Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1294 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19097 Week
» 72113 Month
» 191640 Year
» 3218493 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Pickering
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Pickering |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | MALs | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 50Fs | 01/02/1950 | 06/04/1959 |
|
Date Opened |
07/07/1845 |
Date Closed |
06/04/1959 |
Pre Grouping Company |
NER |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
Information |
Originally opened by the York and North Midland Railway. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 07/07/1845 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to MALs | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 50Fs | 06/04/1959 | Depot closed |
|
|
|