Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 2750 Today
» 5326 Yesterday
» 8076 Week
» 143481 Month
» 603422 Year
» 5042859 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Scrapyard: Cohens at Eastleigh Depot
Locomotives
Type |
Company |
Class |
Wheels |
Number when Cut |
Date Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Service (yrs) |
Awaiting Scrap (yrs) |
|
Depot on Withdrawal |
Date Scrapped |
Age (yrs) |
Steam |
SR |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
33015 |
11/1942 |
15/11/1964 |
22.016 |
0.252 |
|
|
02/1965 |
22.268 |
Steam |
SR |
USA |
0-6-0T |
30066 |
1942 |
30/12/1962 |
|
2.460 |
|
|
06/1965 |
|
Steam |
SR |
USA |
0-6-0T |
30074 |
1943 |
03/1963 |
|
2.422 |
|
|
08/1965 |
|
Steam |
BR |
Std 5MT |
4-6-0 |
73041 |
14/10/1953 |
20/06/1965 |
11.690 |
0.488 |
|
|
12/1965 |
12.178 |
Steam |
SR |
MN |
4-6-2 |
35004 |
10/1941 |
31/10/1965 |
24.060 |
0.293 |
|
|
02/1966 |
24.353 |
Steam |
SR |
U |
2-6-0 |
31619 |
12/1928 |
19/12/1965 |
37.036 |
0.236 |
|
|
03/1966 |
37.271 |
Steam |
SR |
N |
2-6-0 |
31866 |
05/1925 |
09/01/1966 |
40.682 |
0.178 |
|
|
03/1966 |
40.860 |
Steam |
BR |
Std 4MT Tank |
2-6-4T |
80132 |
15/03/1956 |
09/01/1966 |
9.827 |
0.263 |
|
|
04/1966 |
10.090 |