Scrapyard: Cashmore's Newport
Type | Company | Class | Wheels | Number when Cut | Date Built | Date Withdrawn | Service (yrs) | Awaiting Scrap (yrs) | Depot on Withdrawal | Date Scrapped | Age (yrs) | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 4037 | 30/12/1910 | 17/09/1962 | 51.751 | 83C | Exeter | |||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 4077 | 10/02/1924 | 02/08/1962 | 38.501 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | |||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 4358 | 04/1914 | 11/08/1959 | 45.353 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4576 | 02/1927 | 18/09/1958 | 31.611 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4579 | 02/1927 | 08/09/1958 | 31.584 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5156 | 15/03/1930 | 09/09/1958 | 28.507 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5173 | 12/1930 | 17/08/1962 | 31.693 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 5306 | 01/1917 | 06/07/1964 | 47.504 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 5351 | 08/1918 | 13/06/1961 | 42.858 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 5357 | 09/1918 | 21/09/1962 | 44.047 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 5369 | 06/1919 | 20/11/1963 | 44.463 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 5378 | 08/1919 | 14/09/1959 | 40.110 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 5380 | 04/1920 | 23/09/1963 | 43.468 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 5385 | 08/1920 | 13/07/1962 | 41.937 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 5398 | 11/1920 | 23/02/1959 | 38.299 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5502 | 05/1927 | 14/07/1958 | 31.186 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 5797 | 11/1930 | 29/09/1958 | 27.890 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 6000 | 4-6-0 | 6009 | 03/1928 | 21/09/1962 | 34.542 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 6000 | 4-6-0 | 6019 | 07/1928 | 21/09/1962 | 34.208 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 6000 | 4-6-0 | 6021 | 06/1930 | 21/09/1962 | 32.290 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 6000 | 4-6-0 | 6029 | 08/1930 | 24/07/1962 | 31.962 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6146 | 12/1932 | 21/09/1962 | 29.786 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6304 | 12/1920 | 15/01/1964 | 43.112 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6308 | 01/1921 | 24/08/1959 | 38.630 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6310 | 01/1921 | 05/07/1962 | 41.496 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6312 | 01/1921 | 21/09/1962 | 41.710 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6316 | 01/1921 | 25/07/1962 | 41.551 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6317 | 01/1921 | 20/11/1963 | 42.874 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6320 | 02/1921 | 20/11/1963 | 42.789 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6330 | 04/1921 | 21/09/1962 | 41.463 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6335 | 05/1921 | 02/07/1963 | 42.159 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6340 | 06/1921 | 13/07/1962 | 41.104 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6346 | 04/1923 | 07/09/1964 | 41.427 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6353 | 09/1923 | 24/05/1963 | 39.715 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6356 | 11/1923 | 14/01/1963 | 39.192 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6357 | 11/1923 | 13/07/1964 | 40.688 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6359 | 11/1923 | 07/09/1959 | 35.836 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6362 | 04/1925 | 01/09/1962 | 37.405 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6366 | 10/1925 | 17/09/1962 | 36.948 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6379 | 07/1921 | 26/08/1963 | 42.142 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 6390 | 10/1921 | 14/05/1962 | 40.605 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 7305 | 11/1921 | 17/09/1962 | 40.866 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 7306 | 11/1921 | 01/09/1964 | 42.825 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 7307 | 11/1921 | 01/06/1964 | 42.573 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 7311 | 12/1921 | 17/09/1962 | 40.784 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 7316 | 12/1921 | 17/09/1962 | 40.784 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 7320 | 04/1925 | 06/11/1964 | 39.589 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 4300 | 2-6-0 | 7332 | 03/1932 | 08/04/1964 | 32.088 | |||||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 2808 | 10/1905 | 21/09/1959 | 53.970 | 0.233 | 12/1959 | 54.203 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 2810 | 10/1905 | 11/09/1959 | 53.942 | 0.260 | 12/1959 | 54.203 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 2824 | 01/1907 | 20/08/1959 | 52.630 | 0.321 | 12/1959 | 52.951 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 2826 | 01/1907 | 22/09/1959 | 52.721 | 0.230 | 12/1959 | 52.951 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 4212 | 08/1912 | 15/06/1959 | 46.863 | 0.707 | 28/02/1960 | 47.570 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 4260 | 05/1917 | 15/06/1959 | 42.112 | 0.707 | 28/02/1960 | 42.819 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5163 | 08/12/1930 | 02/11/1959 | 28.921 | 0.323 | 28/02/1960 | 29.244 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4500 | 2-6-2T | 4547 | 12/1914 | 08/02/1960 | 45.181 | 0.266 | 05/1960 | 45.447 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4577 | 02/1927 | 02/11/1959 | 32.734 | 0.534 | 05/1960 | 33.268 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5559 | 11/1928 | 04/01/1960 | 31.156 | 0.447 | 06/1960 | 31.603 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1400 | 0-4-2T | 1448 | 25/04/1935 | 30/06/1960 | 25.200 | 0.293 | 10/1960 | 25.493 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1400 | 0-4-2T | 1449 | 26/04/1935 | 30/06/1960 | 25.197 | 0.293 | 10/1960 | 25.490 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1400 | 0-4-2T | 1452 | 12/07/1935 | 30/06/1960 | 24.986 | 0.293 | 10/1960 | 25.279 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1400 | 0-4-2T | 1464 | 17/02/1936 | 30/06/1960 | 24.384 | 0.293 | 10/1960 | 24.677 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6400 | 0-6-0PT | 6401 | 02/1932 | 30/06/1960 | 28.392 | 0.293 | 10/1960 | 28.685 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 6702 | 03/1930 | 18/07/1960 | 30.364 | 0.244 | 10/1960 | 30.608 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 6712 | 06/1930 | 18/07/1960 | 30.112 | 0.244 | 10/1960 | 30.356 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 6719 | 08/1930 | 18/07/1960 | 29.945 | 0.244 | 10/1960 | 30.189 | ||
Steam | GWR | 7400 | 0-6-0PT | 7400 | 30/07/1936 | 30/06/1960 | 23.934 | 0.293 | 10/1960 | 24.227 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7726 | 12/1929 | 19/08/1960 | 30.699 | 0.156 | 10/1960 | 30.855 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7781 | 11/1930 | 18/07/1960 | 29.693 | 0.244 | 10/1960 | 29.937 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 6751 | 28/06/1947 | 29/08/1960 | 13.181 | 0.296 | 12/1960 | 13.477 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 6756 | 29/08/1947 | 11/07/1960 | 12.877 | 0.430 | 12/1960 | 13.307 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 6766 | 31/01/1949 | 01/08/1960 | 11.507 | 0.373 | 12/1960 | 11.879 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 6779 | 12/12/1950 | 22/06/1959 | 8.532 | 1.485 | 12/1960 | 10.016 | ||
Steam | GWR | 7400 | 0-6-0PT | 7419 | 05/01/1937 | 21/07/1960 | 23.556 | 0.403 | 12/1960 | 23.959 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7708 | 03/1930 | 20/06/1960 | 30.288 | 0.488 | 12/1960 | 30.775 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7709 | 03/1930 | 29/08/1960 | 30.479 | 0.296 | 12/1960 | 30.775 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8421 | 24/07/1950 | 21/12/1959 | 9.416 | 0.986 | 12/1960 | 10.403 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8423 | 06/10/1950 | 24/12/1959 | 9.222 | 0.978 | 12/1960 | 10.200 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8432 | 23/02/1953 | 28/07/1959 | 6.427 | 1.386 | 12/1960 | 7.814 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8434 | 26/02/1953 | 15/06/1959 | 6.301 | 1.504 | 12/1960 | 7.805 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8442 | 26/03/1954 | 15/06/1959 | 5.225 | 1.504 | 12/1960 | 6.729 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8443 | 25/03/1954 | 22/06/1959 | 5.247 | 1.485 | 12/1960 | 6.732 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8447 | 21/07/1954 | 15/06/1959 | 4.904 | 1.504 | 12/1960 | 6.408 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8448 | 30/06/1954 | 17/08/1959 | 5.134 | 1.332 | 12/1960 | 6.466 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8450 | 30/08/1949 | 22/06/1959 | 9.816 | 1.485 | 12/1960 | 11.301 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8455 | 06/01/1950 | 11/01/1960 | 10.019 | 0.929 | 12/1960 | 10.948 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8462 | 27/07/1950 | 17/08/1959 | 9.063 | 1.332 | 12/1960 | 10.395 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8463 | 22/09/1950 | 11/01/1960 | 9.310 | 0.929 | 12/1960 | 10.238 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8485 | 13/06/1952 | 22/06/1959 | 7.027 | 1.485 | 12/1960 | 8.512 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8492 | 21/08/1952 | 15/06/1959 | 6.819 | 1.504 | 12/1960 | 8.323 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9402 | 12/04/1947 | 01/09/1959 | 12.397 | 1.290 | 12/1960 | 13.688 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9403 | 29/03/1947 | 08/06/1959 | 12.203 | 1.523 | 12/1960 | 13.726 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9417 | 10/05/1950 | 08/06/1959 | 9.085 | 1.523 | 12/1960 | 10.608 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9427 | 18/09/1950 | 15/06/1959 | 8.745 | 1.504 | 12/1960 | 10.249 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9428 | 29/09/1950 | 30/06/1960 | 9.759 | 0.460 | 12/1960 | 10.219 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9432 | 27/11/1950 | 23/11/1959 | 8.995 | 1.063 | 12/1960 | 10.058 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9434 | 12/01/1951 | 30/06/1960 | 9.471 | 0.460 | 12/1960 | 9.932 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4575 | 02/1927 | 15/08/1960 | 33.521 | 0.419 | 01/1961 | 33.940 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4589 | 03/1927 | 21/09/1960 | 33.545 | 0.318 | 01/1961 | 33.863 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5529 | 05/1928 | 01/08/1960 | 32.236 | 0.458 | 01/1961 | 32.693 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5534 | 06/1928 | 21/09/1960 | 32.290 | 0.318 | 01/1961 | 32.608 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5540 | 07/1928 | 15/08/1960 | 32.107 | 0.419 | 01/1961 | 32.526 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5551 | 10/1928 | 04/01/1960 | 31.241 | 1.033 | 01/1961 | 32.274 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5565 | 01/1929 | 16/09/1960 | 31.690 | 0.332 | 01/1961 | 32.022 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 5759 | 05/1929 | 23/09/1960 | 31.381 | 0.312 | 01/1961 | 31.693 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7757 | 12/1930 | 23/09/1960 | 29.795 | 0.312 | 01/1961 | 30.107 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3638 | 30/09/1939 | 12/01/1961 | 21.301 | 0.255 | 04/1961 | 21.556 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3649 | 25/11/1939 | 12/01/1961 | 21.148 | 0.255 | 04/1961 | 21.403 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3704 | 08/10/1936 | 12/01/1961 | 24.279 | 0.255 | 04/1961 | 24.534 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3799 | 06/12/1938 | 13/01/1961 | 22.121 | 0.252 | 04/1961 | 22.373 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 6752 | 04/07/1947 | 12/01/1961 | 13.537 | 0.255 | 04/1961 | 13.792 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 6761 | 04/11/1948 | 12/01/1961 | 12.197 | 0.255 | 04/1961 | 12.452 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 6776 | 27/11/1950 | 12/01/1961 | 10.134 | 0.255 | 04/1961 | 10.389 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7704 | 02/1930 | 23/12/1960 | 30.874 | 0.310 | 04/1961 | 31.184 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7740 | 01/1930 | 23/12/1960 | 30.959 | 0.310 | 04/1961 | 31.268 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7794 | 12/1930 | 24/10/1960 | 29.879 | 0.474 | 04/1961 | 30.353 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8406 | 21/12/1949 | 12/01/1961 | 11.068 | 0.255 | 04/1961 | 11.323 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8476 | 06/03/1952 | 12/01/1961 | 8.860 | 0.255 | 04/1961 | 9.115 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9458 | 22/10/1951 | 12/01/1961 | 9.233 | 0.255 | 04/1961 | 9.488 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9701 | 15/09/1933 | 13/01/1961 | 27.348 | 0.252 | 04/1961 | 27.600 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9795 | 09/09/1936 | 29/11/1960 | 24.238 | 0.375 | 04/1961 | 24.614 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6400 | 0-6-0PT | 6426 | 11/11/1935 | 22/03/1961 | 25.378 | 0.233 | 06/1961 | 25.611 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8424 | 05/12/1950 | 17/01/1961 | 10.126 | 0.408 | 06/1961 | 10.534 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3676 | 25/06/1940 | 15/05/1961 | 20.901 | 0.252 | 08/1961 | 21.153 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3724 | 20/02/1937 | 15/05/1961 | 24.247 | 0.252 | 08/1961 | 24.499 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9762 | 23/09/1935 | 09/05/1961 | 25.644 | 0.268 | 08/1961 | 25.912 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3657 | 18/01/1940 | 15/05/1961 | 21.337 | 0.337 | 09/1961 | 21.674 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7700 | 03/1930 | 15/05/1961 | 31.189 | 0.337 | 09/1961 | 31.526 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7761 | 12/1930 | 23/01/1961 | 30.129 | 0.644 | 09/1961 | 30.773 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8705 | 02/1931 | 27/04/1961 | 30.216 | 0.386 | 09/1961 | 30.603 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8722 | 04/1931 | 27/04/1961 | 30.055 | 0.386 | 09/1961 | 30.441 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8796 | 16/03/1934 | 27/04/1961 | 27.134 | 0.386 | 09/1961 | 27.521 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9771 | 06/03/1936 | 31/05/1961 | 25.252 | 0.293 | 09/1961 | 25.545 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9781 | 24/06/1936 | 15/05/1961 | 24.907 | 0.337 | 09/1961 | 25.244 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8782 | 17/01/1934 | 14/11/1961 | 27.844 | 0.255 | 02/1962 | 28.099 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1600 | 0-6-0PT | 1606 | 03/11/1949 | 27/09/1961 | 11.907 | 0.463 | 03/1962 | 12.370 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4500 | 2-6-2T | 4565 | 10/1924 | 03/10/1961 | 36.992 | 0.447 | 03/1962 | 37.438 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5515 | 11/1927 | 21/11/1961 | 34.041 | 0.312 | 03/1962 | 34.353 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 5756 | 05/1929 | 05/09/1961 | 32.332 | 0.523 | 03/1962 | 32.855 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6400 | 0-6-0PT | 6415 | 20/11/1934 | 02/11/1961 | 26.970 | 0.364 | 03/1962 | 27.334 | ||
