Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 2101 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19904 Week
» 72920 Month
» 192447 Year
» 3219300 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Sunderland
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Sunderland |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | SUN | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 54A | 01/02/1950 | 30/09/1958 | 52G | 01/10/1958 | 31/08/1967 |
|
Date Opened |
1857 |
Date Closed |
17/09/1967 |
Pre Grouping Company |
NER |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
NE |
Information |
|
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the end of a spur by the docks.
Turn right outside Sunderland Station into High Street West.
Continue into High Street East, and fork right into Warren Street.
Turn right into Barrack Street, and left into Prospect Row. The shed
is on the right hand side. Walking time 20 minutes.
|
Web Link |
http://www.steamsheds.co.uk/pmwiki/index.php?n=Sheds.SUNDERLANDSOUTHDOCK |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1857 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to SUN | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 54A | 01/10/1958 | Change of code to 52G | 17/09/1967 | Depot closed |
|
|
|