Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 256 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 15868 Week
» 114513 Month
» 317177 Year
» 3344030 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Timelines
McWilliams scrapyard, Shettleston - Sunday 02/06/1968
Class |
Wheels |
Loco |
Code |
Allocation |
To Service |
Withdrawn |
Details |
Rep Num |
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6120 |
|
|
07/07/1959 |
30/12/1967 |
Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6131 |
|
|
03/11/1959 |
30/12/1967 |
Dumped - Lined up in the scrapyard - arrived today. |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6138 |
|
|
02/02/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6139 |
|
|
16/02/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6142 |
|
|
22/03/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6144 |
|
|
05/04/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6150 |
|
|
06/06/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
Dumped - Lined up in the scrapyard - arrived today. |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6151 |
|
|
13/06/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6153 |
|
|
06/07/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
Dumped - Cabs only |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6154 |
|
|
14/07/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
Dumped - Lined up on the scrapyard siding |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6155 |
|
|
16/08/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
Dumped - Lined up in the scrapyard - arrived today. |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6156 |
|
|
15/09/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
Dumped - Cabs only |
|