Steam | GWR | 7400 | 0-6-0PT | 7417 | 01/01/1937 | 14/09/1961 | 24.718 | 0.499 | 03/1962 | 25.216 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4500 | 2-6-2T | 4549 | 05/1915 | 12/12/1961 | 46.611 | 0.340 | 04/1962 | 46.951 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7771 | 03/1931 | 24/11/1961 | 30.718 | 0.389 | 04/1962 | 31.107 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7772 | 03/1931 | 16/11/1961 | 30.696 | 0.411 | 04/1962 | 31.107 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8441 | 08/04/1954 | 05/12/1961 | 7.666 | 0.359 | 04/1962 | 8.025 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8760 | 19/10/1933 | 08/01/1962 | 28.241 | 0.266 | 04/1962 | 28.507 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9454 | 05/09/1951 | 08/01/1962 | 10.351 | 0.266 | 04/1962 | 10.616 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9720 | 30/11/1934 | 22/11/1961 | 26.997 | 0.395 | 04/1962 | 27.392 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9765 | 28/09/1935 | 04/12/1961 | 26.203 | 0.362 | 04/1962 | 26.564 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3614 | 18/03/1939 | 14/03/1962 | 23.005 | 0.170 | 05/1962 | 23.175 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3656 | 13/01/1940 | 20/02/1962 | 22.121 | 0.230 | 05/1962 | 22.351 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 5770 | 09/1929 | 20/12/1961 | 32.285 | 0.400 | 05/1962 | 32.685 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 5783 | 12/1929 | 13/03/1962 | 32.263 | 0.173 | 05/1962 | 32.436 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8711 | 03/1931 | 15/03/1962 | 31.022 | 0.167 | 05/1962 | 31.189 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8736 | 04/1931 | 13/03/1962 | 30.932 | 0.173 | 05/1962 | 31.104 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5509 | 10/1927 | 21/12/1961 | 34.208 | 0.482 | 06/1962 | 34.690 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5549 | 10/1928 | 08/01/1962 | 33.255 | 0.433 | 06/1962 | 33.688 | ||
Steam | GWR | 7400 | 0-6-0PT | 7406 | 15/08/1936 | 05/03/1962 | 25.570 | 0.279 | 06/1962 | 25.849 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7718 | 05/1930 | 13/04/1962 | 31.934 | 0.173 | 06/1962 | 32.107 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3645 | 10/11/1939 | 21/05/1962 | 22.542 | 0.236 | 08/1962 | 22.778 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3684 | 27/07/1940 | 21/05/1962 | 21.830 | 0.236 | 08/1962 | 22.066 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3640 | 11/10/1939 | 01/05/1962 | 22.570 | 0.375 | 09/1962 | 22.945 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3697 | 05/09/1941 | 21/05/1962 | 20.721 | 0.321 | 09/1962 | 21.041 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3703 | 03/10/1936 | 21/05/1962 | 25.647 | 0.321 | 09/1962 | 25.967 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4685 | 09/12/1944 | 21/05/1962 | 17.458 | 0.321 | 09/1962 | 17.778 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1400 | 0-4-2T | 1434 | 27/07/1934 | 04/07/1962 | 27.956 | 0.200 | 09/1962 | 28.156 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5052 | 15/05/1936 | 21/09/1962 | 26.370 | -0.016 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 09/1962 | 26.353 |
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5661 | 02/1926 | 27/07/1962 | 36.468 | 0.137 | 09/1962 | 36.605 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7721 | 06/1930 | 13/07/1962 | 32.099 | 0.175 | 09/1962 | 32.274 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7755 | 12/1930 | 04/05/1962 | 31.405 | 0.367 | 09/1962 | 31.773 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8440 | 04/03/1954 | 13/07/1962 | 8.364 | 0.175 | 09/1962 | 8.540 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8741 | 05/1931 | 04/05/1962 | 30.992 | 0.367 | 09/1962 | 31.359 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8761 | 28/10/1933 | 14/05/1962 | 28.562 | 0.340 | 09/1962 | 28.901 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8790 | 22/02/1934 | 15/05/1962 | 28.244 | 0.337 | 09/1962 | 28.581 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9409 | 28/05/1947 | 21/05/1962 | 14.992 | 0.321 | 09/1962 | 15.312 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9709 | 05/12/1933 | 21/05/1962 | 28.477 | 0.321 | 09/1962 | 28.797 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9728 | 14/12/1934 | 21/05/1962 | 27.452 | 0.321 | 09/1962 | 27.773 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9758 | 26/06/1935 | 07/05/1962 | 26.882 | 0.359 | 09/1962 | 27.241 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3624 | 26/05/1939 | 21/05/1962 | 23.003 | 0.403 | 10/1962 | 23.405 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3718 | 02/02/1937 | 15/05/1962 | 25.296 | 0.419 | 10/1962 | 25.715 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3743 | 29/09/1937 | 15/05/1962 | 24.641 | 0.419 | 10/1962 | 25.060 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3774 | 26/05/1938 | 21/05/1962 | 24.003 | 0.403 | 10/1962 | 24.405 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 4085 | 10/06/1925 | 02/05/1962 | 36.918 | 0.455 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 10/1962 | 37.373 |
Steam | GWR | 4500 | 2-6-2T | 4558 | 09/1924 | 24/07/1962 | 37.879 | 0.227 | 10/1962 | 38.107 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5600 | 12/1924 | 27/07/1962 | 37.638 | 0.219 | 10/1962 | 37.858 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5657 | 02/1926 | 27/07/1962 | 36.468 | 0.219 | 10/1962 | 36.688 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5663 | 02/1926 | 03/08/1962 | 36.488 | 0.200 | 10/1962 | 36.688 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 5728 | 02/1929 | 07/05/1962 | 33.244 | 0.441 | 10/1962 | 33.685 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5913 | 06/1931 | 14/05/1962 | 30.934 | 0.422 | 10/1962 | 31.356 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7786 | 12/1930 | 14/05/1962 | 31.433 | 0.422 | 10/1962 | 31.855 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8422 | 06/10/1950 | 24/07/1962 | 11.805 | 0.227 | 10/1962 | 12.033 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9467 | 21/02/1952 | 21/05/1962 | 10.252 | 0.403 | 10/1962 | 10.655 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9497 | 09/12/1954 | 21/05/1962 | 7.452 | 0.403 | 10/1962 | 7.855 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9643 | 09/04/1946 | 22/05/1962 | 16.129 | 0.400 | 10/1962 | 16.529 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9723 | 06/12/1934 | 24/07/1962 | 27.649 | 0.227 | 10/1962 | 27.877 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9750 | 22/05/1935 | 14/05/1962 | 26.997 | 0.422 | 10/1962 | 27.419 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9783 | 01/07/1936 | 21/05/1962 | 25.904 | 0.403 | 10/1962 | 26.307 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2240 | 01/12/1944 | 22/06/1962 | 17.567 | 0.400 | 11/1962 | 17.967 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2255 | 03/1930 | 08/05/1962 | 32.170 | 0.523 | 11/1962 | 32.693 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3722 | 12/02/1937 | 21/05/1962 | 25.285 | 0.488 | 11/1962 | 25.773 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 4086 | 20/06/1925 | 03/04/1962 | 36.811 | 0.619 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 11/1962 | 37.430 |
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4968 | 12/1929 | 13/07/1962 | 32.597 | 0.342 | 11/1962 | 32.940 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5036 | 28/05/1935 | 17/09/1962 | 27.326 | 0.162 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 11/1962 | 27.488 |
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5188 | 04/1931 | 19/07/1962 | 31.282 | 0.326 | 11/1962 | 31.608 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 5758 | 05/1929 | 15/05/1962 | 33.022 | 0.504 | 11/1962 | 33.526 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 6778 | 07/12/1950 | 04/05/1962 | 11.414 | 0.534 | 11/1962 | 11.948 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7729 | 12/1929 | 13/07/1962 | 32.597 | 0.342 | 11/1962 | 32.940 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7736 | 12/1929 | 14/05/1962 | 32.433 | 0.507 | 11/1962 | 32.940 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8719 | 03/1931 | 14/05/1962 | 31.186 | 0.507 | 11/1962 | 31.693 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9433 | 08/12/1950 | 13/07/1962 | 11.603 | 0.342 | 11/1962 | 11.945 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9487 | 14/11/1952 | 13/07/1962 | 9.666 | 0.342 | 11/1962 | 10.008 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9702 | 22/09/1933 | 07/05/1962 | 28.641 | 0.526 | 11/1962 | 29.167 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2223 | 29/08/1940 | 11/05/1962 | 21.712 | 0.597 | 12/1962 | 22.310 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5003 | 28/05/1927 | 29/08/1962 | 35.279 | 0.296 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 12/1962 | 35.575 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5007 | 30/06/1927 | 05/09/1962 | 35.208 | 0.277 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 12/1962 | 35.485 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5012 | 27/07/1927 | 24/04/1962 | 34.767 | 0.644 | 81F | Oxford | 12/1962 | 35.411 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5017 | 11/07/1932 | 21/09/1962 | 30.216 | 0.233 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 12/1962 | 30.449 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5024 | 18/04/1934 | 21/05/1962 | 28.110 | 0.570 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 12/1962 | 28.679 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5035 | 21/05/1935 | 17/05/1962 | 27.008 | 0.581 | 82C | Swindon | 12/1962 | 27.589 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5053 | 29/05/1936 | 13/07/1962 | 26.140 | 0.425 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 12/1962 | 26.564 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5061 | 09/06/1937 | 21/09/1962 | 25.301 | 0.233 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 12/1962 | 25.534 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5064 | 26/06/1937 | 21/09/1962 | 25.255 | 0.233 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 12/1962 | 25.488 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5075 | 03/08/1938 | 21/09/1962 | 24.151 | 0.233 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 12/1962 | 24.384 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5090 | 02/1923 | 31/05/1962 | 39.315 | 0.542 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 12/1962 | 39.858 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5094 | 16/06/1939 | 21/09/1962 | 23.282 | 0.233 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 12/1962 | 23.515 |
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8731 | 02/1931 | 13/07/1962 | 31.427 | 0.425 | 12/1962 | 31.852 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8771 | 01/01/1934 | 13/07/1962 | 28.548 | 0.425 | 12/1962 | 28.973 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9407 | 15/05/1947 | 13/07/1962 | 15.173 | 0.425 | 12/1962 | 15.597 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9410 | 03/02/1950 | 13/07/1962 | 12.447 | 0.425 | 12/1962 | 12.871 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9722 | 04/12/1934 | 13/07/1962 | 27.625 | 0.425 | 12/1962 | 28.049 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1600 | 0-6-0PT | 1618 | 19/12/1949 | 21/05/1962 | 12.427 | 0.740 | 02/1963 | 13.167 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2239 | 25/11/1944 | 21/05/1962 | 17.496 | 0.740 | 02/1963 | 18.236 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4145 | 17/09/1946 | 18/12/1962 | 16.263 | 0.162 | 02/1963 | 16.425 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4146 | 21/09/1946 | 16/08/1962 | 15.912 | 0.501 | 02/1963 | 16.414 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4152 | 21/06/1947 | 13/09/1962 | 15.241 | 0.425 | 02/1963 | 15.666 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 5778 | 09/1929 | 24/07/1962 | 32.877 | 0.564 | 02/1963 | 33.441 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 7785 | 12/1930 | 21/05/1962 | 31.452 | 0.740 | 02/1963 | 32.192 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8724 | 04/1931 | 18/07/1962 | 31.279 | 0.581 | 02/1963 | 31.860 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9627 | 30/11/1945 | 13/07/1962 | 16.627 | 0.595 | 02/1963 | 17.222 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9718 | 29/06/1934 | 21/05/1962 | 27.912 | 0.740 | 02/1963 | 28.652 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3211 | 04/12/1947 | 01/09/1962 | 14.753 | 0.619 | 04/1963 | 15.373 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5006 | 11/06/1927 | 03/04/1962 | 34.836 | 1.033 | 87G | Carmarthen | 04/1963 | 35.868 |
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2243 | 11/04/1945 | 14/01/1963 | 17.773 | 0.332 | 05/1963 | 18.104 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4127 | 12/05/1938 | 01/01/1963 | 24.658 | 0.367 | 05/1963 | 25.025 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1600 | 0-6-0PT | 1653 | 21/12/1954 | 05/12/1962 | 7.962 | 0.526 | 06/1963 | 8.488 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 4267 | 11/1919 | 23/10/1962 | 42.967 | 0.644 | 06/1963 | 43.611 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5021 | 17/08/1932 | 21/09/1962 | 30.115 | 0.732 | 88A | Cardiff Canton | 06/1963 | 30.847 |
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5653 | 01/1926 | 01/01/1963 | 36.986 | 0.452 | 06/1963 | 37.438 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6400 | 0-6-0PT | 6433 | 15/03/1937 | 14/01/1963 | 25.852 | 0.416 | 06/1963 | 26.268 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 6630 | 08/1928 | 01/09/1962 | 34.068 | 0.786 | 06/1963 | 34.855 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 6677 | 09/1928 | 14/01/1963 | 34.353 | 0.416 | 06/1963 | 34.770 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 6693 | 10/1928 | 14/01/1963 | 34.271 | 0.416 | 06/1963 | 34.688 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 4290 | 09/1921 | 11/02/1963 | 41.436 | 0.422 | 07/1963 | 41.858 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5611 | 02/1925 | 09/01/1963 | 37.923 | 0.512 | 07/1963 | 38.436 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 6669 | 09/1928 | 05/12/1962 | 34.244 | 0.608 | 07/1963 | 34.852 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1000 | 4-6-0 | 1009 | 21/12/1945 | 01/02/1963 | 17.126 | 0.534 | 08/1963 | 17.660 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1600 | 0-6-0PT | 1626 | 10/08/1950 | 24/08/1962 | 12.047 | 0.975 | 08/1963 | 13.022 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5695 | 01/1927 | 18/12/1962 | 35.948 | 0.658 | 08/1963 | 36.605 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 6642 | 09/1928 | 14/01/1963 | 34.353 | 0.584 | 08/1963 | 34.937 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8729 | 01/1931 | 05/12/1962 | 31.910 | 0.693 | 08/1963 | 32.603 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1000 | 4-6-0 | 1029 | 10/04/1947 | 05/12/1962 | 15.666 | 0.778 | 09/1963 | 16.444 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1361 | 0-6-0ST | 1365 | 08/1910 | 20/11/1962 | 52.301 | 0.819 | 09/1963 | 53.121 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1600 | 0-6-0PT | 1648 | 18/05/1951 | 17/05/1963 | 12.005 | 0.332 | 09/1963 | 12.337 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2229 | 26/10/1940 | 01/09/1962 | 21.863 | 1.038 | 09/1963 | 22.901 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2250 | 14/09/1945 | 02/08/1962 | 16.893 | 1.121 | 09/1963 | 18.014 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3623 | 23/05/1939 | 01/09/1962 | 23.293 | 1.038 | 09/1963 | 24.332 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3780 | 12/08/1938 | 18/12/1962 | 24.367 | 0.742 | 09/1963 | 25.110 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 3833 | 09/01/1941 | 04/07/1963 | 22.496 | 0.200 | 09/1963 | 22.696 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4116 | 05/11/1936 | 21/09/1962 | 25.893 | 0.984 | 09/1963 | 26.877 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4960 | 09/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.038 | 0.984 | 09/1963 | 34.022 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4999 | 03/1931 | 21/09/1962 | 31.542 | 0.984 | 09/1963 | 32.526 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5525 | 05/1928 | 17/09/1962 | 34.364 | 0.995 | 09/1963 | 35.359 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5940 | 01/08/1933 | 21/09/1962 | 29.159 | 0.984 | 09/1963 | 30.142 | ||
