Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
03 | 0-6-0 | D2160 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | 05/09/1960 | 13/12/1981 | On shed | |
04 | 0-6-0 | D2266 | 56A | Knottingley | 09/01/1958 | 27/11/1967 | On shed | |
04 | 0-6-0 | D2271 | 55D | Royston | 14/03/1958 | 26/10/1969 | On shed | |
04 | 0-6-0 | D2272 | 55D | Royston | 28/03/1958 | 24/10/1970 | On shed | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3378 | 55D | Royston | 30/08/1957 | 21/02/1992 | On shed | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3458 | 55D | Royston | 12/06/1957 | 26/05/1985 | On shed | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3876 | 55E | Normanton | 01/04/1960 | On shed | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3937 | 55D | Royston | 04/03/1960 | 23/05/1989 | On shed | |
11 | 0-6-0 | 12113 | 55D | Royston | 19/07/1952 | 14/03/1971 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48055 | 55D | Royston | 10/1936 | 04/11/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48067 | 55D | Royston | 11/1936 | 18/10/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48070 | 20C | Royston | 11/1936 | 04/11/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48076 | 55D | Royston | 12/1936 | 04/11/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48084 | 55D | Royston | 01/1937 | 04/11/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48093 | 55D | Royston | 02/1937 | 04/11/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48113 | 20C | Royston | 03/1939 | 02/10/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48169 | 55D | Royston | 04/1943 | 04/11/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48222 | 20C | Royston | 09/1942 | 04/11/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48276 | 55D | Royston | 07/1942 | 04/11/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48352 | 55D | Royston | 05/1944 | 04/11/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48439 | 20C | Royston | 17/05/1944 | 04/11/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48473 | 55D | Royston | 18/05/1945 | 04/11/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48537 | 55D | Royston | 07/1945 | 30/10/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48540 | 20C | Royston | 12/1944 | 04/11/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48622 | 55D | Royston | 11/1943 | 04/11/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48664 | 55D | Royston | 02/1944 | 04/11/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48703 | 55D | Royston | 06/1944 | 25/09/1967 | On shed | |
8F | 2-8-0 | 48710 | 07/1944 | 17/09/1967 | On shed |