Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1112 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18915 Week
» 71931 Month
» 191458 Year
» 3218311 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Timelines
Noted at J Cashmore's scrapyard, Newport - Wednesday 13/08/1969
Class |
Wheels |
Loco |
Code |
Allocation |
To Service |
Withdrawn |
Details |
Rep Num |
43 |
B-B |
D863 |
|
|
07/04/1962 |
26/03/1969 |
For scrap - Just cabs/side panels in a heap |
|
22 |
B-B |
D6345 |
|
|
19/05/1962 |
14/09/1968 |
For scrap - Just cabs/side panels in a heap |
|
22 |
B-B |
D6346 |
|
|
08/06/1962 |
03/05/1969 |
For scrap - Just cabs/side panels in a heap |
|
22 |
B-B |
D6353 |
|
|
12/07/1962 |
23/09/1968 |
For scrap - Just cabs/side panels in a heap |
|
70 |
C-C |
20001 |
|
|
26/07/1941 |
01/1969 |
For scrap - Being scrapped - only frames and bogies remaining |
|
70 |
C-C |
20002 |
|
|
09/1945 |
12/1968 |
For scrap - Intact |
|