Timelines
Class | Wheels | Loco | Code | Allocation | To Service | Withdrawn | Details | Rep Num |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2251 | 0-6-0 | 3213 | 89C | Machynlleth | 11/12/1947 | 28/12/1963 | Around the works | |
5700 | 0-6-0PT | 3789 | 89A | Oswestry | 06/10/1938 | 23/10/1965 | Around the works | |
1400 | 0-4-2T | 1438 | 89A | Oswestry | 17/08/1934 | 09/11/1962 | Around the works | |
7400 | 0-6-0PT | 7413 | 86C | Hereford | 11/12/1936 | 05/09/1964 | Around the works | |
7800 | 4-6-0 | 7819 | OSY | Oswestry | 03/02/1939 | 06/11/1965 | Around the works | |
W_L | 0-6-0T | 823 | OSY | Oswestry | 09/1902 | 27/07/1962 | Around the works | |
2MT | 2-6-0 | 46520 | 89A | Oswestry | 09/02/1953 | 06/05/1967 | Around the works |