Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2623 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16029 Week
» 69045 Month
» 188572 Year
» 3215425 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Yeovil Town
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Yeovil Town |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | YEO | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 72C | 01/02/1950 | 31/08/1963 | 83E | 01/09/1963 | 31/05/1965 |
|
Date Opened |
19/07/1860 |
Date Closed |
06/1965 |
Pre Grouping Company |
EYR |
Big 4 Company |
SR |
British Railways Region |
SR |
1947 Directions |
The shed is on the south side of the line west of the station. The
yard is visible from the line.
Turn right outside the station, and right again over the railway
bridge. The shed entrance is on the right hand side just past the bridge.
Walking time 5 minutes. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1875 | Change of code to YEO | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 72C | 01/09/1963 | Change of code to 83E |
|
|
|