Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
08 | 0-6-0 | D3408 | 65A | Eastfield | 01/01/1958 | 15/07/1985 | In Works - In blue | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3556 | 65F | Grangemouth | 30/10/1958 | In Works | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3924 | 67A | Corkerhill | 27/01/1961 | In Works | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | D4096 | 60A | Inverness | 30/08/1961 | 30/06/2005 | In Works - Being painted blue | |
24 | Bo-Bo | D5122 | 18/06/1960 | 02/10/1968 | In Works - Outside the works - damaged | |||
26 | Bo-Bo | D5300 | 64B | Haymarket | 30/07/1958 | 04/10/1993 | In Works | |
27 | Bo-Bo | D5366 | 65A | Eastfield | 04/01/1962 | 20/04/1986 | In Works | |
25 | Bo-Bo | D7604 | 64B | Haymarket | 11/03/1966 | 04/09/1986 | In Works | |
17 | Bo-Bo | D8586 | 64B | Haymarket | 11/12/1964 | 21/09/1971 | In Works - Outside the works |