Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 32 Online
» 4871 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 20483 Week
» 119128 Month
» 321792 Year
» 3348645 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Timelines
Scrap convoy - Monday 20/05/1968
Class |
Wheels |
Loco |
Code |
Allocation |
To Service |
Withdrawn |
Details |
Rep Num |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6128 |
|
|
13/10/1959 |
30/12/1967 |
Left Aberdeen Ferryhill for Shettleston |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6138 |
|
|
02/02/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
Left Aberdeen Ferryhill for Shettleston |
|