Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 2108 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19911 Week
» 72927 Month
» 192454 Year
» 3219307 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Wigan Central (L&Y)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | 23D | 1875 | 31/05/1950 | 27D | 01/06/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 8P | 01/09/1963 | 31/03/1964 |
|
Big 4 Company |
LMS |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the Southport line-west of Wigan
Central Station. The yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside Wigan North Western Station along Wallgate,
and turn left into King Street West, passing Wigan Wallgate Station on
the left. Bear left into Dorning Street, and turn left into Frog Lane.
Turn left into Prescott Street, and right into Cricket Street. The shed
entrance is a door at the end of this short cul-de-sac. Walking time 10
minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to 23D | 01/06/1950 | Change of code to 27D | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 8P |
|
|
|