Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 10 Online
» 724 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14767 Week
» 79721 Month
» 282385 Year
» 3309238 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Timelines
NCB Manvers main coal preparation plant - Saturday 06/11/1971
Class |
Wheels |
Loco |
Code |
Allocation |
To Service |
Withdrawn |
Details |
Rep Num |
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2213 |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
17/08/1968 |
Around the plant - Outside the shed, cannibalised |
|
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2225 |
|
|
15/10/1955 |
19/04/1969 |
Around the plant - Outside the shed. Named 'Debra' |
|
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2238 |
|
|
10/05/1956 |
27/07/1968 |
Around the plant - Outside the shed. Named 'Carol' |
|
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2336 |
|
|
24/08/1961 |
15/07/1968 |
Around the plant - Outside the shed, cannibalised |
|
04 |
0-6-0 |
D2337 |
|
|
30/08/1961 |
15/07/1968 |
Around the plant - Outside the shed. Named 'Dorothy' |
|