Depot: Wolverton Works
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Wolverton Works | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2069 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40002 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6D | Chester Northgate | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | on | 07/11/1959 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47286 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 5C | Stafford | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40047 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 1A | Willesden | |
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 40006 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/02/1959 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 1A | Willesden | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47500 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 26/09/1959 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 1E | Bletchley | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47478 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | w/e | 03/10/1959 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47479 | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 87D | Swansea East Dock | w/e | 03/10/1959 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 5B | Crewe South | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47348 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 30/04/1960 | w/e | 08/09/1962 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47648 | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/02/1962 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 5B | Crewe South | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47659 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 24/02/1962 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47665 | w/e | 23/04/1949 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 24/02/1962 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 5C | Stafford | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47286 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 17/03/1962 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2E | Northampton | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47478 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 17/03/1962 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47479 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 17/03/1962 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47294 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 07/07/1962 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47318 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 07/07/1962 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47385 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 07/07/1962 | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47606 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 1C | Watford | w/e | 09/02/1963 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 1C | Watford | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47396 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 16/03/1963 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47451 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 24/08/1963 | m/e | 09/1965 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47341 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 14/03/1964 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47435 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/10/1965 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | D2709 | on | 16/08/1957 | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge (New) | w/e | 06/11/1965 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | Wolverton Works | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | D2726 | on | 30/07/1958 | 64A | St Margarets (New) | w/e | 06/11/1965 | on | 11/02/1967 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | D2732 | on | 03/10/1958 | 64A | St Margarets (New) | w/e | 06/11/1965 | on | 11/02/1967 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | D2733 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | w/e | 06/11/1965 | on | 11/02/1967 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | D2709 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | Wolverton Works | w/e | 13/11/1965 | on | 11/02/1967 | Withdrawn | |||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | D2903 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 30/04/1966 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | D2904 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 30/04/1966 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | D2905 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 30/04/1966 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | D2906 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 30/04/1966 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | 5A | Crewe Diesel | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3228 | on | 01/01/1956 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 17/09/1966 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 1E | Bletchley | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2236 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 08/10/1966 | on | 03/02/1968 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2385 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 08/10/1966 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 1E | Bletchley | |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2301 | on | 23/10/1960 | 40E | Colwick (New) | w/e | 07/01/1967 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 1E | Bletchley | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2383 | on | 16/11/1961 | 17A | Derby (New) | w/e | 03/02/1968 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | 1E | Bletchley |