BR
Database
Complete BR Locomotive Database 1948-1997
Home
Guestbook
Contact
Links
Preferences
Menu
Locomotives
Build Dates
Withdrawals
Names
Snapshots
Regional
Locomotives
Workings
ReClassifications
Pilot Scheme
Prototypes
Preservation
Diesels
Electrics
Steam
Classes
Steam
Standards
GWR
1850-1947
Barry
Brecon & Merthyr Junction
Burry Port & Gwendraeth Valley
Cambrian
Cardiff
Midland & South Western Junction
Powlesland & Mason
Port Talbot
Rhymney
Swansea Harbour Trust
Taff Vale
Vale of Rheidol
SR
1923-1947
London South Western
London, Brighton & South Coast
South Eastern & Chatham
LNER
LNER Designs 1923-1947
Great Central
Great Eastern
Great Northern
Great North of Scotland
Hull and Barnsley
Midland and Great Northern
North British
North Eastern
LMS
LMS Designs 1923-1947
Caledonian
Furness
Glasgow & South Western
Highland
London & North Western
London, Tilbury & Southend
Lancashire & Yorkshire
Maryport & Carlisle
Midland
North Staffordshire
Somerset & Dorset
ex WD
by Wheels
2 Driver Tank Engines
2-2-4T
2 Driver Tender Engines
2-2-2
4 Coupled Tank Engines
0-4-0T
0-4-0ST
0-4-2T
0-4-2ST
0-4-4T
2-4-0T
2-4-0WT
2-4-2T
4-4-0T
4-4-2T
4-4-4T
4 Coupled Tender Engines
0-4-0
0-4-2
0-4-4
2-4-0
2-4-2
4-4-0
4-4-2
4-4-4
6 Coupled Tank Engines
0-6-0T
0-6-0PT
0-6-0ST
0-6-2T
0-6-2ST
0-6-4T
2-6-0T
2-6-2T
2-6-4T
4-6-0T
4-6-2T
4-6-4T
6 Coupled Tender Engines
0-6-0
0-6-2
0-6-4
2-6-0
2-6-2
2-6-4
4-6-0
4-6-2
4-6-4
8 Coupled Tank Engines
0-8-0T
0-8-2T
0-8-4T
2-8-0T
2-8-2T
8 Coupled Tender Engines
0-8-0
0-8-2
0-8-4
2-8-0
2-8-2
10 Coupled Tank Engines
0-10-0T
10 Coupled Tender Engines
0-10-0
2-10-0
Special
0-6-6-0T
2-6-6-2T
2-8-8-2T
Diesel
Shunters
Type 1
Type 2
Type 3
Type 4
Type 5
Electric
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Multiple Units
Steam Railmotors
GWR Railmotors
LNER Railmotors
LMS Railmotors
Diesel Multiple Units
GWR Railcars
LNER Railcars
1st Generation DMU's
2nd Generation DMU's
DEMU's
Pullman
HST
Electric Multiple Units
25KV A.C
1500V D.C
750V D.C
Sites
Depots
Builders
Locomotive Works
Scrapyards
People
Chief Mechanical Engineers
Management
Miscellaneous
Companies
British Railways
GWR & Constituents
Taff Vale
Rhymney
Cambrian
Barry
Cardiff Railway
SR & Constituents
LSWR
LBSCR
SECR
LNER & Constituents
GER
GCR
GNR
MGNR
NER
NBR
GNSR
ex LMS
MR
LNWR
LYR
LTSR
S&DJR
G&SWR
CR
HR
Timelines
Line Closures
Workings
Events
News Stories
Miscellaneous
Reports
Graphs
Anecdotes
Headcodes
Royal Trains
Accidents
Wheel Arrangements
Modernisation Plan 1955
The Beeching Plan
Generate an ABC!
Background Images
On This Day ...
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.
?