Steam | GWR | 7400 | 0-6-0PT | 7449 | 30/04/1950 | 06/06/1963 | 13.110 | 0.277 | 09/1963 | 13.386 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3204 | 11/10/1946 | 01/03/1963 | 16.397 | 0.625 | 10/1963 | 17.022 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3606 | 27/01/1939 | 18/12/1962 | 23.907 | 0.825 | 10/1963 | 24.732 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1400 | 0-4-2T | 1470 | 16/04/1936 | 01/10/1962 | 26.477 | 1.038 | 10/1963 | 27.515 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 5190 | 08/10/1934 | 05/09/1962 | 27.929 | 1.110 | 10/1963 | 29.038 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6400 | 0-6-0PT | 6421 | 29/08/1935 | 07/01/1963 | 27.378 | 0.770 | 10/1963 | 28.148 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9408 | 22/05/1947 | 02/05/1963 | 15.956 | 0.455 | 10/1963 | 16.411 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3627 | 17/06/1939 | 18/02/1963 | 23.690 | 0.740 | 11/1963 | 24.430 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3632 | 04/07/1939 | 13/11/1962 | 23.378 | 1.005 | 11/1963 | 24.384 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1400 | 0-4-2T | 1462 | 12/02/1936 | 01/09/1962 | 26.570 | 1.205 | 11/1963 | 27.775 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5649 | 11/1925 | 15/03/1963 | 37.353 | 0.671 | 11/1963 | 38.025 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 6673 | 09/1928 | 07/03/1963 | 34.496 | 0.693 | 11/1963 | 35.189 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9731 | 04/01/1935 | 02/05/1963 | 28.342 | 0.540 | 11/1963 | 28.882 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1000 | 4-6-0 | 1008 | 10/12/1945 | 03/10/1963 | 17.825 | 0.200 | 12/1963 | 18.025 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3651 | 11/12/1939 | 04/04/1963 | 23.329 | 0.699 | 12/1963 | 24.027 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3710 | 31/10/1936 | 17/05/1963 | 26.559 | 0.581 | 12/1963 | 27.140 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3729 | 06/07/1937 | 22/03/1963 | 25.726 | 0.734 | 12/1963 | 26.460 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3756 | 26/11/1937 | 22/03/1963 | 25.334 | 0.734 | 12/1963 | 26.068 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3786 | 23/09/1938 | 22/03/1963 | 24.510 | 0.734 | 12/1963 | 25.244 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4633 | 23/11/1942 | 04/04/1963 | 20.375 | 0.699 | 12/1963 | 21.074 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5622 | 06/1925 | 06/06/1963 | 38.000 | 0.526 | 12/1963 | 38.526 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5627 | 08/1925 | 11/04/1963 | 37.679 | 0.679 | 12/1963 | 38.359 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5666 | 06/1926 | 16/07/1963 | 37.110 | 0.416 | 12/1963 | 37.526 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5697 | 01/1927 | 25/04/1963 | 36.299 | 0.641 | 12/1963 | 36.940 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 6659 | 08/1928 | 21/10/1963 | 35.205 | 0.151 | 12/1963 | 35.356 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 6662 | 09/1928 | 05/04/1963 | 34.575 | 0.696 | 12/1963 | 35.271 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 6762 | 05/11/1948 | 26/03/1963 | 14.395 | 0.723 | 12/1963 | 15.118 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 2866 | 09/1918 | 28/03/1963 | 44.562 | 0.803 | 01/1964 | 45.364 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 2897 | 18/11/1938 | 01/03/1963 | 24.299 | 0.877 | 01/1964 | 25.175 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3215 | 17/12/1947 | 09/01/1963 | 15.074 | 1.016 | 01/1964 | 16.090 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4922 | 04/1929 | 04/07/1963 | 34.241 | 0.534 | 01/1964 | 34.775 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4935 | 06/1929 | 22/03/1963 | 33.789 | 0.819 | 01/1964 | 34.608 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4994 | 02/1931 | 15/03/1963 | 32.099 | 0.838 | 01/1964 | 32.937 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5615 | 03/1925 | 02/07/1963 | 38.323 | 0.540 | 01/1964 | 38.863 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 5798 | 11/1930 | 20/09/1962 | 31.868 | 1.321 | 01/1964 | 33.189 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8430 | 08/01/1953 | 02/05/1963 | 10.318 | 0.707 | 01/1964 | 11.025 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9604 | 25/05/1945 | 12/12/1962 | 17.562 | 1.093 | 01/1964 | 18.655 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 6607 | 09/1927 | 15/03/1963 | 35.521 | 0.923 | 02/1964 | 36.444 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9444 | 12/04/1951 | 22/03/1963 | 11.951 | 0.904 | 02/1964 | 12.855 | ||
Steam | SDJR | SDJ7F | 2-8-0 | 53810 | 08/1925 | 18/11/1963 | 38.285 | 0.244 | 02/1964 | 38.529 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3781 | 18/08/1938 | 19/08/1963 | 25.019 | 0.573 | 03/1964 | 25.592 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 5217 | 04/1924 | 24/05/1963 | 39.132 | 0.811 | 03/1964 | 39.942 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 5229 | 06/1924 | 24/05/1963 | 38.964 | 0.811 | 03/1964 | 39.775 | ||
Steam | GWR | 7200 | 2-8-2T | 7219 | 10/1930 | 22/01/1964 | 33.293 | 0.145 | 03/1964 | 33.438 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5562 | 12/1928 | 21/09/1962 | 33.789 | 1.482 | 03/1964 | 35.271 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5620 | 06/1925 | 16/07/1963 | 38.110 | 0.666 | 03/1964 | 38.775 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5994 | 29/12/1939 | 07/03/1963 | 23.203 | 1.025 | 03/1964 | 24.227 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 6676 | 09/1928 | 05/04/1963 | 34.575 | 0.945 | 03/1964 | 35.521 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6800 | 4-6-0 | 6852 | 09/11/1937 | 22/01/1964 | 26.219 | 0.145 | 03/1964 | 26.364 | ||
Steam | GWR | 7400 | 0-6-0PT | 7448 | 12/04/1950 | 19/04/1963 | 13.027 | 0.907 | 03/1964 | 13.934 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 5260 | 23/02/1940 | 22/03/1963 | 23.090 | 0.984 | 03/1964 | 24.074 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 4271 | 02/1920 | 16/12/1963 | 43.863 | 0.332 | 04/1964 | 44.195 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 4299 | 10/1922 | 16/12/1963 | 41.197 | 0.332 | 04/1964 | 41.529 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4909 | 01/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.704 | 1.567 | 04/1964 | 35.271 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4948 | 08/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.123 | 1.567 | 04/1964 | 34.690 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5049 | 30/04/1936 | 22/03/1963 | 26.910 | 1.068 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 04/1964 | 27.978 |
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5612 | 02/1925 | 25/04/1963 | 38.214 | 0.975 | 04/1964 | 39.189 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5968 | 25/03/1937 | 27/09/1962 | 25.526 | 1.551 | 04/1964 | 27.077 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5970 | 07/04/1937 | 11/11/1963 | 26.614 | 0.427 | 04/1964 | 27.041 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5980 | 18/09/1938 | 21/09/1962 | 24.025 | 1.567 | 04/1964 | 25.592 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 6605 | 09/1927 | 22/01/1964 | 36.378 | 0.230 | 04/1964 | 36.608 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 7015 | 29/07/1948 | 05/04/1963 | 14.693 | 1.030 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 04/1964 | 15.723 |
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 5255 | 31/01/1940 | 24/05/1963 | 23.326 | 0.896 | 04/1964 | 24.222 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1000 | 4-6-0 | 1001 | 12/09/1945 | 24/05/1963 | 17.707 | 0.978 | 05/1964 | 18.685 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1000 | 4-6-0 | 1003 | 02/10/1945 | 22/10/1962 | 17.066 | 1.564 | 05/1964 | 18.630 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1000 | 4-6-0 | 1004 | 15/10/1945 | 21/09/1962 | 16.945 | 1.649 | 05/1964 | 18.595 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1000 | 4-6-0 | 1015 | 01/03/1946 | 13/11/1962 | 16.715 | 1.504 | 05/1964 | 18.219 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 2851 | 02/1913 | 24/06/1963 | 50.386 | 0.893 | 05/1964 | 51.279 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 3858 | 13/10/1942 | 10/09/1963 | 20.923 | 0.679 | 05/1964 | 21.603 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4102 | 29/08/1935 | 21/09/1962 | 27.082 | 1.649 | 05/1964 | 28.732 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4500 | 2-6-2T | 4567 | 10/1924 | 21/09/1962 | 37.959 | 1.649 | 05/1964 | 39.608 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4908 | 01/1929 | 22/10/1963 | 34.789 | 0.564 | 05/1964 | 35.353 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2200 | 27/06/1938 | 17/09/1962 | 24.241 | 1.745 | 06/1964 | 25.986 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 2871 | 11/1918 | 24/05/1963 | 44.551 | 1.063 | 06/1964 | 45.614 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3629 | 24/06/1939 | 14/01/1963 | 23.575 | 1.419 | 06/1964 | 24.995 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3679 | 06/07/1940 | 01/03/1963 | 22.666 | 1.293 | 06/1964 | 23.959 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 4090 | 15/08/1925 | 06/06/1963 | 37.833 | 1.027 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 06/1964 | 38.860 |
Steam | GWR | 4500 | 2-6-2T | 4570 | 11/1924 | 14/01/1963 | 38.189 | 1.419 | 06/1964 | 39.608 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4500 | 2-6-2T | 4574 | 11/1924 | 01/03/1963 | 38.315 | 1.293 | 06/1964 | 39.608 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4917 | 03/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.542 | 1.734 | 06/1964 | 35.277 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4941 | 07/1929 | 22/10/1962 | 33.293 | 1.649 | 06/1964 | 34.942 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4956 | 09/1929 | 04/07/1963 | 33.822 | 0.951 | 06/1964 | 34.773 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4980 | 02/1930 | 04/07/1963 | 33.403 | 0.951 | 06/1964 | 34.353 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5025 | 20/04/1934 | 13/11/1963 | 29.586 | 0.589 | 86C | Hereford | 06/1964 | 30.175 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5038 | 12/06/1935 | 17/09/1963 | 28.285 | 0.745 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 06/1964 | 29.030 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5041 | 02/07/1935 | 28/12/1963 | 28.510 | 0.466 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 06/1964 | 28.975 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5067 | 07/07/1937 | 13/07/1962 | 25.033 | 1.926 | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | 06/1964 | 26.959 |
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5537 | 07/1928 | 17/08/1962 | 34.112 | 1.830 | 06/1964 | 35.942 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5544 | 08/1928 | 21/09/1962 | 34.123 | 1.734 | 06/1964 | 35.858 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5548 | 10/1928 | 06/06/1963 | 34.663 | 1.027 | 06/1964 | 35.690 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5555 | 11/1928 | 02/07/1963 | 34.649 | 0.956 | 06/1964 | 35.605 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5568 | 01/1929 | 14/01/1963 | 34.019 | 1.419 | 06/1964 | 35.438 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5914 | 07/1931 | 22/01/1964 | 32.545 | 0.397 | 06/1964 | 32.942 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5944 | 12/03/1935 | 08/04/1963 | 28.093 | 1.189 | 06/1964 | 29.282 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5985 | 18/10/1938 | 13/09/1963 | 24.921 | 0.756 | 06/1964 | 25.677 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 7031 | 20/06/1950 | 16/07/1963 | 13.079 | 0.918 | 85A | Worcester | 06/1964 | 13.997 |
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9769 | 08/10/1935 | 28/03/1963 | 27.488 | 1.219 | 06/1964 | 28.707 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 2854 | 02/1913 | 03/10/1963 | 50.663 | 0.784 | 07/1964 | 51.447 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3664 | 21/02/1940 | 06/05/1964 | 24.222 | 0.192 | 07/1964 | 24.414 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4104 | 31/08/1935 | 14/05/1964 | 28.723 | 0.170 | 07/1964 | 28.893 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4642 | 09/01/1943 | 15/01/1964 | 21.030 | 0.499 | 07/1964 | 21.529 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4934 | 06/1929 | 21/09/1962 | 33.290 | 1.816 | 07/1964 | 35.107 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4975 | 01/1930 | 30/09/1963 | 33.729 | 0.792 | 07/1964 | 34.521 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4981 | 12/1930 | 03/10/1963 | 32.822 | 0.784 | 07/1964 | 33.605 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 5228 | 06/1924 | 20/04/1964 | 39.874 | 0.236 | 07/1964 | 40.110 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 5231 | 06/1924 | 20/04/1964 | 39.874 | 0.236 | 07/1964 | 40.110 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5908 | 06/1931 | 29/07/1963 | 32.142 | 0.964 | 07/1964 | 33.107 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5919 | 07/1931 | 26/08/1963 | 32.137 | 0.888 | 07/1964 | 33.025 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5937 | 10/07/1933 | 13/11/1963 | 30.364 | 0.671 | 07/1964 | 31.036 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5977 | 02/09/1938 | 19/08/1963 | 24.978 | 0.907 | 07/1964 | 25.885 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8701 | 02/1931 | 29/03/1963 | 32.137 | 1.299 | 07/1964 | 33.436 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8744 | 06/1931 | 05/10/1962 | 31.329 | 1.778 | 07/1964 | 33.107 | ||
Steam | MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44167 | 03/1926 | 22/01/1964 | 37.882 | 0.479 | 07/1964 | 38.362 | ||
Steam | MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44296 | 02/1927 | 15/01/1964 | 36.940 | 0.499 | 07/1964 | 37.438 | ||
