40 |
1Co-Co1 |
D362 |
64B |
Haymarket |
11/10/1961 |
14/12/1982 |
Around the works - Erecting shop |
|
D2/10 |
0-4-0 |
D2723 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
30/06/1958 |
03/08/1967 |
Around the works - Erecting shop |
|
26 |
Bo-Bo |
D5314 |
64B |
Haymarket |
30/01/1959 |
09/10/1992 |
Around the works - Erecting shop |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6148 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
15/05/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
Around the works - Erecting shop |
|
21 |
Bo-Bo |
D6154 |
61A |
Kittybrewster |
14/07/1960 |
30/12/1967 |
Around the works - Erecting shop |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
43902 |
|
|
1920 |
02/06/1962 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
2P |
0-4-4T |
55261 |
|
|
05/1925 |
29/09/1961 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
44258 |
|
|
08/1926 |
21/05/1962 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
4F |
0-6-0 |
44319 |
|
|
01/1928 |
27/11/1961 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
2P |
4-4-0 |
40594 |
|
|
09/1928 |
12/11/1959 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
2P |
4-4-0 |
40618 |
|
|
11/1929 |
27/09/1961 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
2P |
4-4-0 |
40619 |
|
|
11/1929 |
02/10/1961 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
2P |
4-4-0 |
40645 |
|
|
08/1931 |
31/10/1961 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
2P |
4-4-0 |
40647 |
|
|
09/1931 |
31/10/1961 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
5MT |
4-6-0 |
44921 |
63A |
Perth South |
01/1946 |
26/02/1965 |
Around the works - Erecting shop. |
|
J35 |
0-6-0 |
64534 |
|
|
03/1913 |
11/05/1961 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
J36 |
0-6-0 |
65297 |
68B |
Dumfries |
07/1897 |
03/01/1966 |
Around the works - Outside - awaiting shopping. |
|
J36 |
0-6-0 |
65318 |
|
|
05/1899 |
31/05/1962 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
J36 |
0-6-0 |
65319 |
DEE |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
05/1899 |
26/09/1966 |
Around the works - Erecting shop. |
|
J37 |
0-6-0 |
64537 |
POL |
Polmont |
12/1914 |
08/06/1964 |
Around the works - Erecting shop. |
|
J37 |
0-6-0 |
64542 |
|
|
04/1915 |
02/10/1961 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
J37 |
0-6-0 |
64547 |
64A |
St Margarets |
11/1915 |
31/12/1966 |
Around the works - Erecting shop. |
|
J37 |
0-6-0 |
64572 |
STM |
St Margarets |
08/1918 |
14/09/1964 |
Around the works - Erecting shop. |
|
J37 |
0-6-0 |
64579 |
65E |
Kipps |
09/1918 |
28/12/1963 |
Around the works - Erecting shop. |
|
J37 |
0-6-0 |
64590 |
|
|
12/1918 |
14/05/1962 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
J37 |
0-6-0 |
64606 |
STM |
St Margarets |
12/1919 |
14/07/1966 |
Around the works - Outside - shopped. |
|
J37 |
0-6-0 |
64625 |
STM |
St Margarets |
01/1921 |
04/09/1965 |
Around the works - Erecting shop. |
|
J38 |
0-6-0 |
65920 |
STM |
St Margarets |
19/03/1926 |
19/11/1966 |
Around the works - Outside - awaiting shopping. |
|
J39 |
0-6-0 |
64963 |
|
|
17/06/1938 |
29/01/1962 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
J88 |
0-6-0T |
68338 |
|
|
04/1912 |
15/09/1961 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
K4 |
2-6-0 |
61996 |
|
|
12/1938 |
02/10/1961 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|
K4 |
2-6-0 |
61998 |
|
|
01/1939 |
02/10/1961 |
Around the works - In the "Cemetery" |
|