Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 958 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18761 Week
» 71777 Month
» 191304 Year
» 3218157 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Eastfield
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Eastfield |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | EFD | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 65A | 01/02/1950 | 05/05/1973 | ED | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Opened |
09/1904 |
Date Closed |
1992 |
Pre Grouping Company |
NBL |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ScR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the line north of Cowlairs Station.
The yard is visible from the line.
Go straight ahead along Cowlairs Street from Cowlairs Station. Turn
left into Springburn Road, and left into Hawthorn Street. A cinder path
leads to the shed from the right hand side of this road just before the
railway over-bridge. Walking time 20 minutes. See also under Glasgow.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to EFD | 09/1904 | Depot opened | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 65A | 11/1966 | Closed to steam locomotives | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to ED | 1992 | Depot closed |
|
|
|