Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 4202 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17608 Week
» 70624 Month
» 190151 Year
» 3217004 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Marylebone
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Marylebone |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 14F | 01/06/1961 | 31/08/1963 | 1D | 01/09/1963 | 05/05/1973 | ME | 06/05/1973 | |
|
Date Opened |
1897 |
Pre Grouping Company |
GCR |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1897 | Depot opened | 01/06/1961 | Change of code to 14F | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 1D | 06/05/1973 | Change of code to ME |
|
|
|