Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
50 | Co-Co | D434 | D05 | Stoke Division | 24/07/1968 | 29/06/1990 | Around the area - On the shed | |
50 | Co-Co | D436 | D05 | Stoke Division | 12/08/1968 | 12/04/1991 | Around the area - On the shed | |
47 | Co-Co | D1851 | D05 | Stoke Division | 12/06/1965 | 28/02/2007 | Around the area - On the shed | |
47 | Co-Co | D1853 | D05 | Stoke Division | 26/07/1965 | 27/03/1989 | Around the area - On the shed | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3541 | 63A | Perth South | 22/08/1958 | 02/07/1976 | Around the area - Marshalling yard pilot | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3542 | 63A | Perth South | 29/08/1958 | 14/11/1986 | Around the area - Marshalling yard pilot | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3543 | 63A | Perth South | 29/08/1958 | Around the area - Marshalling yard pilot | ||
08 | 0-6-0 | D3544 | 63A | Perth South | 05/09/1958 | 01/10/1983 | Around the area - On the shed | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D3545 | 63A | Perth South | 05/09/1958 | 18/12/1985 | Around the area - Station pilot | |
08 | 0-6-0 | D4097 | 63A | Perth South | 08/09/1961 | 28/02/2007 | Around the area - Station pilot | |
24 | Bo-Bo | D5095 | 64B | Haymarket | 23/03/1960 | 16/08/1975 | Around the area - On the shed | |
24 | Bo-Bo | D5115 | 60A | Inverness | 30/04/1960 | 31/12/1976 | Around the area - On the shed | |
24 | Bo-Bo | D5127 | 60A | Inverness | 30/07/1960 | 02/02/1976 | Around the area - On the shed | |
26 | Bo-Bo | D5335 | 60A | Inverness | 24/07/1959 | 10/12/1992 | Around the area - On the shed | |
26 | Bo-Bo | D5337 | 60A | Inverness | 20/08/1959 | 04/10/1993 | Around the area - On the shed |