Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 6 Online
» 288 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18091 Week
» 71107 Month
» 190634 Year
» 3217487 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Tredegar
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Tredegar |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 4E | 01/01/1923 | 31/12/1948 | 86K | 01/11/1954 | 31/05/1960 |
|
Date Opened |
1863 |
Date Closed |
11/06/1960 |
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
British Railways Region |
WR |
Information |
Changed hands from ex-LMS/LMR to WR in January 1949. |
1947 Directions |
The shed is at the south end of Tredegar Station on the west side of the line. The yard is visible from the line. The shed entrance is a gate in the station yard. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1863 | Depot opened | 01/01/1935 | Change of code to 4E | 01/11/1954 | Change of code to 86K | 11/06/1960 | Depot closed |
|
|
|