947 | WD | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | BA | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | BTN | Brighton | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90533 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | BA | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32499 | on | 01/01/1948 | NHN | Newhaven | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | BA | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 2554 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | HOR | Horsham | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | BA | w/e | 06/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30928 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30929 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | 5w/e | 15/10/1949 | RAM | Ramsgate |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30931 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30935 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | STL | St Leonards |
Steam | E1A | 4-4-0 | 31507 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31784 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31786 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31788 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 1789 | on | 01/01/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | BA | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | E1A | 4-4-0 | 1497 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | BA | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | E1A | 4-4-0 | 31511 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | BA | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30915 | on | 01/01/1948 | RAM | Ramsgate | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | BA | m/e | 31/08/1950 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30794 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | BA | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 74C | Dover Marine |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 31547 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | BA | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 1755 | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | BA | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 74C | Dover Marine |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31827 | on | 01/01/1948 | ELH | Eastleigh | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | BA | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75D | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 32113 | on | 01/01/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | BA | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31253 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | BA | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30795 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 73B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1227 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1071 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73B | m/e | 09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31068 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73B | m/e | 10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 1508 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31293 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73B | w/e | 05/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31294 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | GFD | Guildford | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73B | m/e | 10/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30932 | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | STL | St Leonards | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30935 | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | STL | St Leonards | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | E1A | 4-4-0 | 31497 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | BA | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 1544 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 73B | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 74D | Tonbridge |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31759 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 73B | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30929 | 5w/e | 15/10/1949 | RAM | Ramsgate | m/e | 31/08/1950 | 73B | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 32585 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 32587 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30909 | on | 01/01/1948 | STL | St Leonards | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 74E | St Leonards |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31899 | on | 01/01/1948 | RED | Redhill | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31900 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Atlantics | 4-4-2 | 32037 | 8w/e | 08/01/1949 | NHN | Newhaven | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Atlantics | 4-4-2 | 32038 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | NHN | Newhaven | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2075 | 6w/e | 12/12/1949 | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 32077 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | EBN | Eastbourne | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75G | Eastbourne |
Steam | Atlantics | 4-4-2 | 2425 | P | 02/01/1948 | NHN | Newhaven | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 13/11/1950 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Atlantics | 4-4-2 | 32426 | on | 01/01/1948 | NHN | Newhaven | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 13/11/1950 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 2473 | on | 01/01/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31899 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31900 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 1543 | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | RAM | Ramsgate | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30800 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31543 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | Marsh Tanks | 4-4-2T | 2075 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73B | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 32585 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73B | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 32587 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30797 | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | E1A | 4-4-0 | 31165 | 2w/e | 20/05/1950 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31488 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 31490 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75B | Redhill | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | m/e | 09/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | E1A | 4-4-0 | 31497 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31500 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31788 | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 74B | Ramsgate | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31789 | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 74B | Ramsgate | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31903 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31904 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Atlantics | 4-4-2 | 32039 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | m/e | 03/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 32455 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 74D | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 20/08/1954 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Large Radials | 0-6-2T | 32592 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | 6w/e | 05/09/1951 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 32128 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 71I | Southampton Docks | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 32128 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 73B | m/e | 03/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30800 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 74A | Ashford | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30801 | on | 01/01/1948 | AFD | Ashford | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | w/e | 11/04/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30922 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30923 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30924 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30925 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30926 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 74C | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30927 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30935 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31327 | on | 01/01/1948 | TON | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31540 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | w/e | 27/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31739 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 74D | Tonbridge |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31741 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73E | Faversham | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | m/e | 09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31788 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31789 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | Atlantics | 4-4-2 | 32037 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | w/e | 07/07/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Atlantics | 4-4-2 | 32038 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | w/e | 07/07/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Greybacks | 4-4-0 | 32045 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Greybacks | 4-4-0 | 32067 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | m/e | 10/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32409 | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | w/e | 18/01/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32550 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 71D | Fratton |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32552 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32553 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31086 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | w/e | 22/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31112 | on | 01/01/1948 | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31720 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31722 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 70C | Guildford |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31724 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31090 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | w/e | 08/08/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31287 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | I1X | 4-4-2T | 32595 | on | 01/01/1948 | EBN | Eastbourne | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | m/e | 06/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42080 | 8w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42081 | 8w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42082 | 8w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31828 | 3w/e | 30/11/1950 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73B | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31829 | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73B | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31872 | on | 01/01/1948 | SAL | Salisbury | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31873 | on | 01/01/1948 | SAL | Salisbury | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73B | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31890 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31891 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73B | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31892 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73B | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31893 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73B | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 32147 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 75A | Brighton | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73B | m/e | 12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31291 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73B | m/e | 05/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31503 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73B | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 73E | Faversham |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31823 | on | 01/01/1948 | DOV | Dover Marine | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31874 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31875 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Moguls | 2-6-0 | 32346 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Moguls | 2-6-0 | 32347 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Moguls | 2-6-0 | 32348 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75E | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31853 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 73B | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31855 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 73B | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31870 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71D | Fratton | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 73B | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31871 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 71D | Fratton | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 73B | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31853 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 73B | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31855 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 73B | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73C | Hither Green |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31870 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31871 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30923 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 74C | Dover Marine |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30924 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 74C | Dover Marine | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 73B | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 74C | Dover Marine |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32471 | on | 01/01/1948 | BTN | Brighton | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 73B | w/e | 12/09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41300 | m/e | 03/1952 (New) | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41301 | m/e | 03/1952 (New) | 73B | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 74B | Ramsgate | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41302 | m/e | 03/1952 (New) | 73B | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 72D | Plymouth Friary | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41303 | m/e | 03/1952 (New) | 73B | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | ||||
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30924 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 74C | Dover Marine | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73B | 7w/e | 23/08/1961 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31782 | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 74B | Ramsgate | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73B | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31783 | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 74B | Ramsgate | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31784 | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 74A | Ashford | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31785 | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 74A | Ashford | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73B | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32552 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32553 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41303 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 73B | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 31491 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 75B | Redhill | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 73B | m/e | 02/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31553 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9E | Nine Elms | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 73B | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 74D | Tonbridge |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31727 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 74D | Tonbridge | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 73B | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31735 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 74A | Ashford | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 73B | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31739 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 74D | Tonbridge | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 73B | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75B | Redhill |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31758 | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 73B | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31759 | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 73B | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31891 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 73B | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31400 | on | 01/01/1948 | AFD | Ashford | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73B | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 74A | Ashford |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31743 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73B | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31297 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 74B | Ramsgate | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 73B | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | E1A | 4-4-0 | 31165 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 26/05/1953 | 73B | w/e | 02/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31735 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75B | Redhill | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31739 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 75B | Redhill | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73B | w/e | 11/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31785 | 4w/e | 08/01/1953 | 74A | Ashford | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73B | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31891 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 32453 | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73B | m/e | 08/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 32460 | 6w/e | 13/08/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73B | m/e | 04/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42082 | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 75A | Brighton | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73B | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31408 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 73B | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32412 | 5w/e | 31/10/1950 | 71A | Eastleigh | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 73B | w/e | 07/09/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31553 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 74D | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 29/10/1953 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31225 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 73B | w/e | 04/06/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31242 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 73B | 4w/e | 19/03/1954 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31267 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73E | Faversham | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 73B | w/e | 30/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | King Arthur | 4-6-0 | 30794 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73B | 4w/e | 20/08/1954 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31786 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73B | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31787 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73B | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31788 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73B | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 74C | Dover Marine |
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 31789 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 71A | Eastleigh | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 73B | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 74C | Dover Marine |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31910 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 20/08/1954 | 73B | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 74D | Tonbridge |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31306 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 73B | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32526 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75E | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 73B | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32527 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 73B | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31851 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41314 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 5w/e | 11/03/1955 | 73B | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 72D | Plymouth Friary |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31899 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 75B | Redhill | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31900 | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31901 | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73J | Tonbridge |
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 31902 | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 75A | Brighton | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73J | Tonbridge |
