Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1690 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19493 Week
» 72509 Month
» 192036 Year
» 3218889 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Oban
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Oban |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 29E | 30/06/1880 | 31/12/1939 | 31C | 01/01/1940 | 31/01/1950 | 63E | 01/02/1950 | 30/04/1955 | 63D | 01/05/1955 | 31/10/1959 | 63C | 01/11/1959 | 30/04/1963 |
|
Date Opened |
30/06/1880 |
Date Closed |
06/05/1963 |
Pre Grouping Company |
C&OR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
ScR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the side of a goods spur. The yard is not visible
from the line.
Turn right outside the station across Argyll Square. Turn right into
High Street, and continue into Glenshellach Terrace. The shed
entrance is on the left hand side. Walking time 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 31C | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 63E | 01/05/1955 | Change of code to 63D | 01/11/1959 | Change of code to 63C |
|
|
|