Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 4315 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17721 Week
» 70737 Month
» 190264 Year
» 3217117 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Dundee Tay Bridge
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | DEE | 01/01/1878 | 31/01/1950 | 62B | 01/02/1950 | 01/05/1967 |
|
Date Opened |
01/01/1878 |
Date Closed |
01/05/1967 |
Pre Grouping Company |
NBR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ScR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the north side of the line east of Dundee Tay Bridge
Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside Dundee West Station and follow the road round
to the right past both entrances to Dundee Tay Bridge Station. This
road leads into the L.N.E. goods yard. Turn right over the bridge in
the goods yard, and left along a cobbled way that leads to the shed.
Walking time 5 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 01/01/1878 | Depot opened | 01/01/1878 | Change of code to DEE | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 62B | 01/05/1967 | Depot closed |
|
|
|