Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 5 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17808 Week
» 70824 Month
» 190351 Year
» 3217204 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Oxenholme
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Oxenholme |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 11D | 01/01/1923 | 31/01/1950 | 11C | 01/02/1950 | 31/05/1960 | 12G | 01/06/1960 | 31/12/1962 |
|
Date Opened |
1880 |
Date Closed |
18/06/1962 |
Pre Grouping Company |
LNWR |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
LMR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the west side of the line south of the station. The
yard is Visible from the line.
Leave the station by the main exit on the east side. Turn right up
the approach road, and right at the end crossing the railway. The shed
entrance is on the left just past the bridge. Walking time less than 5
mmutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1880 | Depot opened | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 11C | 01/06/1960 | Change of code to 12G | 18/06/1962 | Depot closed |
|
|
|