Steam | SDJR | SDJ7F | 2-8-0 | 53806 | 07/1925 | 22/01/1964 | 38.548 | 0.479 | 07/1964 | 39.027 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1000 | 4-6-0 | 1005 | 06/11/1945 | 24/06/1963 | 17.641 | 1.145 | 08/1964 | 18.786 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3673 | 22/04/1940 | 16/05/1964 | 24.082 | 0.249 | 08/1964 | 24.332 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 4214 | 09/1912 | 14/05/1964 | 51.696 | 0.255 | 08/1964 | 51.951 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 4243 | 02/1916 | 14/05/1964 | 48.277 | 0.255 | 08/1964 | 48.532 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4923 | 04/1929 | 30/05/1964 | 35.148 | 0.211 | 08/1964 | 35.359 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4964 | 11/1929 | 15/10/1963 | 33.937 | 0.836 | 08/1964 | 34.773 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6400 | 0-6-0PT | 6438 | 22/04/1937 | 13/11/1962 | 25.578 | 1.756 | 08/1964 | 27.334 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 6968 | 05/09/1944 | 13/09/1963 | 19.033 | 0.923 | 08/1964 | 19.956 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6800 | 4-6-0 | 6811 | 25/11/1936 | 18/07/1964 | 27.663 | 0.162 | 09/1964 | 27.825 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4697 | 14/02/1945 | 02/07/1965 | 20.392 | -0.712 | 10/1964 | 19.679 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5903 | 05/1931 | 10/09/1963 | 32.345 | 1.099 | 10/1964 | 33.444 | ||
Steam | LSWR | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30836 | 12/1927 | 08/1964 | 36.693 | 0.167 | 10/1964 | 36.860 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 3860 | 31/10/1942 | 10/08/1964 | 21.792 | 0.266 | 11/1964 | 22.058 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 6982 | 11/02/1948 | 10/08/1964 | 16.507 | 0.266 | 11/1964 | 16.773 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8723 | 04/1931 | 06/07/1964 | 33.249 | 0.362 | 11/1964 | 33.611 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1000 | 4-6-0 | 1000 | 04/08/1945 | 06/07/1964 | 18.934 | 0.444 | 12/1964 | 19.378 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1000 | 4-6-0 | 1010 | 22/01/1946 | 24/07/1964 | 18.515 | 0.395 | 12/1964 | 18.910 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1000 | 4-6-0 | 1012 | 05/02/1946 | 24/04/1964 | 18.227 | 0.644 | 12/1964 | 18.871 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1000 | 4-6-0 | 1013 | 11/02/1946 | 24/07/1964 | 18.460 | 0.395 | 12/1964 | 18.855 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1000 | 4-6-0 | 1014 | 18/02/1946 | 24/04/1964 | 18.192 | 0.644 | 12/1964 | 18.836 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 2879 | 03/1919 | 10/08/1964 | 45.438 | 0.348 | 12/1964 | 45.786 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3212 | 09/12/1947 | 21/10/1963 | 15.877 | 1.153 | 12/1964 | 17.030 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3634 | 15/07/1939 | 06/07/1964 | 24.995 | 0.444 | 12/1964 | 25.438 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3702 | 02/10/1936 | 24/04/1964 | 27.578 | 0.644 | 12/1964 | 28.222 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3746 | 13/10/1937 | 06/07/1964 | 26.748 | 0.444 | 12/1964 | 27.192 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 3800 | 03/12/1938 | 10/08/1964 | 25.704 | 0.348 | 12/1964 | 26.052 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 3801 | 06/12/1938 | 10/08/1964 | 25.696 | 0.348 | 12/1964 | 26.044 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 3804 | 05/08/1939 | 13/07/1964 | 24.956 | 0.425 | 12/1964 | 25.381 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 3805 | 09/08/1939 | 28/09/1964 | 25.156 | 0.214 | 12/1964 | 25.370 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 4080 | 23/03/1924 | 10/08/1964 | 40.411 | 0.348 | 81C | Southall | 12/1964 | 40.759 |
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4124 | 14/01/1938 | 10/08/1964 | 26.589 | 0.348 | 12/1964 | 26.937 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4132 | 19/10/1939 | 24/07/1964 | 24.781 | 0.395 | 12/1964 | 25.175 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 4238 | 10/1914 | 16/12/1963 | 49.203 | 1.000 | 12/1964 | 50.203 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 4241 | 10/1914 | 24/04/1964 | 49.559 | 0.644 | 12/1964 | 50.203 | ||
Steam | GWR | 7200 | 2-8-2T | 7247 | 02/1916 | 22/03/1963 | 47.129 | 1.737 | 12/1964 | 48.866 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4657 | 31/05/1943 | 06/07/1964 | 21.115 | 0.444 | 12/1964 | 21.559 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4951 | 07/1929 | 25/06/1964 | 34.970 | 0.474 | 12/1964 | 35.444 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 5247 | 12/1925 | 01/03/1963 | 37.233 | 1.795 | 12/1964 | 39.027 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 5253 | 12/1925 | 25/04/1963 | 37.384 | 1.644 | 12/1964 | 39.027 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5603 | 12/1924 | 28/09/1964 | 39.814 | 0.214 | 12/1964 | 40.027 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5641 | 10/1925 | 07/09/1964 | 38.923 | 0.271 | 12/1964 | 39.195 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5975 | 26/05/1937 | 24/07/1964 | 27.181 | 0.395 | 12/1964 | 27.575 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5976 | 01/09/1938 | 24/07/1964 | 25.912 | 0.395 | 12/1964 | 26.307 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6130 | 09/1932 | 06/07/1964 | 31.827 | 0.444 | 12/1964 | 32.271 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 6909 | 27/11/1940 | 25/06/1964 | 23.592 | 0.474 | 12/1964 | 24.066 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 6950 | 23/12/1942 | 25/06/1964 | 21.521 | 0.474 | 12/1964 | 21.995 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 7003 | 13/06/1946 | 10/08/1964 | 18.173 | 0.348 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 12/1964 | 18.521 |
Steam | GWR | 7400 | 0-6-0PT | 7435 | 30/09/1948 | 24/07/1964 | 15.825 | 0.395 | 12/1964 | 16.219 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76032 | 09/12/1953 | 02/08/1964 | 10.655 | 0.370 | 12/1964 | 11.025 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82007 | 30/05/1952 | 25/06/1964 | 12.079 | 0.474 | 12/1964 | 12.553 | ||
Steam | SR | N | 2-6-0 | 31412 | 12/1933 | 09/08/1964 | 30.671 | 0.351 | 12/1964 | 31.022 | ||
Steam | SR | U | 2-6-0 | 31626 | 03/1929 | 05/01/1964 | 34.833 | 0.945 | 12/1964 | 35.778 | ||
Steam | SR | U | 2-6-0 | 31628 | 04/1929 | 14/06/1964 | 35.189 | 0.504 | 12/1964 | 35.693 | ||
Steam | SR | U | 2-6-0 | 31629 | 12/1929 | 05/01/1964 | 34.079 | 0.945 | 12/1964 | 35.025 | ||
Steam | SR | U | 2-6-0 | 31797 | 07/1928 | 05/01/1964 | 35.499 | 0.945 | 12/1964 | 36.444 | ||
Steam | SR | U | 2-6-0 | 31801 | 07/1928 | 14/06/1964 | 35.940 | 0.504 | 12/1964 | 36.444 | ||
Steam | SR | U | 2-6-0 | 31804 | 06/1928 | 14/06/1964 | 36.022 | 0.504 | 12/1964 | 36.526 | ||
Steam | SR | N | 2-6-0 | 31814 | 11/1920 | 26/07/1964 | 43.723 | 0.389 | 12/1964 | 44.112 | ||
Steam | SR | N | 2-6-0 | 31864 | 06/1925 | 05/01/1964 | 38.584 | 0.945 | 12/1964 | 39.529 | ||
Steam | SR | N | 2-6-0 | 31869 | 07/1925 | 02/08/1964 | 39.077 | 0.370 | 12/1964 | 39.447 | ||
Steam | SR | N | 2-6-0 | 31875 | 08/1925 | 10/08/1964 | 39.014 | 0.348 | 12/1964 | 39.362 | ||
Steam | SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33007 | 07/1942 | 26/01/1964 | 21.548 | 0.888 | 12/1964 | 22.436 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48463 | 02/01/1945 | 25/06/1964 | 19.490 | 0.474 | 12/1964 | 19.964 | ||
Steam | MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44569 | 08/1937 | 13/07/1964 | 26.929 | 0.425 | 12/1964 | 27.353 | ||
Steam | LMS | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47308 | 1925 | 10/08/1964 | 0.348 | 12/1964 | ||||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41210 | 21/08/1948 | 10/05/1964 | 15.729 | 0.600 | 12/1964 | 16.329 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41328 | 05/1952 | 07/1964 | 12.175 | 0.419 | 12/1964 | 12.595 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2286 | 23/01/1936 | 28/09/1964 | 28.701 | 0.299 | 01/1965 | 29.000 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3621 | 13/05/1939 | 06/11/1964 | 25.504 | 0.192 | 01/1965 | 25.696 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3798 | 02/12/1938 | 19/10/1964 | 25.899 | 0.241 | 01/1965 | 26.140 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 7013 | 12/04/1924 | 07/09/1964 | 40.433 | 0.356 | 2A | Tyseley | 01/1965 | 40.789 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 4093 | 26/05/1926 | 07/09/1964 | 38.312 | 0.356 | 82B | St Philips Marsh | 01/1965 | 38.668 |
Steam | GWR | 7200 | 2-8-2T | 7240 | 10/1914 | 07/09/1964 | 49.932 | 0.356 | 01/1965 | 50.288 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4928 | 05/1929 | 02/12/1963 | 34.573 | 1.123 | 01/1965 | 35.696 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4958 | 09/1929 | 21/09/1964 | 35.041 | 0.318 | 01/1965 | 35.359 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4985 | 01/1931 | 28/09/1964 | 33.726 | 0.299 | 01/1965 | 34.025 | ||
Steam | GWR | 7200 | 2-8-2T | 7220 | 12/1925 | 07/09/1964 | 38.756 | 0.356 | 01/1965 | 39.112 | ||
Steam | GWR | 7200 | 2-8-2T | 7233 | 03/1926 | 07/09/1964 | 38.510 | 0.356 | 01/1965 | 38.866 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 6685 | 10/1928 | 28/09/1964 | 35.978 | 0.299 | 01/1965 | 36.277 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 6985 | 24/02/1948 | 21/09/1964 | 16.586 | 0.318 | 01/1965 | 16.904 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9746 | 06/02/1935 | 10/03/1964 | 29.110 | 0.852 | 01/1965 | 29.962 | ||
Steam | SR | Z | 0-8-0T | 30952 | 05/1929 | 24/11/1962 | 33.551 | 2.145 | 01/1965 | 35.696 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 2876 | 01/1919 | 15/01/1965 | 46.033 | 0.085 | 02/1965 | 46.118 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 3210 | 03/12/1947 | 13/11/1964 | 16.959 | 0.258 | 02/1965 | 17.216 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 3409 | 31/10/1956 | 23/10/1964 | 7.984 | 0.315 | 02/1965 | 8.299 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1400 | 0-4-2T | 1458 | 07/08/1935 | 06/11/1964 | 29.271 | 0.277 | 02/1965 | 29.548 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1400 | 0-4-2T | 1472 | 20/04/1936 | 06/11/1964 | 28.567 | 0.277 | 02/1965 | 28.844 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5055 | 09/06/1936 | 28/09/1964 | 28.323 | 0.384 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 02/1965 | 28.707 |
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5648 | 11/1925 | 28/09/1964 | 38.896 | 0.384 | 02/1965 | 39.279 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6122 | 10/1931 | 21/09/1964 | 32.959 | 0.403 | 02/1965 | 33.362 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8437 | 31/05/1953 | 06/11/1964 | 11.444 | 0.277 | 02/1965 | 11.721 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 8493 | 30/09/1952 | 06/11/1964 | 12.110 | 0.277 | 02/1965 | 12.386 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9494 | 31/08/1954 | 06/11/1964 | 10.192 | 0.277 | 02/1965 | 10.468 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9679 | 11/04/1949 | 06/11/1964 | 15.584 | 0.277 | 02/1965 | 15.860 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80087 | 29/06/1954 | 14/06/1964 | 9.967 | 0.674 | 02/1965 | 10.641 | ||
Steam | SR | N | 2-6-0 | 31868 | 07/1925 | 05/01/1964 | 38.501 | 1.115 | 02/1965 | 39.616 | ||
Steam | LSWR | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30823 | 03/1927 | 29/11/1964 | 37.737 | 0.214 | 02/1965 | 37.951 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43155 | 28/12/1951 | 10/01/1965 | 13.047 | 0.099 | 02/1965 | 13.145 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1000 | 4-6-0 | 1011 | 29/01/1946 | 06/11/1964 | 18.784 | 0.353 | 03/1965 | 19.137 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 3826 | 24/09/1940 | 15/01/1965 | 24.326 | 0.162 | 03/1965 | 24.488 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1400 | 0-4-2T | 1468 | 26/02/1936 | 15/03/1962 | 26.066 | 3.003 | 03/1965 | 29.068 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6800 | 4-6-0 | 6850 | 30/10/1937 | 14/12/1964 | 27.142 | 0.249 | 03/1965 | 27.392 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9796 | 10/09/1936 | 06/02/1965 | 28.427 | 0.101 | 03/1965 | 28.529 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73017 | 28/09/1951 | 04/10/1964 | 13.027 | 0.444 | 03/1965 | 13.471 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73046 | 25/11/1953 | 06/09/1964 | 10.789 | 0.521 | 03/1965 | 11.310 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73074 | 25/12/1954 | 06/09/1964 | 9.707 | 0.521 | 03/1965 | 10.227 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78005 | 24/02/1953 | 28/09/1964 | 11.600 | 0.460 | 03/1965 | 12.060 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80010 | 10/07/1951 | 14/06/1964 | 12.940 | 0.751 | 03/1965 | 13.690 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80017 | 08/10/1951 | 13/09/1964 | 12.942 | 0.501 | 03/1965 | 13.444 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80036 | 23/05/1952 | 06/11/1964 | 12.466 | 0.353 | 03/1965 | 12.819 | ||
Steam | MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44045 | 03/1925 | 06/11/1964 | 39.674 | 0.353 | 03/1965 | 40.027 | ||
Steam | SDJR | SDJ7F | 2-8-0 | 53807 | 07/1925 | 07/09/1964 | 39.175 | 0.518 | 03/1965 | 39.693 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1600 | 0-6-0PT | 1658 | 28/02/1955 | 06/11/1964 | 9.696 | 0.438 | 04/1965 | 10.134 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2217 | 14/06/1940 | 13/11/1964 | 24.433 | 0.419 | 04/1965 | 24.852 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 2218 | 10/06/1940 | 13/11/1964 | 24.444 | 0.419 | 04/1965 | 24.863 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3739 | 15/09/1937 | 19/10/1964 | 27.112 | 0.488 | 04/1965 | 27.600 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3745 | 09/10/1937 | 14/12/1964 | 27.200 | 0.334 | 04/1965 | 27.534 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 3819 | 12/04/1940 | 14/12/1964 | 24.690 | 0.334 | 04/1965 | 25.025 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4610 | 21/02/1942 | 23/10/1964 | 22.685 | 0.477 | 04/1965 | 23.162 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6400 | 0-6-0PT | 6419 | 11/12/1934 | 26/12/1964 | 30.063 | 0.301 | 04/1965 | 30.364 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 6942 | 22/08/1942 | 14/12/1964 | 22.329 | 0.334 | 04/1965 | 22.663 | ||
Steam | GWR | 9400 | 0-6-0PT | 9490 | 28/02/1954 | 26/12/1964 | 10.833 | 0.301 | 04/1965 | 11.134 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9729 | 13/12/1934 | 23/10/1964 | 29.882 | 0.477 | 04/1965 | 30.359 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75001 | 16/08/1951 | 14/12/1964 | 13.340 | 0.334 | 04/1965 | 13.674 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80038 | 07/06/1952 | 07/09/1964 | 12.260 | 0.603 | 04/1965 | 12.863 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82015 | 13/08/1952 | 06/12/1964 | 12.323 | 0.356 | 04/1965 | 12.679 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43887 | 1919 | 06/02/1965 | 0.186 | 04/1965 | ||||
Steam | MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44146 | 11/1925 | 13/11/1964 | 39.022 | 0.419 | 04/1965 | 39.441 | ||
Steam | MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44534 | 09/1928 | 13/11/1964 | 36.186 | 0.419 | 04/1965 | 36.605 | ||
