Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 295 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18098 Week
» 71114 Month
» 190641 Year
» 3217494 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Aylesbury (GWR)
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Aylesbury (GWR) |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | pdn (11) | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 81a | 01/02/1950 | 16/06/1962 |
|
Date Opened |
01/10/1863 |
Date Closed |
16/06/1962 |
Pre Grouping Company |
GWR |
Big 4 Company |
GWR |
British Railways Region |
WR |
GWR Division |
LONDON |
Information |
Originally opened by the Wycombe Railway in 1863. Latterly a sub-shed of Old Oak Common, supplied with locomotives from Old Oak, Banbury and Slough. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 01/10/1863 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to 11 | 16/06/1962 | Depot closed |
|
|
|