Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 4177 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17583 Week
» 70599 Month
» 190126 Year
» 3216979 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Bank Hall
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Bank Hall |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 23A | 1875 | 31/05/1950 | 27A | 01/06/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 8K | 01/09/1963 | 10/10/1966 |
|
Date Opened |
1850 |
Date Closed |
10/10/1966 |
Pre Grouping Company |
LYR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west Side of the Liverpool-Ormskirk line between
Sandhills and Walton Junction stations. The yard is partially visible
from the line.
Bank Hall Station which is on the Liverpool-Southport line is at
the corner of Stanley Road and Bank Hall Street. The shed entrance is
a gate in some hoardings on the opposite side of Stanley Road to the
station. Walking time less than 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1850 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 23A | 01/06/1950 | Change of code to 27A | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 8K | 10/10/1966 | Depot closed |
|
|
|