Steam | MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44558 | 04/1922 | 14/12/1964 | 42.696 | 0.334 | 04/1965 | 43.030 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41308 | 04/1952 | 06/02/1965 | 12.822 | 0.186 | 04/1965 | 13.008 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41317 | 06/1952 | 14/12/1964 | 12.507 | 0.334 | 04/1965 | 12.841 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1600 | 0-6-0PT | 1664 | 29/03/1955 | 06/11/1964 | 9.616 | 0.521 | 05/1965 | 10.137 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5601 | 12/1924 | 15/01/1965 | 40.112 | 0.329 | 05/1965 | 40.441 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 7023 | 24/06/1949 | 13/02/1965 | 15.652 | 0.249 | 2B | Oxley | 05/1965 | 15.901 |
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 7024 | 30/06/1949 | 13/02/1965 | 15.636 | 0.249 | 2B | Oxley | 05/1965 | 15.885 |
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82041 | 17/06/1955 | 31/12/1965 | 10.548 | -0.630 | 05/1965 | 9.918 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48461 | 16/12/1944 | 15/01/1965 | 20.096 | 0.329 | 05/1965 | 20.425 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34031 | 06/1946 | 07/02/1965 | 18.663 | 0.266 | 05/1965 | 18.929 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 2852 | 02/1913 | 10/10/1963 | 50.682 | 1.682 | 06/1965 | 52.364 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 5097 | 05/07/1939 | 08/03/1963 | 23.690 | 2.274 | 65 | 06/1965 | 25.964 | |
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 6606 | 09/1927 | 15/01/1965 | 37.362 | 0.414 | 06/1965 | 37.775 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 4082 | 02/07/1948 | 07/09/1964 | 16.195 | 0.770 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 06/1965 | 16.964 |
Steam | GWR | 1600 | 0-6-0PT | 1613 | 02/12/1949 | 19/03/1965 | 15.304 | 0.323 | 07/1965 | 15.627 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3715 | 22/01/1937 | 19/03/1965 | 28.173 | 0.323 | 07/1965 | 28.496 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3796 | 29/11/1938 | 26/03/1965 | 26.340 | 0.304 | 07/1965 | 26.644 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 4929 | 05/1929 | 19/03/1965 | 35.868 | 0.323 | 07/1965 | 36.192 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 5226 | 05/1924 | 19/03/1965 | 40.871 | 0.323 | 07/1965 | 41.195 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9671 | 02/06/1948 | 19/03/1965 | 16.805 | 0.323 | 07/1965 | 17.129 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92003 | 25/01/1954 | 26/03/1965 | 11.173 | 0.304 | 07/1965 | 11.477 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92222 | 02/06/1958 | 26/03/1965 | 6.819 | 0.304 | 07/1965 | 7.123 | ||
Steam | SR | N | 2-6-0 | 31862 | 05/1925 | 11/04/1965 | 39.934 | 0.260 | 07/1965 | 40.195 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48409 | 08/09/1943 | 26/03/1965 | 21.562 | 0.304 | 07/1965 | 21.866 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4700 | 2-8-0 | 4701 | 01/1922 | 17/09/1963 | 41.699 | 1.912 | 08/1965 | 43.611 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5986 | 21/11/1939 | 10/09/1963 | 23.819 | 1.932 | 08/1965 | 25.751 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4073 | 4-6-0 | 7037 | 28/08/1950 | 01/03/1963 | 12.515 | 2.460 | 65 | 08/1965 | 14.975 | |
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9649 | 04/06/1946 | 21/07/1965 | 19.142 | 0.068 | 08/1965 | 19.211 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73162 | 15/02/1957 | 21/05/1965 | 8.266 | 0.236 | 08/1965 | 8.501 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92242 | 13/10/1958 | 13/06/1965 | 6.671 | 0.173 | 08/1965 | 6.844 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92248 | 02/12/1958 | 13/06/1965 | 6.534 | 0.173 | 08/1965 | 6.707 | ||
Steam | SR | U | 2-6-0 | 31620 | 11/1928 | 04/04/1965 | 36.408 | 0.364 | 08/1965 | 36.773 | ||
Steam | SR | U | 2-6-0 | 31790 | 06/1917 | 09/05/1965 | 47.932 | 0.268 | 08/1965 | 48.200 | ||
Steam | SR | N | 2-6-0 | 31831 | 07/1924 | 25/04/1965 | 40.805 | 0.307 | 08/1965 | 41.112 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48737 | 11/1945 | 13/06/1965 | 19.589 | 0.173 | 08/1965 | 19.762 | ||
Steam | MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44466 | 07/1928 | 21/05/1965 | 36.874 | 0.236 | 08/1965 | 37.110 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 3820 | 17/04/1940 | 02/07/1965 | 25.225 | 0.205 | 09/1965 | 25.430 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92225 | 20/06/1958 | 02/07/1965 | 7.038 | 0.205 | 09/1965 | 7.244 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92241 | 06/10/1958 | 02/07/1965 | 6.742 | 0.205 | 09/1965 | 6.948 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3686 | 27/12/1940 | 21/07/1965 | 24.581 | 0.236 | 10/1965 | 24.816 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3708 | 23/10/1936 | 21/07/1965 | 28.762 | 0.236 | 10/1965 | 28.997 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 3842 | 05/02/1942 | 21/07/1965 | 23.471 | 0.236 | 10/1965 | 23.707 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 3848 | 11/05/1942 | 02/07/1965 | 23.159 | 0.288 | 10/1965 | 23.447 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 3851 | 18/06/1942 | 02/07/1965 | 23.055 | 0.288 | 10/1965 | 23.342 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 3866 | 01/12/1942 | 02/07/1965 | 22.600 | 0.288 | 10/1965 | 22.888 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4620 | 28/05/1942 | 21/07/1965 | 23.164 | 0.236 | 10/1965 | 23.400 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4621 | 29/05/1942 | 21/07/1965 | 23.162 | 0.236 | 10/1965 | 23.397 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4684 | 02/12/1944 | 21/07/1965 | 20.647 | 0.236 | 10/1965 | 20.882 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 5209 | 08/1923 | 21/07/1965 | 41.962 | 0.236 | 10/1965 | 42.197 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 5692 | 01/1927 | 21/07/1965 | 38.540 | 0.236 | 10/1965 | 38.775 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5600 | 0-6-2T | 6672 | 09/1928 | 21/07/1965 | 36.871 | 0.236 | 10/1965 | 37.107 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 6908 | 20/11/1940 | 21/07/1965 | 24.682 | 0.236 | 10/1965 | 24.918 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8795 | 14/03/1934 | 21/07/1965 | 31.375 | 0.236 | 10/1965 | 31.611 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9619 | 13/10/1945 | 21/07/1965 | 19.784 | 0.236 | 10/1965 | 20.019 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9623 | 08/11/1945 | 21/07/1965 | 19.712 | 0.236 | 10/1965 | 19.948 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9711 | 12/06/1934 | 21/07/1965 | 31.129 | 0.236 | 10/1965 | 31.364 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73054 | 06/1954 | 25/08/1965 | 11.203 | 0.140 | 10/1965 | 11.342 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73167 | 13/04/1957 | 07/08/1965 | 8.323 | 0.189 | 10/1965 | 8.512 | ||
Steam | SR | N | 2-6-0 | 31401 | 08/1932 | 18/07/1965 | 32.945 | 0.244 | 10/1965 | 33.189 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48403 | 12/07/1943 | 31/07/1965 | 22.068 | 0.208 | 10/1965 | 22.277 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 6973 | 10/10/1947 | 25/08/1965 | 17.888 | 0.225 | 11/1965 | 18.112 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73015 | 12/09/1951 | 25/08/1965 | 13.962 | 0.225 | 11/1965 | 14.186 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73021 | 22/10/1951 | 25/08/1965 | 13.852 | 0.225 | 11/1965 | 14.077 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73023 | 05/11/1951 | 25/08/1965 | 13.814 | 0.225 | 11/1965 | 14.038 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73030 | 20/06/1953 | 25/08/1965 | 12.189 | 0.225 | 11/1965 | 12.414 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73032 | 10/07/1953 | 07/08/1965 | 12.085 | 0.274 | 11/1965 | 12.359 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73051 | 10/05/1954 | 25/08/1965 | 11.301 | 0.225 | 11/1965 | 11.526 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82035 | 03/03/1955 | 06/08/1965 | 10.436 | 0.277 | 11/1965 | 10.712 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82036 | 01/04/1955 | 21/07/1965 | 10.312 | 0.321 | 11/1965 | 10.633 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82037 | 20/04/1955 | 25/08/1965 | 10.356 | 0.225 | 11/1965 | 10.581 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92237 | 09/09/1958 | 10/09/1965 | 7.008 | 0.181 | 11/1965 | 7.189 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43983 | 1922 | 09/08/1965 | 0.268 | 11/1965 | ||||
Steam | SR | N | 2-6-0 | 31842 | 08/1924 | 05/09/1965 | 41.085 | 0.195 | 11/1965 | 41.279 | ||
Steam | LSWR | M7 | 0-4-4T | 30133 | 03/1903 | 15/03/1964 | 61.044 | 1.671 | 11/1965 | 62.715 | ||
Steam | LSWR | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30842 | 08/1936 | 05/09/1965 | 29.077 | 0.195 | 11/1965 | 29.271 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43147 | 08/10/1951 | 26/12/1964 | 13.227 | 0.888 | 11/1965 | 14.115 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42327 | 02/02/1929 | 28/08/1965 | 36.592 | 0.216 | 11/1965 | 36.808 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42442 | 07/05/1936 | 07/08/1965 | 29.271 | 0.274 | 11/1965 | 29.545 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42460 | 17/09/1936 | 28/08/1965 | 28.964 | 0.216 | 11/1965 | 29.181 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42464 | 14/10/1936 | 14/08/1965 | 28.852 | 0.255 | 11/1965 | 29.107 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3659 | 31/01/1940 | 01/10/1965 | 25.685 | 0.205 | 12/1965 | 25.890 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3751 | 12/11/1937 | 10/09/1965 | 27.847 | 0.263 | 12/1965 | 28.110 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4200 | 2-8-0T | 4268 | 11/1919 | 25/08/1965 | 45.808 | 0.307 | 12/1965 | 46.115 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 6961 | 13/03/1944 | 10/09/1965 | 21.510 | 0.263 | 12/1965 | 21.773 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 6983 | 13/02/1948 | 25/08/1965 | 17.542 | 0.307 | 12/1965 | 17.849 | ||
Steam | GWR | 7800 | 4-6-0 | 7804 | 31/01/1938 | 10/09/1965 | 27.627 | 0.263 | 12/1965 | 27.890 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 8745 | 06/1931 | 25/08/1965 | 34.219 | 0.307 | 12/1965 | 34.526 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9616 | 28/09/1945 | 25/08/1965 | 19.921 | 0.307 | 12/1965 | 20.227 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73031 | 03/07/1953 | 10/09/1965 | 12.197 | 0.263 | 12/1965 | 12.460 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76030 | 17/11/1953 | 25/04/1965 | 11.444 | 0.641 | 12/1965 | 12.085 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92226 | 26/06/1958 | 10/09/1965 | 7.214 | 0.263 | 12/1965 | 7.477 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92238 | 22/09/1958 | 10/09/1965 | 6.973 | 0.263 | 12/1965 | 7.236 | ||
Steam | SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33018 | 04/1942 | 04/07/1965 | 23.236 | 0.449 | 12/1965 | 23.685 | ||
Steam | SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33026 | 07/1942 | 26/09/1965 | 23.216 | 0.219 | 12/1965 | 23.436 | ||
Steam | LSWR | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30824 | 03/1927 | 05/09/1965 | 38.504 | 0.277 | 12/1965 | 38.781 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42212 | 14/12/1945 | 21/08/1965 | 19.699 | 0.318 | 12/1965 | 20.016 | ||
Steam | GWR | 2800 | 2-8-0 | 3836 | 08/01/1942 | 18/11/1965 | 23.877 | 0.159 | 01/1966 | 24.036 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5932 | 23/06/1933 | 26/10/1965 | 32.364 | 0.222 | 01/1966 | 32.586 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6800 | 4-6-0 | 6829 | 01/03/1937 | 18/11/1965 | 28.737 | 0.159 | 01/1966 | 28.896 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73042 | 27/10/1953 | 08/08/1965 | 11.789 | 0.438 | 01/1966 | 12.227 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90563 | 09/1943 | 07/08/1965 | 21.910 | 0.441 | 01/1966 | 22.351 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90222 | 04/1943 | 07/08/1965 | 22.329 | 0.441 | 01/1966 | 22.770 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90641 | 06/1944 | 07/08/1965 | 21.159 | 0.441 | 01/1966 | 21.600 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90725 | 04/1945 | 07/08/1965 | 20.326 | 0.441 | 01/1966 | 20.767 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34041 | 09/1946 | 23/01/1966 | 19.370 | -0.022 | 01/1966 | 19.348 | ||
Steam | SR | MN | 4-6-2 | 35019 | 06/1945 | 05/09/1965 | 20.238 | 0.362 | 01/1966 | 20.600 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1600 | 0-6-0PT | 1651 | 01/12/1954 | 01/10/1965 | 10.841 | 0.375 | 02/1966 | 11.216 | ||
Steam | GWR | 1600 | 0-6-0PT | 1669 | 26/05/1955 | 01/10/1965 | 10.359 | 0.375 | 02/1966 | 10.734 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3615 | 29/03/1939 | 01/10/1965 | 26.529 | 0.375 | 02/1966 | 26.904 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3662 | 14/02/1940 | 25/08/1965 | 25.545 | 0.477 | 02/1966 | 26.022 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4676 | 15/04/1944 | 01/10/1965 | 21.477 | 0.375 | 02/1966 | 21.852 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6113 | 08/1931 | 18/11/1965 | 34.285 | 0.244 | 02/1966 | 34.529 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6145 | 12/1932 | 31/12/1965 | 33.066 | 0.126 | 02/1966 | 33.192 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6156 | 16/03/1933 | 03/12/1965 | 32.740 | 0.203 | 02/1966 | 32.942 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6800 | 4-6-0 | 6819 | 23/12/1936 | 18/11/1965 | 28.923 | 0.244 | 02/1966 | 29.167 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6800 | 4-6-0 | 6838 | 10/09/1937 | 18/11/1965 | 28.208 | 0.244 | 02/1966 | 28.452 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6800 | 4-6-0 | 6876 | 20/04/1939 | 18/11/1965 | 26.600 | 0.244 | 02/1966 | 26.844 | ||
Steam | GWR | 7800 | 4-6-0 | 7816 | 23/01/1939 | 18/11/1965 | 26.838 | 0.244 | 02/1966 | 27.082 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73111 | 15/10/1955 | 10/1965 | 10.008 | 0.337 | 02/1966 | 10.345 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76025 | 29/09/1953 | 31/10/1965 | 12.096 | 0.293 | 02/1966 | 12.389 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76062 | 07/1955 | 03/10/1965 | 10.227 | 0.370 | 02/1966 | 10.597 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78004 | 21/01/1953 | 18/11/1965 | 12.833 | 0.244 | 02/1966 | 13.077 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82001 | 18/04/1952 | 31/12/1965 | 13.712 | 0.126 | 02/1966 | 13.838 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92007 | 18/02/1954 | 31/12/1965 | 11.874 | 0.126 | 02/1966 | 12.000 | ||
Steam | SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 30067 | 1942 | 09/07/1967 | -1.395 | 02/1966 | ||||
Steam | SR | U | 2-6-0 | 31627 | 04/1929 | 03/10/1965 | 36.493 | 0.370 | 02/1966 | 36.863 | ||
Steam | SR | U | 2-6-0 | 31800 | 12/1928 | 03/10/1965 | 36.825 | 0.370 | 02/1966 | 37.195 | ||
Steam | SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33009 | 07/1942 | 26/09/1965 | 23.216 | 0.389 | 02/1966 | 23.605 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48732 | 10/1945 | 26/10/1965 | 20.044 | 0.307 | 02/1966 | 20.351 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90420 | 03/1945 | 06/1965 | 20.266 | 0.671 | 02/1966 | 20.937 | ||
