Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1443 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19246 Week
» 72262 Month
» 191789 Year
» 3218642 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Northwich
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Northwich |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | NTH | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 13D | 01/02/1950 | 21/05/1950 | 39J | 01/02/1950 | 21/05/1950 | 9G | 22/05/1950 | 31/03/1958 | 8E | 01/04/1958 | 29/02/1968 |
|
Date Closed |
04/03/1968 |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
Information |
Merged with NER shed NTH |
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the east side of the station. The yard is visible
from the line.
Go straight ahead outside the station along the approach road.
Turn sharp left into Middlewich Road, and cross the railway bridge.
The shed entrance is on the left, just past the railway bridge. Walking
time 5 minutes.
|
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to NTH | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 13D | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 39J | 01/05/1950 | Change of code to 9G | 01/04/1958 | Change of code to 8E | 04/03/1968 | Depot closed |
|
|
|