Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3491 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16897 Week
» 69913 Month
» 189440 Year
» 3216293 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Tonbridge
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Tonbridge |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | TON | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 74D | 01/02/1950 | 30/09/1958 | 73J | 01/10/1958 | 31/12/1964 |
|
Big 4 Company |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is in the fork of the Tunbridge Wells and Ashford lines
at the east end of the station. The yard is visible from both lines.
Leave the station by the main exit, and turn right over the bridge.
Turn left into Priory Road. The shed entrance is a gate on the left
hand side. Walking time 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to TON | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 74D | 01/10/1958 | Change of code to 73J |
|
|
|