Steam | MR | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44264 | 10/1926 | 26/10/1965 | 39.058 | 0.307 | 02/1966 | 39.364 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42432 | 14/03/1936 | 21/08/1965 | 29.458 | 0.488 | 02/1966 | 29.945 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42119 | 23/08/1949 | 21/08/1965 | 16.005 | 0.488 | 02/1966 | 16.493 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6135 | 10/1932 | 31/12/1965 | 33.233 | 0.203 | 03/1966 | 33.436 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6143 | 11/1932 | 18/11/1965 | 33.030 | 0.321 | 03/1966 | 33.351 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6800 | 4-6-0 | 6849 | 25/10/1937 | 31/12/1965 | 28.203 | 0.203 | 03/1966 | 28.405 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 6965 | 28/07/1944 | 26/10/1965 | 21.260 | 0.384 | 03/1966 | 21.644 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 7925 | 09/10/1950 | 31/12/1965 | 15.238 | 0.203 | 03/1966 | 15.441 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76056 | 14/05/1955 | 07/11/1965 | 10.493 | 0.351 | 03/1966 | 10.844 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80039 | 18/06/1952 | 21/01/1966 | 13.603 | 0.145 | 03/1966 | 13.748 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92209 | 26/06/1959 | 31/12/1965 | 6.521 | 0.203 | 03/1966 | 6.723 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92230 | 01/08/1958 | 31/12/1965 | 7.422 | 0.203 | 03/1966 | 7.625 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3675 | 21/06/1940 | 31/12/1965 | 25.545 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 25.833 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3759 | 04/12/1937 | 31/12/1965 | 28.093 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 28.381 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3775 | 01/07/1938 | 31/12/1965 | 27.521 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 27.808 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4689 | 30/12/1944 | 31/12/1965 | 21.016 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 21.304 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6160 | 12/10/1935 | 31/12/1965 | 30.241 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 30.529 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6165 | 25/10/1935 | 31/12/1965 | 30.205 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 30.493 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6800 | 4-6-0 | 6848 | 22/10/1937 | 31/12/1965 | 28.211 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 28.499 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 6937 | 11/07/1942 | 31/12/1965 | 23.490 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 23.778 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 6947 | 07/12/1942 | 18/11/1965 | 22.964 | 0.405 | 04/1966 | 23.370 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 6959 | 02/03/1944 | 31/12/1965 | 21.847 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 22.134 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 7909 | 20/01/1950 | 18/11/1965 | 15.838 | 0.405 | 04/1966 | 16.244 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9672 | 08/06/1948 | 31/12/1965 | 17.575 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 17.863 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73068 | 10/1954 | 31/12/1965 | 11.219 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 11.507 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75066 | 01/09/1955 | 02/1966 | 10.466 | 0.162 | 04/1966 | 10.627 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82030 | 21/12/1954 | 31/12/1965 | 11.036 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 11.323 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 84014 | 22/09/1953 | 11/12/1965 | 12.227 | 0.342 | 04/1966 | 12.570 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92216 | 01/12/1959 | 26/10/1965 | 5.907 | 0.468 | 04/1966 | 6.375 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92235 | 22/08/1958 | 18/11/1965 | 7.247 | 0.405 | 04/1966 | 7.652 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92243 | 21/10/1958 | 31/12/1965 | 7.200 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 7.488 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92244 | 28/11/1958 | 31/12/1965 | 7.096 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 7.384 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92246 | 20/11/1958 | 31/12/1965 | 7.118 | 0.288 | 04/1966 | 7.405 | ||
Steam | SR | N | 2-6-0 | 31816 | 01/1922 | 09/01/1966 | 44.014 | 0.263 | 04/1966 | 44.277 | ||
Steam | SR | N | 2-6-0 | 31873 | 09/1925 | 23/01/1966 | 40.384 | 0.225 | 04/1966 | 40.608 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48444 | 20/06/1944 | 14/02/1966 | 21.668 | 0.164 | 04/1966 | 21.833 | ||
Steam | LSWR | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30833 | 11/1927 | 23/05/1965 | 37.545 | 0.896 | 04/1966 | 38.441 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42230 | 05/06/1946 | 07/08/1965 | 19.186 | 0.688 | 04/1966 | 19.874 | ||
Diesel | BR | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 15203 | 31/10/1937 | 29/11/1964 | 27.099 | 1.375 | 75C | Norwood Junction | 04/1966 | 28.474 |
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6136 | 10/1932 | 31/12/1965 | 33.233 | 0.370 | 05/1966 | 33.603 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6800 | 4-6-0 | 6856 | 26/11/1937 | 18/11/1965 | 27.997 | 0.488 | 05/1966 | 28.485 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6800 | 4-6-0 | 6872 | 31/03/1939 | 31/12/1965 | 26.773 | 0.370 | 05/1966 | 27.142 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 6923 | 24/07/1941 | 31/12/1965 | 24.455 | 0.370 | 05/1966 | 24.825 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 6953 | 27/02/1943 | 31/12/1965 | 22.858 | 0.370 | 05/1966 | 23.227 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 6967 | 15/08/1944 | 31/12/1965 | 21.392 | 0.370 | 05/1966 | 21.762 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 6991 | 23/11/1948 | 31/12/1965 | 17.115 | 0.370 | 05/1966 | 17.485 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 6999 | 10/02/1949 | 31/12/1965 | 16.899 | 0.370 | 05/1966 | 17.268 | ||
Steam | GWR | 7800 | 4-6-0 | 7829 | 31/12/1950 | 31/12/1965 | 15.011 | 0.370 | 05/1966 | 15.381 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 7907 | 05/01/1950 | 31/12/1965 | 15.997 | 0.370 | 05/1966 | 16.367 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 7914 | 21/03/1950 | 31/12/1965 | 15.792 | 0.370 | 05/1966 | 16.162 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 7919 | 04/05/1950 | 31/12/1965 | 15.671 | 0.370 | 05/1966 | 16.041 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 7922 | 20/09/1950 | 31/12/1965 | 15.290 | 0.370 | 05/1966 | 15.660 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 7924 | 29/09/1950 | 31/12/1965 | 15.266 | 0.370 | 05/1966 | 15.636 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73001 | 09/05/1951 | 31/12/1965 | 14.658 | 0.370 | 05/1966 | 15.027 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73166 | 29/03/1957 | 31/12/1965 | 8.764 | 0.370 | 05/1966 | 9.134 | ||
Diesel | BR | D3/12 | 0-6-0 | 15202 | 30/09/1937 | 13/12/1964 | 27.222 | 1.419 | 73F | Ashford | 05/1966 | 28.641 |
Steam | GWR | 6800 | 4-6-0 | 6827 | 26/02/1937 | 25/09/1965 | 28.597 | 0.614 | 07/05/1966 | 29.211 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3677 | 28/06/1940 | 31/12/1965 | 25.526 | 0.455 | 06/1966 | 25.981 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3682 | 20/07/1940 | 31/12/1965 | 25.466 | 0.455 | 06/1966 | 25.921 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4680 | 30/06/1944 | 31/12/1965 | 21.518 | 0.455 | 06/1966 | 21.973 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 5971 | 17/04/1937 | 31/12/1965 | 28.726 | 0.455 | 06/1966 | 29.181 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6126 | 10/1931 | 31/12/1965 | 34.236 | 0.455 | 06/1966 | 34.690 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6134 | 10/1932 | 31/12/1965 | 33.233 | 0.455 | 06/1966 | 33.688 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 6932 | 11/12/1941 | 31/12/1965 | 24.071 | 0.455 | 06/1966 | 24.526 | ||
Steam | GWR | 4900 | 4-6-0 | 6956 | 28/03/1943 | 31/12/1965 | 22.778 | 0.455 | 06/1966 | 23.233 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 6993 | 06/12/1948 | 31/12/1965 | 17.079 | 0.455 | 06/1966 | 17.534 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6959 | 4-6-0 | 7904 | 19/04/1949 | 31/12/1965 | 16.712 | 0.455 | 06/1966 | 17.167 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9626 | 27/11/1945 | 31/12/1965 | 20.107 | 0.455 | 06/1966 | 20.562 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9680 | 25/04/1949 | 31/12/1965 | 16.696 | 0.455 | 06/1966 | 17.151 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9773 | 07/03/1936 | 31/12/1965 | 29.838 | 0.455 | 06/1966 | 30.293 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73003 | 05/1951 | 31/12/1965 | 14.641 | 0.455 | 06/1966 | 15.096 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80037 | 24/05/1952 | 07/03/1966 | 13.795 | 0.274 | 06/1966 | 14.068 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80041 | 05/07/1952 | 07/03/1966 | 13.679 | 0.274 | 06/1966 | 13.953 | ||
Steam | WD | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90258 | 09/1943 | 23/01/1966 | 22.373 | 0.392 | 06/1966 | 22.764 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4113 | 20/10/1936 | 18/11/1965 | 29.099 | 0.655 | 07/1966 | 29.753 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4161 | 14/09/1948 | 18/11/1965 | 17.189 | 0.655 | 07/1966 | 17.844 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6111 | 08/1931 | 31/12/1965 | 34.403 | 0.537 | 07/1966 | 34.940 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6141 | 11/1932 | 31/12/1965 | 33.148 | 0.537 | 07/1966 | 33.685 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80043 | 24/07/1952 | 07/03/1966 | 13.627 | 0.356 | 07/1966 | 13.984 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92250 | 31/12/1958 | 31/12/1965 | 7.005 | 0.537 | 07/1966 | 7.542 | ||
Steam | SR | U | 2-6-0 | 31803 | 06/1928 | 13/03/1966 | 37.767 | 0.340 | 07/1966 | 38.107 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34048 | 11/1946 | 13/03/1966 | 19.337 | 0.340 | 07/1966 | 19.677 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34079 | 07/1948 | 27/02/1966 | 17.633 | 0.378 | 07/1966 | 18.011 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42247 | 11/10/1946 | 14/08/1965 | 18.855 | 0.918 | 07/1966 | 19.773 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42174 | 30/10/1948 | 07/08/1965 | 16.781 | 0.937 | 07/1966 | 17.718 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3681 | 18/07/1940 | 07/03/1966 | 25.652 | 0.441 | 08/1966 | 26.093 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3758 | 04/12/1937 | 07/03/1966 | 28.274 | 0.441 | 08/1966 | 28.715 | ||
Steam | GWR | 6100 | 2-6-2T | 6147 | 02/01/1933 | 31/12/1965 | 33.016 | 0.622 | 08/1966 | 33.638 | ||
Steam | SR | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 33006 | 06/1942 | 09/01/1966 | 23.586 | 0.597 | 08/1966 | 24.184 | ||
Steam | SR | N | 2-6-0 | 31405 | 11/1932 | 05/06/1966 | 33.575 | 0.279 | 09/1966 | 33.855 | ||
Steam | SR | N | 2-6-0 | 31408 | 09/1933 | 05/06/1966 | 32.742 | 0.279 | 09/1966 | 33.022 | ||
Steam | SR | N | 2-6-0 | 31411 | 11/1933 | 24/04/1966 | 32.460 | 0.395 | 09/1966 | 32.855 | ||
Steam | SR | U | 2-6-0 | 31639 | 05/1931 | 05/06/1966 | 35.082 | 0.279 | 09/1966 | 35.362 | ||
Steam | SR | U | 2-6-0 | 31791 | 06/1928 | 05/06/1966 | 37.997 | 0.279 | 09/1966 | 38.277 | ||
Steam | LSWR | S15 | 4-6-0 | 30837 | 01/1928 | 19/09/1965 | 37.704 | 0.989 | 09/1966 | 38.693 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34038 | 09/1946 | 12/06/1966 | 19.753 | 0.260 | 09/1966 | 20.014 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34082 | 09/1948 | 24/04/1966 | 17.616 | 0.395 | 09/1966 | 18.011 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34097 | 11/1949 | 10/04/1966 | 16.411 | 0.433 | 09/1966 | 16.844 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73081 | 17/06/1955 | 31/07/1966 | 11.129 | 0.208 | 10/1966 | 11.337 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73114 | 11/1956 | 05/06/1966 | 9.559 | 0.362 | 10/1966 | 9.921 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34076 | 06/1948 | 09/01/1966 | 17.581 | 0.849 | 11/1966 | 18.430 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76038 | 01/07/1954 | 10/09/1966 | 12.203 | 0.263 | 12/1966 | 12.466 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76043 | 10/08/1954 | 10/09/1966 | 12.093 | 0.263 | 12/1966 | 12.356 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78010 | 12/1953 | 10/09/1966 | 12.745 | 0.263 | 12/1966 | 13.008 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43113 | 13/04/1951 | 03/09/1966 | 15.403 | 0.282 | 12/1966 | 15.685 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 9610 | 16/07/1945 | 24/09/1966 | 21.205 | 0.310 | 01/1967 | 21.515 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 7P | 4-6-2 | 70017 | 02/06/1951 | 01/10/1966 | 15.342 | 0.290 | 01/1967 | 15.633 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80065 | 25/06/1953 | 04/09/1966 | 13.203 | 0.364 | 01/1967 | 13.567 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80082 | 15/04/1954 | 04/09/1966 | 12.397 | 0.364 | 01/1967 | 12.762 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46442 | 02/1950 | 08/10/1966 | 16.655 | 0.271 | 01/1967 | 16.926 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46509 | 05/12/1952 | 08/10/1966 | 13.849 | 0.271 | 01/1967 | 14.121 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73083 | 07/1955 | 04/09/1966 | 11.148 | 0.449 | 02/1967 | 11.597 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80138 | 12/06/1956 | 02/10/1966 | 10.312 | 0.373 | 02/1967 | 10.685 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82028 | 02/12/1954 | 04/09/1966 | 11.764 | 0.449 | 02/1967 | 12.214 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46421 | 06/11/1948 | 08/10/1966 | 17.932 | 0.356 | 02/1967 | 18.288 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46427 | 04/12/1948 | 08/10/1966 | 17.855 | 0.356 | 02/1967 | 18.211 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73086 | 16/08/1955 | 02/10/1966 | 11.137 | 0.449 | 03/1967 | 11.586 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73171 | 24/05/1957 | 02/10/1966 | 9.364 | 0.449 | 03/1967 | 9.814 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75070 | 13/10/1955 | 11/09/1966 | 10.921 | 0.507 | 03/1967 | 11.427 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76059 | 06/1955 | 25/09/1966 | 11.288 | 0.468 | 03/1967 | 11.756 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78031 | 09/1954 | 08/10/1966 | 12.071 | 0.433 | 03/1967 | 12.504 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78039 | 27/11/1954 | 01/10/1966 | 11.852 | 0.452 | 03/1967 | 12.304 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78060 | 13/10/1956 | 08/10/1966 | 9.992 | 0.433 | 03/1967 | 10.425 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80068 | 21/08/1953 | 02/10/1966 | 13.123 | 0.449 | 03/1967 | 13.573 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80089 | 03/08/1954 | 02/10/1966 | 12.173 | 0.449 | 03/1967 | 12.622 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80095 | 13/11/1954 | 02/10/1966 | 11.893 | 0.449 | 03/1967 | 12.342 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82023 | 22/10/1954 | 02/10/1966 | 11.953 | 0.449 | 03/1967 | 12.403 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46454 | 04/1950 | 08/10/1966 | 16.493 | 0.433 | 03/1967 | 16.926 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41299 | 11/1951 | 02/10/1966 | 14.890 | 0.449 | 03/1967 | 15.340 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41316 | 06/1952 | 02/10/1966 | 14.307 | 0.449 | 03/1967 | 14.756 | ||
