Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1219 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19022 Week
» 72038 Month
» 191565 Year
» 3218418 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Barnstaple Junction
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Barnstaple Junction |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | BPL | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 72E | 01/02/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 83F | 01/09/1963 | 31/08/1964 |
|
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the east side of the line at the south end of
Barnstaple Junction Station. The yard is visible from the line.
The shed entrance is in the station yard. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to BPL | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 72E | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 83F |
|
|
|