Depot: Brunswick
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Brunswick | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4670 | m/e | 06/1918 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 16/03/1925 | LIV | on | 13/06/1927 | CAM | Cambridge |
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | 4443 | on | 07/02/1925 | NWE | New England | on | 18/04/1925 | LIV | on | 28/04/1925 | NWE | New England |
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | 4402 | on | 03/02/1924 | DON | Doncaster | on | 29/04/1925 | LIV | on | 14/03/1927 | KX | Kings Cross |
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | 3280 | on | 07/09/1925 | LIV | on | 15/06/1926 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 4654 | on | 21/02/1925 | ARD | Ardsley | on | 04/12/1925 | LIV | on | 12/02/1927 | NWE | New England |
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | 4437 | on | 02/10/1925 | NWE | New England | on | 05/02/1926 | LIV | on | 08/03/1927 | KX | Kings Cross |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1497 | on | 14/04/1927 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 23/04/1927 | LIV | on | 20/05/1929 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1255 | on | 10/05/1927 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 20/05/1929 | LIV | on | 29/11/1929 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1497 | on | 20/05/1929 | GOR | Gorton | on | 29/11/1929 | LIV | on | 30/03/1931 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2703 | on | 14/02/1931 | GOR | Gorton | on | 30/03/1931 | LIV | on | 04/06/1931 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2694 | on | 01/08/1928 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 05/06/1931 | LIV | on | 21/06/1933 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2695 | on | 06/08/1928 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 21/06/1933 | LIV | on | 14/08/1935 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6637 | on | 22/04/1927 | GOR | Gorton | on | 03/11/1933 | LIV | m/e | 11/1935 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2691 | on | 20/07/1928 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 14/08/1935 | LIV | on | 08/02/1937 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6627 | on | 17/05/1927 | GOR | Gorton | m/e | 11/1935 | LIV | on | 29/11/1935 | LIV | Brunswick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6627 | m/e | 11/1935 | LIV | Brunswick | on | 29/11/1935 | LIV | on | 14/11/1936 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | F2 | 2-4-2T | 5777 | m/e | 01/1936 | LIV | on | 01/01/1948 | ANN | Annesley | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6315 | on | 10/04/1924 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/10/1936 | LIV | on | 08/01/1938 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1295 | on | 30/12/1935 | GOR | Gorton | on | 08/02/1937 | LIV | on | 05/11/1938 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5031 | on | 10/03/1923 | GOR | Gorton | on | 09/02/1938 | LIV | on | 11/08/1940 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 2692 | on | 11/10/1938 | GOR | Gorton | on | 05/11/1938 | LIV | on | 26/07/1941 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5037 | on | 07/04/1926 | GOR | Gorton | on | 11/08/1940 | LIV | on | 20/09/1940 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | 5031 | on | 11/08/1940 | GOR | Gorton | on | 20/09/1940 | LIV | on | 03/05/1943 | ANN | Annesley |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1296 | on | 27/05/1936 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/07/1941 | LIV | on | 05/11/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1286 | on | 26/03/1941 | GOR | Gorton | on | 03/05/1943 | LIV | on | 05/11/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | 6111 | on | 08/11/1941 | GOR | Gorton | on | 09/05/1943 | LIV | on | 18/07/1943 | 19D | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | 6112 | on | 06/11/1942 | GOR | Gorton | on | 27/06/1943 | LIV | on | 31/07/1943 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | 6106 | on | 21/09/1941 | GOR | Gorton | on | 11/03/1945 | LIV | on | 19/11/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | 6114 | on | 06/11/1942 | GOR | Gorton | on | 26/08/1945 | LIV | on | 10/12/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4714 | on | 10/06/1943 | GOR | Gorton | on | 06/04/1947 | LIV | on | 13/05/1948 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4954 | on | 18/06/1943 | GOR | Gorton | on | 06/04/1947 | LIV | on | 22/05/1950 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) |
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 2302 | m/e | 01/1936 | LIN | Lincoln | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | on | 20/03/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 2303 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | on | 15/08/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 2304 | m/e | 12/1935 | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | m/e | 01/1950 | LIV | Brunswick |
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 2306 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | m/e | 01/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 2308 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | on | 15/08/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 2309 | m/e | 11/1935 | PBE | Peterborough East | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | on | 21/11/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 2315 | m/e | 11/1935 | PBE | Peterborough East | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | on | 18/07/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 2318 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | on | 21/11/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 2319 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | on | 18/07/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 2321 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | on | 12/10/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 2324 | m/e | 11/1935 | PBE | Peterborough East | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | on | 07/11/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 2332 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | m/e | 09/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 2333 | m/e | 12/1935 | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | on | 12/12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 2653 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 9G | Northwich | ||||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 2658 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | w/e | 23/10/1948 | NTH | Northwich | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 8547 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 8559 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9250 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | w/e | 27/11/1948 | GOR | Gorton | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9258 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 34E | New England | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9288 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9337 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 35A | New England | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9339 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 6F | Bidston | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 9342 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64879 | on | 27/04/1947 | GOR | Gorton | on | 12/06/1949 | LIV | on | 14/08/1949 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | 62020 | on | 01/08/1949 | GOR | Gorton (New) | on | 02/10/1949 | LIV | on | 16/10/1949 | GOR | Gorton |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41173 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | LIV | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 40936 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | LIV | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | 62304 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | Brunswick | m/e | 01/1950 | LIV | on | 16/01/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41118 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 8E | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41162 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 8E | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41118 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41162 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42949 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 8E | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40180 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | on | 24/07/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40180 | on | 24/07/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 8E | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 5E | Alsager |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40583 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40679 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40683 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58272 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58280 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58283 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58285 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58286 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58302 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58272 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58280 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58283 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58285 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58286 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 58302 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40203 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2E | Warwick | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40583 | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40679 | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 7D | Rhyl |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40683 | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40085 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40103 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 8E | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40127 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2D | Nuneaton | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44392 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47309 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47320 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44392 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8E | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44494 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | NTH | Northwich | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8E | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47309 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47320 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8E | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40085 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8E | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40127 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8E | on | 21/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44494 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 8E | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47327 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47327 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8E | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41115 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8E | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44308 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44421 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41116 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 68547 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | Brunswick | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 8E | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68071 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 8E | on | 04/02/1951 | 39A | Gorton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44064 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12D | Workington | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8E | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44396 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8E | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44438 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8E | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41152 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8E | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44064 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8E | Brunswick | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8E | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44396 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8E | Brunswick | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8E | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44438 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8E | Brunswick | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8E | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41152 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 8E | Brunswick | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 8E | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41170 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 8E | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41115 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 8E | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 7C | Holyhead |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41170 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 8E | Brunswick | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 8E | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68499 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 8E | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45217 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8E | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 16D | Annesley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45346 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 7C | Holyhead | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8E | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68499 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8E | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41151 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 8E | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41151 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 8E | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44760 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 8E | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44760 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 8E | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45333 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 8E | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42448 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 8E | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68559 | on | 01/01/1948 | LIV | Brunswick | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 8E | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42479 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 5D | Stoke | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 8E | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42664 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 8E | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42466 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 8E | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42598 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1C | Watford | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 8E | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42598 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 8E | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40118 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 8E | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 6K | Rhyl |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42584 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 8E | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42612 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 8E | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43864 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 8E | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43980 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 8E | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68499 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8E | Brunswick | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 8E | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 40A | Lincoln |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44489 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 8E | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 8E | Brunswick |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44489 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 8E | Brunswick | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 8E | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 65145 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 8E | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53E | Goole | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47566 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16B | Spital Bridge | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 8E | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 65166 | m/e | 01/1936 | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 8E | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 65196 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 8E | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53E | Goole |
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 65147 | m/e | 11/1935 | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 8E | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53E | Goole |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40093 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 2B | Nuneaton | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 8E | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42349 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 8E | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 18C | Hasland |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42352 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 6J | Holyhead | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 8E | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 18C | Hasland |
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 65185 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 8E | on | 03/12/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68559 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 8E | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42121 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 8E | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42597 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 8E | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 68547 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 8E | w/e | 21/04/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42628 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7B | Bangor | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 8E | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42445 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 8E | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42580 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 1E | Bletchley | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 8E | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42596 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 8E | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68598 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | TFDLMR | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 8E | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | |
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 68559 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 8E | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44341 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 9G | Northwich | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 8E | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43915 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 8E | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47367 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2D | Nuneaton | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 8E | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47325 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 8E | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47530 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 8E | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42445 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 6A | Chester (MR) | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 8E | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43910 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 8E | on | 05/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44015 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 8E | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44127 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19C | Canklow | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 8E | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44232 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19C | Canklow | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 8E | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44293 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 8E | w/e | 12/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44587 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 8E | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47228 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 8E | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 27E | Walton on the Hill |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47432 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 8E | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 14A | Cricklewood East |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42448 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 8E | Brunswick | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 8E | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48295 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8E | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 9K | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42319 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 9C | Macclesfield | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8E | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42356 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9C | Macclesfield | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8E | m/e | 10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42386 | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 9C | Macclesfield | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8E | m/e | 10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42423 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 9C | Macclesfield | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 8E | m/e | 10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44154 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 27F | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 18B | Westhouses |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44589 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 27F | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42183 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 27F | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45262 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 27F | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 15C | Leicester Midland |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47611 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 17B | Burton | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 27F | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45444 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 27F | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 16D | Annesley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42146 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 27F | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42050 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 27F | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44842 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 27F | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 27F | Brunswick |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44842 | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 27F | Brunswick | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 27F | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42186 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 18C | Hasland | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 27F | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42490 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 18C | Hasland | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 27F | on | 14/05/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44775 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 27F | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 21A | Saltley |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3855 | on | 10/10/1959 (New) | 27F | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3856 | on | 17/10/1959 (New) | 27F | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3857 | on | 24/10/1959 (New) | 27F | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42181 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 27F | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42137 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 27F | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45269 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 27F | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42628 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 27F | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42333 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 27F | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42339 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 27F | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44378 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 17E | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 27F | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44118 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 18B | Westhouses | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 27F | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 18B | Westhouses |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42113 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 03/06/1961 | 27F | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44804 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 27F | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 21A | Saltley |