Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1579 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14985 Week
» 68001 Month
» 187528 Year
» 3214381 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Depot: Middleton in Teesdale
Depot Details
Depot Name |
Middleton in Teesdale |
Depot Codes |
Code | From | To | Dar | 1875 | 31/01/1950 | 51a | 01/02/1950 | 15/09/1957 |
|
Date Opened |
1869 |
Date Closed |
16/09/1957 |
Pre Grouping Company |
NER |
Big 4 Company |
LNER |
British Railways Region |
ER |
Information |
Opened by the Tees Valley Railway but operated by the NER until absorbtion in 1882. |
Popup Maps (New Window) |
25 Inch (1892-1914) OS (1:25,000) (1937-1961) OS 7th Series 1 inch (1:63,360) |
Chronology |
Date | Event | 1869 | Depot opened | 1875 | Change of code to Dar | 01/02/1950 | Change of code to 51a | 16/09/1957 | Depot closed |
|
|
|