46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D166 |
52A |
Gateshead |
09/05/1962 |
30/01/1983 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
46 |
1Co-Co1 |
D171 |
52A |
Gateshead |
06/07/1962 |
02/11/1980 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D252 |
50A |
York (North) |
21/12/1959 |
17/06/1983 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D260 |
64B |
Haymarket |
19/02/1960 |
09/03/1987 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D261 |
64B |
Haymarket |
26/02/1960 |
12/06/1983 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D275 |
50A |
York (North) |
16/05/1960 |
13/12/1981 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D362 |
64B |
Haymarket |
11/10/1961 |
14/12/1982 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
47 |
Co-Co |
D1836 |
ML |
Line Power Controller, Derby |
07/04/1965 |
|
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
05 |
0-6-0 |
D2596 |
64H |
Leith Central |
15/02/1960 |
08/06/1968 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3728 |
64H |
Leith Central |
24/01/1959 |
|
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3729 |
64H |
Leith Central |
24/01/1959 |
31/01/1994 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3730 |
64H |
Leith Central |
27/01/1959 |
25/04/1982 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3731 |
64H |
Leith Central |
04/02/1959 |
02/12/1985 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3733 |
64H |
Leith Central |
02/04/1959 |
19/10/1975 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3884 |
64H |
Leith Central |
19/05/1960 |
|
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3885 |
64H |
Leith Central |
23/05/1960 |
04/02/1972 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3887 |
64H |
Leith Central |
31/05/1960 |
22/11/1991 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
08 |
0-6-0 |
D3891 |
64H |
Leith Central |
27/06/1960 |
|
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
24 |
Bo-Bo |
D5094 |
64B |
Haymarket |
18/02/1960 |
29/09/1976 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
26 |
Bo-Bo |
D5304 |
64B |
Haymarket |
31/10/1958 |
24/11/1992 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
37 |
Co-Co |
D6903 |
64B |
Haymarket |
29/10/1963 |
|
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7602 |
64B |
Haymarket |
21/02/1966 |
30/03/1980 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7604 |
64B |
Haymarket |
11/03/1966 |
04/09/1986 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7605 |
64B |
Haymarket |
12/03/1966 |
31/03/1972 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
25 |
Bo-Bo |
D7607 |
64B |
Haymarket |
24/03/1966 |
02/12/1985 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
20 |
Bo-Bo |
D8323 |
64B |
Haymarket |
20/10/1967 |
10/11/1987 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8562 |
64B |
Haymarket |
22/11/1963 |
06/10/1971 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8567 |
64B |
Haymarket |
06/01/1964 |
06/10/1971 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8568 |
64B |
Haymarket |
06/01/1964 |
06/10/1971 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8574 |
64B |
Haymarket |
30/01/1964 |
31/12/1971 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8586 |
64B |
Haymarket |
11/12/1964 |
21/09/1971 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8606 |
64B |
Haymarket |
05/10/1964 |
27/03/1971 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|
17 |
Bo-Bo |
D8612 |
64B |
Haymarket |
27/01/1965 |
05/10/1971 |
On Millerhill stabling point. |
|