Diesel | BR | 04 | 0-6-0 | 52 | 01/01/1950 | 01/03/1967 | 17.173 | 0.038 | 03/1967 | 17.211 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73028 | 28/12/1951 | 10/12/1966 | 14.962 | 0.345 | 04/1967 | 15.307 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73047 | 08/12/1953 | 05/12/1964 | 11.000 | 2.359 | 04/1967 | 13.359 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73087 | 26/08/1955 | 02/10/1966 | 11.110 | 0.534 | 04/1967 | 11.644 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82000 | 04/04/1952 | 10/12/1966 | 14.693 | 0.345 | 04/1967 | 15.038 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82003 | 02/05/1952 | 10/12/1966 | 14.616 | 0.345 | 04/1967 | 14.962 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34012 | 10/1945 | 11/12/1966 | 21.170 | 0.342 | 04/1967 | 21.512 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44839 | 09/1944 | 10/12/1966 | 22.249 | 0.345 | 04/1967 | 22.595 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 7P | 4-6-2 | 70026 | 07/10/1952 | 14/01/1967 | 14.279 | 0.247 | 14/04/1967 | 14.526 | ||
Steam | GWR | 5700 | 0-6-0PT | 4646 | 28/02/1943 | 12/11/1966 | 23.721 | 0.504 | 05/1967 | 24.225 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73019 | 10/10/1951 | 14/01/1967 | 15.274 | 0.332 | 05/1967 | 15.605 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73080 | 06/1955 | 25/12/1966 | 11.537 | 0.386 | 05/1967 | 11.923 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73113 | 10/1956 | 22/01/1967 | 10.277 | 0.310 | 05/1967 | 10.586 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80032 | 04/03/1952 | 29/01/1967 | 14.915 | 0.290 | 05/1967 | 15.205 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48187 | 04/1942 | 07/01/1967 | 24.748 | 0.351 | 05/1967 | 25.099 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48756 | 11/1945 | 07/01/1967 | 21.159 | 0.351 | 05/1967 | 21.510 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73088 | 01/09/1955 | 02/10/1966 | 11.093 | 0.701 | 06/1967 | 11.795 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73089 | 09/09/1955 | 25/09/1966 | 11.052 | 0.721 | 06/1967 | 11.773 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73110 | 24/09/1955 | 29/01/1967 | 11.356 | 0.375 | 06/1967 | 11.732 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73169 | 26/04/1957 | 02/10/1966 | 9.441 | 0.701 | 06/1967 | 10.142 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76016 | 26/05/1953 | 02/10/1966 | 13.362 | 0.701 | 06/1967 | 14.063 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76018 | 26/06/1953 | 02/10/1966 | 13.277 | 0.701 | 06/1967 | 13.978 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76047 | 18/03/1955 | 03/12/1966 | 11.721 | 0.532 | 06/1967 | 12.252 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76052 | 06/09/1956 | 10/12/1966 | 10.266 | 0.512 | 06/1967 | 10.778 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76061 | 07/1955 | 08/01/1967 | 11.493 | 0.433 | 06/1967 | 11.926 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82031 | 30/12/1954 | 10/12/1966 | 11.953 | 0.512 | 06/1967 | 12.466 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 3MT Tank | 2-6-2T | 82034 | 28/01/1955 | 10/12/1966 | 11.874 | 0.512 | 06/1967 | 12.386 | ||
Steam | SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 30073 | 1943 | 08/01/1967 | 0.433 | 06/1967 | ||||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48711 | 07/1944 | 07/01/1967 | 22.496 | 0.436 | 06/1967 | 22.932 | ||
Steam | LMS | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42727 | 31/10/1927 | 07/01/1967 | 39.214 | 0.436 | 06/1967 | 39.649 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42577 | 24/09/1936 | 14/01/1967 | 30.326 | 0.416 | 06/1967 | 30.742 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42102 | 08/09/1950 | 17/12/1966 | 16.285 | 0.493 | 06/1967 | 16.778 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73002 | 18/05/1951 | 19/03/1967 | 15.847 | 0.323 | 07/1967 | 16.170 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73016 | 21/09/1951 | 04/12/1966 | 15.214 | 0.611 | 07/1967 | 15.825 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76048 | 25/03/1955 | 04/02/1967 | 11.874 | 0.441 | 07/1967 | 12.315 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76057 | 21/05/1955 | 02/10/1966 | 11.375 | 0.784 | 07/1967 | 12.159 | ||
Steam | SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 30061 | 1942 | 20/10/1962 | 4.737 | 07/1967 | ||||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44737 | 31/03/1949 | 14/01/1967 | 17.803 | 0.499 | 07/1967 | 18.301 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44779 | 07/1947 | 17/12/1966 | 19.438 | 0.575 | 07/1967 | 20.014 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45197 | 10/1935 | 14/01/1967 | 31.271 | 0.499 | 07/1967 | 31.770 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45223 | 12/1935 | 10/12/1966 | 31.008 | 0.595 | 07/1967 | 31.603 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73117 | 25/11/1955 | 19/03/1967 | 11.321 | 0.408 | 08/1967 | 11.729 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75004 | 27/08/1951 | 11/03/1967 | 15.548 | 0.430 | 08/1967 | 15.978 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76053 | 23/04/1955 | 29/01/1967 | 11.778 | 0.542 | 08/1967 | 12.321 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78036 | 13/11/1954 | 03/12/1966 | 12.063 | 0.699 | 08/1967 | 12.762 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34077 | 07/1948 | 26/03/1967 | 18.707 | 0.389 | 08/1967 | 19.096 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44919 | 12/1945 | 17/12/1966 | 21.019 | 0.660 | 08/1967 | 21.679 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73022 | 26/10/1951 | 16/04/1967 | 15.482 | 0.416 | 09/1967 | 15.899 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73119 | 09/12/1955 | 19/03/1967 | 11.282 | 0.493 | 09/1967 | 11.775 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 4-6-0 | 75064 | 26/06/1957 | 20/05/1967 | 9.904 | 0.323 | 09/1967 | 10.227 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76033 | 17/12/1953 | 01/1967 | 13.088 | 0.666 | 09/1967 | 13.753 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76087 | 07/05/1957 | 07/01/1967 | 9.677 | 0.688 | 09/1967 | 10.364 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78003 | 31/12/1952 | 17/12/1966 | 13.970 | 0.745 | 09/1967 | 14.715 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78058 | 09/1956 | 10/12/1966 | 10.241 | 0.764 | 09/1967 | 11.005 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78063 | 11/1956 | 10/12/1966 | 10.074 | 0.764 | 09/1967 | 10.838 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34006 | 08/1945 | 19/03/1967 | 21.605 | 0.493 | 09/1967 | 22.099 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34015 | 11/1945 | 16/04/1967 | 21.430 | 0.416 | 09/1967 | 21.847 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34019 | 12/1945 | 19/03/1967 | 21.271 | 0.493 | 09/1967 | 21.764 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34044 | 10/1946 | 21/05/1967 | 20.611 | 0.321 | 09/1967 | 20.932 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34056 | 02/1947 | 07/05/1967 | 20.236 | 0.359 | 09/1967 | 20.595 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34071 | 04/1948 | 30/04/1967 | 19.052 | 0.378 | 09/1967 | 19.430 | ||
Steam | SR | MN | 4-6-2 | 35014 | 02/1945 | 26/03/1967 | 22.121 | 0.474 | 09/1967 | 22.595 | ||
Steam | SR | MN | 4-6-2 | 35026 | 12/1948 | 26/03/1967 | 18.288 | 0.474 | 09/1967 | 18.762 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46406 | 12/1946 | 21/01/1967 | 20.115 | 0.649 | 09/1967 | 20.764 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46418 | 03/1947 | 21/01/1967 | 19.868 | 0.649 | 09/1967 | 20.518 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46446 | 03/1950 | 17/12/1966 | 16.770 | 0.745 | 09/1967 | 17.515 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46465 | 06/1951 | 04/03/1967 | 15.729 | 0.534 | 09/1967 | 16.263 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73026 | 27/11/1951 | 01/04/1967 | 15.353 | 0.540 | 10/1967 | 15.893 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 2MT | 2-6-0 | 78017 | 03/1954 | 10/12/1966 | 12.748 | 0.847 | 10/1967 | 13.595 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34001 | 06/1945 | 09/07/1967 | 22.079 | 0.268 | 10/1967 | 22.348 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34002 | 06/1945 | 02/04/1967 | 21.811 | 0.537 | 10/1967 | 22.348 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34004 | 06/1945 | 09/07/1967 | 22.079 | 0.268 | 10/1967 | 22.348 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34013 | 10/1945 | 09/07/1967 | 21.745 | 0.268 | 10/1967 | 22.014 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34057 | 03/1947 | 07/05/1967 | 20.159 | 0.441 | 10/1967 | 20.600 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34100 | 12/1949 | 02/07/1967 | 17.556 | 0.288 | 10/1967 | 17.844 | ||
Steam | SR | MN | 4-6-2 | 35012 | 01/1945 | 23/04/1967 | 22.282 | 0.479 | 10/1967 | 22.762 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44981 | 07/1946 | 14/01/1967 | 20.515 | 0.751 | 10/1967 | 21.266 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73115 | 15/11/1955 | 19/03/1967 | 11.348 | 0.660 | 11/1967 | 12.008 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76037 | 11/06/1954 | 10/06/1967 | 13.005 | 0.433 | 11/1967 | 13.438 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT Tank | 2-6-4T | 80145 | 16/10/1956 | 25/06/1967 | 10.696 | 0.392 | 11/1967 | 11.088 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48057 | 10/1936 | 13/05/1967 | 30.595 | 0.510 | 11/1967 | 31.104 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48640 | 10/1943 | 13/05/1967 | 23.592 | 0.510 | 11/1967 | 24.101 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48648 | 12/1943 | 22/07/1967 | 23.616 | 0.318 | 11/1967 | 23.934 | ||
Steam | LMS | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42647 | 14/12/1938 | 13/05/1967 | 28.430 | 0.510 | 11/1967 | 28.940 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48194 | 06/1942 | 19/08/1967 | 25.195 | 0.323 | 12/1967 | 25.518 | ||
Steam | SR | MN | 4-6-2 | 35003 | 09/1941 | 09/07/1967 | 25.830 | 0.436 | 12/1967 | 26.266 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46508 | 02/12/1952 | 17/12/1966 | 14.049 | 0.995 | 12/1967 | 15.044 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44766 | 12/1947 | 19/08/1967 | 19.690 | 0.323 | 12/1967 | 20.014 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45089 | 04/1935 | 26/08/1967 | 32.386 | 0.304 | 12/1967 | 32.690 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73014 | 06/09/1951 | 22/07/1967 | 15.885 | 0.485 | 01/1968 | 16.370 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73018 | 04/10/1951 | 09/07/1967 | 15.773 | 0.521 | 01/1968 | 16.293 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73020 | 16/10/1951 | 09/07/1967 | 15.740 | 0.521 | 01/1968 | 16.260 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73048 | 17/12/1953 | 14/10/1967 | 13.833 | 0.255 | 01/1968 | 14.088 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73092 | 21/10/1955 | 09/07/1967 | 11.723 | 0.521 | 01/1968 | 12.244 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73139 | 22/11/1956 | 13/05/1967 | 10.477 | 0.677 | 01/1968 | 11.153 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76009 | 26/02/1953 | 09/07/1967 | 14.373 | 0.521 | 01/1968 | 14.893 | ||
Steam | SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 30062 | 1942 | 01/12/1962 | 5.126 | 01/1968 | ||||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48149 | 08/1942 | 14/01/1967 | 24.433 | 1.003 | 01/1968 | 25.436 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45336 | 03/1937 | 14/01/1967 | 29.855 | 1.003 | 01/1968 | 30.858 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48359 | 07/1944 | 16/09/1967 | 23.186 | 0.416 | 02/1968 | 23.603 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48522 | 11/1944 | 19/08/1967 | 22.773 | 0.493 | 02/1968 | 23.266 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34036 | 07/1946 | 09/07/1967 | 20.997 | 0.605 | 02/1968 | 21.603 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34052 | 12/1946 | 09/07/1967 | 20.578 | 0.605 | 02/1968 | 21.184 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44866 | 02/1945 | 09/09/1967 | 22.578 | 0.436 | 02/1968 | 23.014 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44927 | 02/1946 | 16/09/1967 | 21.597 | 0.416 | 02/1968 | 22.014 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45261 | 10/1936 | 21/10/1967 | 31.036 | 0.321 | 02/1968 | 31.356 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73025 | 19/11/1951 | 14/10/1967 | 15.912 | 0.375 | 28/02/1968 | 16.288 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73045 | 18/11/1953 | 26/08/1967 | 13.778 | 0.510 | 28/02/1968 | 14.288 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73071 | 20/11/1954 | 16/09/1967 | 12.830 | 0.452 | 28/02/1968 | 13.282 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73073 | 18/12/1954 | 04/11/1967 | 12.888 | 0.318 | 28/02/1968 | 13.205 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73094 | 10/11/1955 | 13/05/1967 | 11.512 | 0.797 | 28/02/1968 | 12.310 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73127 | 09/08/1956 | 04/11/1967 | 11.244 | 0.318 | 28/02/1968 | 11.562 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73140 | 29/11/1956 | 28/10/1967 | 10.918 | 0.337 | 28/02/1968 | 11.255 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73141 | 06/12/1956 | 29/07/1967 | 10.649 | 0.586 | 28/02/1968 | 11.236 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73144 | 28/12/1956 | 26/08/1967 | 10.666 | 0.510 | 28/02/1968 | 11.175 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73158 | 28/12/1956 | 14/10/1967 | 10.800 | 0.375 | 28/02/1968 | 11.175 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73004 | 08/06/1951 | 28/10/1967 | 16.400 | 0.381 | 03/1968 | 16.781 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73037 | 08/09/1953 | 09/07/1967 | 13.841 | 0.685 | 03/1968 | 14.526 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73043 | 30/10/1953 | 09/07/1967 | 13.699 | 0.685 | 03/1968 | 14.384 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73065 | 13/10/1954 | 09/07/1967 | 12.745 | 0.685 | 03/1968 | 13.430 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73093 | 04/11/1955 | 09/07/1967 | 11.685 | 0.685 | 03/1968 | 12.370 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73155 | 19/12/1956 | 09/07/1967 | 10.559 | 0.685 | 03/1968 | 11.244 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73159 | 11/01/1957 | 28/10/1967 | 10.800 | 0.381 | 03/1968 | 11.181 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 4MT | 2-6-0 | 76069 | 15/08/1956 | 18/06/1967 | 10.847 | 0.742 | 03/1968 | 11.589 | ||
Steam | SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 30069 | 1943 | 09/07/1967 | 0.685 | 03/1968 | ||||
Steam | SR | USA | 0-6-0T | 30071 | 1943 | 09/07/1967 | 0.685 | 03/1968 | ||||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48509 | 11/1944 | 13/05/1967 | 22.504 | 0.841 | 03/1968 | 23.345 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34021 | 01/1946 | 09/07/1967 | 21.493 | 0.685 | 03/1968 | 22.178 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34024 | 02/1946 | 09/07/1967 | 21.408 | 0.685 | 03/1968 | 22.093 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34025 | 03/1946 | 09/07/1967 | 21.332 | 0.685 | 03/1968 | 22.016 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34037 | 08/1946 | 09/07/1967 | 20.912 | 0.685 | 03/1968 | 21.597 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34040 | 09/1946 | 02/07/1967 | 20.808 | 0.704 | 03/1968 | 21.512 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34088 | 12/1948 | 19/03/1967 | 18.268 | 0.992 | 03/1968 | 19.260 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34090 | 02/1949 | 09/07/1967 | 18.405 | 0.685 | 03/1968 | 19.090 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34093 | 10/1949 | 09/07/1967 | 17.742 | 0.685 | 03/1968 | 18.427 | ||