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 31305 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73E | Faversham | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 73B | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75D | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32536 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75E | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 73B | 3w/e | 01/11/1955 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32537 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75E | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 73B | w/e | 13/04/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32538 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 75E | Three Bridges | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32539 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 75A | Brighton | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 32521 | on | 01/01/1948 | HOR | Horsham | 3w/e | 01/11/1955 | 73B | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31717 | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 73B | w/e | 24/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41314 | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 72D | Plymouth Friary | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 73B | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 72E | Barnstaple Junction |
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 32170 | 6w/e | 27/01/1956 | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 73B | w/e | 13/07/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 32454 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 74D | Tonbridge | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 73B | w/e | 29/03/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31461 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 73B | m/e | 31/08/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31480 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 73B | w/e | 08/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30923 | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 74E | St Leonards | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 73B | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 70D | Basingstoke |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30930 | 3w/e | 01/11/1955 | 74E | St Leonards | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 73B | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | E2 | 0-6-0T | 32104 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 73B | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | E2 | 0-6-0T | 32105 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 73B | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 75C | Norwood Junction |
Steam | E2 | 0-6-0T | 32107 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 73B | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 75E | Three Bridges |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41301 | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 74B | Ramsgate | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41303 | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 74A | Ashford | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32417 | P | 02/01/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 73B | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34001 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34003 | 5w/e | 09/10/1950 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 72B | Salisbury |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34013 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 73B | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34017 | 4w/e | 19/03/1954 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 73B | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34025 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 73B | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34027 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 73B | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 74B | Ramsgate |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32414 | on | 01/01/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 14/01/1958 | 73B | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34005 | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 14/01/1958 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 72B | Salisbury |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31145 | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 73B | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31247 | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 70C | Guildford | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32414 | 4w/e | 14/01/1958 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 73B | w/e | 07/06/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34004 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34012 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 73B | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34014 | on | 01/01/1948 | EXJ | Exmouth Junction | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 73B | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32418 | P | 02/01/1948 | NORW | Norwood Junction | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 73B | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42086 | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 73B | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32557 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | ELH | Eastleigh | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 73B | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 31853 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 73B | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32417 | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 73B | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 32557 | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 73B | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31743 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73B | m/e | 02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31749 | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73B | w/e | 11/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34016 | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 74B | Ramsgate | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73B | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34017 | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 74B | Ramsgate | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73B | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34021 | 4w/e | 14/01/1958 | 74B | Ramsgate | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34022 | 4w/e | 14/01/1958 | 74B | Ramsgate | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73B | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34025 | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 74B | Ramsgate | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73B | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34026 | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 74B | Ramsgate | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73B | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 72B | Salisbury |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34027 | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 74B | Ramsgate | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73B | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34037 | 4w/e | 24/02/1958 | 74B | Ramsgate | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 71B | Bournemouth |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34078 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||||
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32416 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 73B | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80082 | on | 15/04/1954 | 1E | Bletchley (New) | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 73B | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80083 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 14D | Neasden | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 73B | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 71A | Eastleigh |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80084 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1A | Willesden | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 73B | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75D | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80085 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1E | Bletchley | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 73B | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73F | Ashford |
Steam | E6 | 0-6-2T | 32416 | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 73B | 8w/e | 17/01/1961 | 70B | Feltham |
Steam | E1A | 4-4-0 | 31497 | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 72B | Salisbury | 4w/e | 06/05/1960 | 73B | w/e | 22/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | E1A | 4-4-0 | 31507 | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 72B | Salisbury | 4w/e | 06/05/1960 | 73B | w/e | 22/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31487 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 74D | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 73B | w/e | 25/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 31489 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 74D | Tonbridge | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 73B | w/e | 11/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31693 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 73C | Hither Green | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 73B | w/e | 10/06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31694 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 73B | w/e | 25/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31229 | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 73B | m/e | 10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34050 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 72B | Salisbury | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 73B | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84021 | on | 30/03/1957 | 74A | Ashford (New) | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73B | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84022 | on | 30/03/1957 | 74A | Ashford (New) | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73B | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84023 | on | 05/04/1957 | 74A | Ashford (New) | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73B | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 72A | Exmouth Junction |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84024 | on | 10/04/1957 | 74A | Ashford (New) | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73B | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31575 | on | 01/01/1948 | BAT | Stewarts Lane | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73B | w/e | 22/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30923 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 73B | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 75A | Brighton |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30926 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 73B | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 73A | Stewarts Lane |
Steam | Schools | 4-4-0 | 30937 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 73F | Ashford | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 73B | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31719 | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 73A | Stewarts Lane | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 73B | w/e | 19/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 34101 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 73B | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 75A | Brighton | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31689 | on | 01/01/1948 | HIT | Hither Green | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 73B | w/e | 31/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 31510 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 73B | w/e | 30/06/1962 | Withdrawn |