Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2800 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16206 Week
» 69222 Month
» 188749 Year
» 3215602 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Salisbury
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Salisbury |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | SAL | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 72B | 01/02/1950 | 29/12/1962 | 70E | 30/12/1962 | 30/06/1967 |
|
Date Closed |
09/07/1967 |
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the line west of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Cross the station yard, and descend a flight of steps between two
long huts. Turn right at the bottom of the steps into Churchfields Road.
Continue parallel to the railway, and the shed entrance is on the right
hand side at the corner of Cherry Orchard Lane. Walking time 10
minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to SAL | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 72B | 30/12/1962 | Change of code to 70E | 09/07/1967 | Depot closed |
|
|
|