Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
24 | Bo-Bo | D5051 | 05/12/1959 | 02/12/1967 | In Works - Derelict shell in the yard | |||
24 | Bo-Bo | D5120 | 60A | Inverness | 04/06/1960 | 31/12/1976 | In Works | |
24 | Bo-Bo | D5128 | 60A | Inverness | 13/08/1960 | 18/07/1976 | In Works | |
29 | Bo-Bo | D6113 | 65A | Eastfield | 27/05/1959 | 06/10/1971 | In Works | |
29 | Bo-Bo | D6124 | 65A | Eastfield | 29/09/1959 | 06/10/1971 | In Works | |
21 | Bo-Bo | D6146 | 29/04/1960 | 30/12/1967 | In Works - Derelict shell in the yard | |||
20 | Bo-Bo | D8020 | 52A | Gateshead | 03/10/1959 | 01/10/1990 | In Works - In the yard | |
20 | Bo-Bo | D8102 | 65A | Eastfield | 01/12/1961 | In Works | ||
20 | Bo-Bo | D8103 | 65A | Eastfield | 01/12/1961 | 08/03/1991 | In Works |