Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2019 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19822 Week
» 72838 Month
» 192365 Year
» 3219218 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Canklow
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Canklow |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 19C | 1875 | 31/01/1958 | 41D | 01/02/1958 | 31/05/1965 |
|
Date Closed |
11/10/1965 |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the Rotherham (Masboro’)-Staveley
line about 2 miles south of Masboro’. The yard is visible from the line.
Go straight ahead out of Masboro’ Station along Station Road. Continue along Main Street passing Rotherham L.N.E. Station on the left,
and Westgate Station on the right. Turn right at the square into Westgate, and continue into Canklow Road. About 1¾ miles further on turn
right along Bawtry Road. Go under the railway bridge, and turn left
immediately into White Hall Lane. The shed entrance is on the left hand
side 300 yards further on. Walking time 60 minutes.
A bus labelled Canklow operates between the centre of Rotherham
and the end of Bawtry Road. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 19C | 01/02/1958 | Change of code to 41D | 11/10/1965 | Depot closed |
|
|
|