Steam | LMS | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46411 | 01/1947 | 14/01/1967 | 20.011 | 1.167 | 03/1968 | 21.178 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44835 | 09/1944 | 22/07/1967 | 22.863 | 0.649 | 03/1968 | 23.512 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44913 | 11/1945 | 29/07/1967 | 21.715 | 0.630 | 03/1968 | 22.345 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45015 | 04/1935 | 16/09/1967 | 32.444 | 0.496 | 03/1968 | 32.940 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45440 | 11/1937 | 16/09/1967 | 29.855 | 0.496 | 03/1968 | 30.351 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73029 | 17/01/1952 | 09/07/1967 | 15.485 | 0.726 | 30/03/1968 | 16.211 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73085 | 05/08/1955 | 02/07/1967 | 11.915 | 0.789 | 04/1968 | 12.704 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73118 | 12/1956 | 09/07/1967 | 10.570 | 0.770 | 04/1968 | 11.340 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48166 | 04/1943 | 14/10/1967 | 24.515 | 0.504 | 04/1968 | 25.019 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34018 | 12/1945 | 09/07/1967 | 21.578 | 0.770 | 04/1968 | 22.348 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34095 | 10/1949 | 09/07/1967 | 17.742 | 0.770 | 04/1968 | 18.512 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73033 | 07/08/1953 | 30/01/1968 | 14.490 | 0.290 | 05/1968 | 14.781 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73035 | 24/08/1953 | 30/01/1968 | 14.444 | 0.290 | 05/1968 | 14.734 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73053 | 04/06/1954 | 09/03/1968 | 13.773 | 0.184 | 05/1968 | 13.956 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73131 | 24/09/1956 | 30/01/1968 | 11.356 | 0.290 | 05/1968 | 11.647 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34060 | 04/1947 | 06/1967 | 20.181 | 0.918 | 05/1968 | 21.099 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34087 | 12/1948 | 09/07/1967 | 18.575 | 0.852 | 05/1968 | 19.427 | ||
Steam | SR | WCBB | 4-6-2 | 34089 | 12/1948 | 09/07/1967 | 18.575 | 0.852 | 05/1968 | 19.427 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44736 | 28/02/1949 | 23/09/1967 | 18.578 | 0.644 | 05/1968 | 19.222 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44772 | 05/1947 | 10/1967 | 20.433 | 0.584 | 05/1968 | 21.016 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44822 | 12/1944 | 21/10/1967 | 22.863 | 0.567 | 05/1968 | 23.430 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73034 | 14/08/1953 | 16/03/1968 | 14.597 | 0.249 | 06/1968 | 14.847 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73136 | 03/11/1956 | 16/03/1968 | 11.373 | 0.249 | 06/1968 | 11.622 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92153 | 31/10/1957 | 30/01/1968 | 10.255 | 0.375 | 06/1968 | 10.630 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92165 | 30/04/1958 | 16/03/1968 | 9.885 | 0.249 | 06/1968 | 10.134 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44679 | 31/05/1950 | 23/09/1967 | 17.326 | 0.729 | 06/1968 | 18.055 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44907 | 11/1945 | 10/1967 | 21.929 | 0.668 | 06/1968 | 22.597 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45226 | 08/1936 | 16/09/1967 | 31.107 | 0.748 | 06/1968 | 31.855 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45239 | 08/1936 | 16/09/1967 | 31.107 | 0.748 | 06/1968 | 31.855 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45263 | 10/1936 | 21/10/1967 | 31.036 | 0.652 | 06/1968 | 31.688 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45417 | 10/1937 | 22/07/1967 | 29.786 | 0.901 | 06/1968 | 30.688 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92004 | 30/01/1954 | 23/03/1968 | 14.153 | 0.312 | 07/1968 | 14.466 | ||
Steam | BR | Std 9F | 2-10-0 | 92009 | 31/03/1954 | 23/03/1968 | 13.989 | 0.312 | 07/1968 | 14.301 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48421 | 06/12/1943 | 10/02/1968 | 24.197 | 0.427 | 07/1968 | 24.625 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48437 | 03/05/1944 | 30/03/1968 | 23.923 | 0.293 | 07/1968 | 24.216 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48464 | 13/01/1945 | 26/08/1967 | 22.630 | 0.888 | 07/1968 | 23.518 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48639 | 09/1943 | 03/02/1968 | 24.403 | 0.447 | 07/1968 | 24.849 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48731 | 09/1945 | 26/08/1967 | 21.959 | 0.888 | 07/1968 | 22.847 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48768 | 03/1946 | 19/08/1967 | 21.444 | 0.907 | 07/1968 | 22.351 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45225 | 08/1936 | 14/10/1967 | 31.184 | 0.753 | 07/1968 | 31.937 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45395 | 08/1937 | 23/03/1968 | 30.625 | 0.312 | 07/1968 | 30.937 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48313 | 12/1943 | 16/09/1967 | 23.770 | 0.915 | 08/1968 | 24.685 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48350 | 04/1944 | 16/09/1967 | 23.436 | 0.915 | 08/1968 | 24.351 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45131 | 05/1935 | 20/04/1968 | 32.956 | 0.321 | 8C | Speke Junction | 08/1968 | 33.277 |
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45415 | 10/1937 | 10/1967 | 30.019 | 0.836 | 08/1968 | 30.855 | ||
Diesel | BR | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | D602 | 03/11/1958 | 31/12/1967 | 9.164 | 0.625 | 08/1968 | 9.789 | ||
Diesel | BR | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | D603 | 21/11/1958 | 31/12/1967 | 9.115 | 0.625 | 08/1968 | 9.740 | ||
Diesel | BR | D20/2 | A1A-A1A | D604 | 20/01/1959 | 31/12/1967 | 8.951 | 0.625 | 08/1968 | 9.575 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48153 | 09/1942 | 16/03/1968 | 25.518 | 0.501 | 09/1968 | 26.019 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45262 | 10/1936 | 03/08/1968 | 31.822 | 0.118 | 09/1968 | 31.940 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45271 | 11/1936 | 23/09/1967 | 30.874 | 0.981 | 09/1968 | 31.855 | ||
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48249 | 07/1940 | 10/12/1966 | 26.422 | 1.849 | 10/1968 | 28.271 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45107 | 05/1935 | 16/09/1967 | 32.362 | 1.082 | 10/1968 | 33.444 | ||
Steam | LMS | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45373 | 06/1937 | 23/09/1967 | 30.293 | 1.063 | 10/1968 | 31.356 | ||
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6302 | 19/02/1959 | 26/05/1968 | 9.271 | 0.474 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | 11/1968 | 9.745 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6304 | 23/06/1959 | 26/05/1968 | 8.932 | 0.474 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | 11/1968 | 9.405 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6305 | 11/01/1960 | 26/05/1968 | 8.378 | 0.474 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | 11/1968 | 8.852 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6313 | 12/01/1960 | 03/08/1968 | 8.564 | 0.285 | 84A | Laira | 11/1968 | 8.849 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6347 | 02/06/1962 | 31/03/1968 | 5.833 | 0.627 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 11/1968 | 6.460 |
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2143 | 13/01/1961 | 06/07/1968 | 7.482 | 0.444 | 12/1968 | 7.926 | ||
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6300 | 12/01/1959 | 26/05/1968 | 9.375 | 0.556 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | 12/1968 | 9.932 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6303 | 22/05/1959 | 26/05/1968 | 9.019 | 0.556 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | 12/1968 | 9.575 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6316 | 01/03/1960 | 31/03/1968 | 8.088 | 0.710 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 12/1968 | 8.797 |
Steam | LMS | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48722 | 08/1944 | 11/05/1968 | 23.753 | 0.682 | 8A | Edge Hill | 01/1969 | 24.436 |
Steam | BR | Std 5MT | 4-6-0 | 73069 | 06/11/1954 | 10/08/1968 | 13.770 | 0.595 | 03/1969 | 14.364 | ||
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6306 | 12/10/1959 | 21/12/1968 | 9.200 | 0.397 | 83D | Exmouth Junction | 05/1969 | 9.597 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6311 | 07/01/1960 | 23/09/1968 | 8.718 | 0.641 | 84A | Laira | 05/1969 | 9.359 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6314 | 25/01/1960 | 03/05/1969 | 9.277 | 0.033 | 84A | Laira | 05/1969 | 9.310 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6324 | 01/06/1960 | 14/09/1968 | 8.293 | 0.666 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 05/1969 | 8.959 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6325 | 14/06/1960 | 05/10/1968 | 8.315 | 0.608 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 05/1969 | 8.923 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6329 | 18/06/1960 | 30/11/1968 | 8.458 | 0.455 | 83A | Newton Abbot | 05/1969 | 8.912 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6335 | 22/02/1961 | 14/09/1968 | 7.564 | 0.666 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 05/1969 | 8.230 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6341 | 12/05/1962 | 30/11/1968 | 6.559 | 0.455 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 05/1969 | 7.014 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6342 | 11/05/1962 | 21/12/1968 | 6.619 | 0.397 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 05/1969 | 7.016 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6344 | 18/05/1962 | 14/09/1968 | 6.332 | 0.666 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 05/1969 | 6.997 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6350 | 27/06/1962 | 14/09/1968 | 6.222 | 0.666 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 05/1969 | 6.888 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6351 | 27/06/1962 | 30/11/1969 | 7.433 | -0.545 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 05/1969 | 6.888 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6355 | 24/08/1962 | 14/09/1968 | 6.063 | 0.666 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 05/1969 | 6.729 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6357 | 13/11/1962 | 21/12/1968 | 6.110 | 0.397 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 05/1969 | 6.507 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6317 | 01/03/1960 | 23/09/1968 | 8.570 | 0.726 | 84A | Laira | 06/1969 | 9.296 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6321 | 07/04/1960 | 03/08/1968 | 8.329 | 0.866 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 06/1969 | 9.195 |
Diesel | BR | 42 | B-B | D800 | 11/08/1958 | 05/10/1968 | 10.159 | 0.775 | 07/1969 | 10.934 | ||
Diesel | BR | 43 | B-B | D863 | 07/04/1962 | 26/03/1969 | 6.973 | 0.304 | 07/1969 | 7.277 | ||
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6345 | 19/05/1962 | 14/09/1968 | 6.329 | 0.833 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 07/1969 | 7.162 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6353 | 12/07/1962 | 23/09/1968 | 6.205 | 0.808 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 07/1969 | 7.014 |
Diesel | BR | 22 | B-B | D6346 | 08/06/1962 | 03/05/1969 | 6.907 | 0.285 | 81A | Old Oak Common | 08/1969 | 7.192 |
Electric | BR | 70 | C-C | 20001 | 26/07/1941 | 01/1969 | 27.493 | 0.666 | 75A | Brighton | 09/1969 | 28.159 |
Electric | BR | 70 | C-C | 20002 | 09/1945 | 12/1968 | 23.266 | 0.751 | 09/1969 | 24.016 | ||
Diesel | BR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12042 | 13/11/1947 | 19/10/1968 | 20.948 | 1.074 | 11/1969 | 22.022 | ||
Diesel | BR | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15226 | 30/12/1950 | 28/04/1969 | 18.340 | 0.551 | 11/1969 | 18.890 | ||
Diesel | BR | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15233 | 24/11/1951 | 07/05/1969 | 17.463 | 0.526 | 11/1969 | 17.989 | ||
Diesel | BR | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15225 | 09/11/1949 | 31/10/1971 | 21.989 | 0.458 | 04/1972 | 22.447 | ||
Diesel | BR | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15214 | 07/05/1949 | 10/1971 | 22.455 | 0.584 | 05/1972 | 23.038 | ||
Diesel | BR | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15219 | 09/07/1949 | 31/10/1971 | 22.326 | 0.540 | 05/1972 | 22.866 | ||
Diesel | BR | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15221 | 20/08/1949 | 31/10/1971 | 22.211 | 0.540 | 05/1972 | 22.751 | ||
Diesel | BR | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15229 | 28/07/1951 | 31/10/1971 | 20.274 | 0.540 | 05/1972 | 20.814 | ||
Diesel | BR | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15211 | 02/04/1949 | 31/12/1971 | 22.762 | 0.877 | 11/1972 | 23.638 | ||
Diesel | BR | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15212 | 09/04/1949 | 31/12/1971 | 22.742 | 0.877 | 11/1972 | 23.619 | ||
Diesel | BR | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15220 | 23/07/1949 | 31/10/1971 | 22.288 | 1.044 | 11/1972 | 23.332 | ||
Diesel | BR | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15230 | 22/09/1951 | 31/10/1971 | 20.121 | 1.044 | 11/1972 | 21.164 | ||
Diesel | BR | 12 | 0-6-0 | 15235 | 15/12/1951 | 31/05/1971 | 19.471 | 1.463 | 11/1972 | 20.934 | ||
Diesel | BR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12058 | 20/10/1949 | 28/04/1971 | 21.534 | 1.805 | 02/1973 | 23.340 | ||
Diesel | BR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12130 | 15/11/1952 | 16/07/1972 | 19.679 | 0.586 | 30A | Stratford | 02/1973 | 20.266 |
Diesel | BR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12103 | 22/03/1952 | 18/06/1972 | 20.255 | 0.740 | 30A | Stratford | 03/1973 | 20.995 |
Diesel | BR | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12132 | 15/11/1952 | 25/06/1972 | 19.622 | 0.721 | 30A | Stratford | 03/1973 | 20.342 |
Diesel | BR | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3013 | 23/12/1952 | 01/10/1972 | 19.786 | 1.038 | 10/1973 | 20.825 | ||
Diesel | BR | 08 | 0-6-0 | 08039 | 19/06/1954 | 01/12/1973 | 19.466 | 0.704 | 08/1974 | 20.170 | ||
Diesel | BR | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2122 | 30/10/1959 | 26/11/1972 | 13.085 | 2.718 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 08/1975 | 15.803 |
Diesel | BR | 53 | Co-Co | D1200 | 13/10/1961 | 05/10/1975 | 13.986 | 0.493 | 02/04/1976 | 14.479 | ||
Electric | BR | 71 | Bo-Bo | 71002 | 24/02/1959 | 11/1977 | 18.737 | 0.748 | 08/1978 | 19.485 | ||
Electric | BR | 71 | Bo-Bo | 71012 | 27/10/1959 | 11/1977 | 18.066 | 0.748 | 08/1978 | 18.814 | ||
Electric | BR | 71 | Bo-Bo | 71005 | 15/06/1960 | 11/1977 | 17.430 | 0.748 | 08/1978 | 18.178 | ||
Electric | BR | 71 | Bo-Bo | 71006 | 31/08/1960 | 11/1977 | 17.219 | 0.748 | 08/1978 | 17.967 | ||
Electric | BR | 71 | Bo-Bo | 71007 | 19/06/1959 | 11/1977 | 18.422 | 0.833 | 09/1978 | 19.255 | ||
Electric | BR | 71 | Bo-Bo | 71008 | 17/07/1959 | 11/1977 | 18.345 | 0.833 | 09/1978 | 19.178 | ||
Electric | BR | 71 | Bo-Bo | 71003 | 27/04/1960 | 11/1977 | 17.564 | 2.332 | 03/1980 | 19.896 |