Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2644 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16050 Week
» 69066 Month
» 188593 Year
» 3215446 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Alsager
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Alsager |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 15A | 01/01/1875 | 31/12/1922 | W15A | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1935 | 5E | 01/01/1923 | 18/06/1962 |
|
Date Closed |
18/06/1962 |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the line, east of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Turn left outside the station along a road running parallel to the
line. A cinder path leads across a field to the shed, from the left hand
side of this road. Walking time 5 minutes. |
Web Link |
http://www.steamsheds.co.uk/pmwiki/index.php?n=Sheds.ALSAGER |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 5E | 18/06/1962 | Depot closed |
|
|
|