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 2052 Today
» 2521 Yesterday
» 16404 Week
» 63237 Month
» 365258 Year
» 2765722 Total
Record: 6840 (19/09/2023)
(
Free MySQL Counter
)
Locomotives of the London, Tilbury & Southend Railway
Build Date
LTSR Class
LMS Class
First LTSR Number
Wheels
Designer
Manufacturer
Order Number
Works Number
Withdrawn
03/1897
37
37
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
25/08/1951
04/1897
37
38
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
25/08/1951
04/1897
37
39
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
12/02/1951
04/1897
37
40
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
28/09/1951
04/1897
37
41
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
28/09/1951
04/1897
37
42
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
22/12/1951
12/1898
37
43
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Dübs & Co
??
28/09/1951
12/1898
37
44
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Dübs & Co
??
12/02/1951
12/1898
37
45
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Dübs & Co
??
18/10/1952
12/1898
37
46
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Dübs & Co
??
02/1951
01/1899
37
47
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Dübs & Co
??
21/02/1951
01/1899
37
48
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Dübs & Co
??
12/02/1951
09/1900
2092
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
18/09/1948
09/1900
2093
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
09/1953
09/1900
2094
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
08/1949
10/1900
2095
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
06/1949
10/1900
2096
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
05/1950
10/1900
2097
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
04/1951
10/1900
2098
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
03/1951
10/1900
2099
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
03/1951
10/1900
2100
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
12/1949
10/1900
2101
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
03/1951
10/1900
2102
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
06/1949
10/1900
2103
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
Sharp Stewart
??
03/1951
06/1903
2104
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
North British
??
21/03/1953
06/1903
2106
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
North British
??
03/12/1949
06/1903
2107
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
North British
??
12/1949
06/1903
2108
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
North British
??
05/1952
06/1903
2109
4-4-2T
T. Whitelegg
North British
??
03/1951
06/1903
69
0-6-2T
R. Whitelegg
North British
4468E
15750
02/05/1958
06/1903
70
0-6-2T
R. Whitelegg
North British
4468E
15751
18/06/1962
06/1903
71
0-6-2T
R. Whitelegg
North British
4468E
15752
19/02/1959
06/1903
72
0-6-2T
R. Whitelegg
North British
4468E
15753
19/02/1959
07/1903
73
0-6-2T
R. Whitelegg
North British
4468E
15754
19/02/1959
07/1903
74
0-6-2T
R. Whitelegg
North British
4468E
15755
19/02/1959
1908
75
0-6-2T
R. Whitelegg
North British
L298
18504
19/02/1959
1908
76
0-6-2T
R. Whitelegg
North British
L298
18505
19/02/1959
1908
77
0-6-2T
R. Whitelegg
North British
L298
18506
09/05/1958
1908
78
0-6-2T
R. Whitelegg
North British
L298
18507
09/05/1958
05/1909
79
79
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
12/02/1951
05/1909
79
80
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
06/1956
06/1909
79
81
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
22/11/1952
07/1909
79
82
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd
??
17/02/1951
1912
2190
0-6-2T
R. Whitelegg
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5604
19/02/1959
1912
2191
0-6-2T
R. Whitelegg
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5605
19/02/1959
1912
2192
0-6-2T
R. Whitelegg
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5606
19/02/1959
1912
2193
0-6-2T
R. Whitelegg
Beyer Peacock Ltd.
??
5607
19/02/1959
05/1923
2110
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
5871
16/02/1959
06/1923
2111
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
5871
01/09/1951
06/1923
2112
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
5871
23/08/1952
07/1923
2113
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
5871
10/03/1951
07/1923
2114
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
5871
01/09/1951
07/1923
2115
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
5871
18/08/1951
07/1923
2116
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
5871
09/1951
08/1923
2117
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
5871
28/09/1951
08/1923
2118
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
5871
11/09/1958
08/1923
2119
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
5871
21/03/1952
08/1925
2120
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Nasmyth Wilson
??
12/02/1955
08/1925
2121
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Nasmyth Wilson
??
16/02/1959
08/1925
2122
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Nasmyth Wilson
??
14/04/1956
08/1925
2123
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Nasmyth Wilson
??
16/02/1959
08/1925
2124
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Nasmyth Wilson
??
19/12/1956
05/1927
2125
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
25/02/1956
05/1927
2126
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
29/12/1956
06/1927
2127
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
16/02/1959
06/1927
2128
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
17/02/1959
06/1927
2129
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
03/12/1960
06/1927
2130
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
17/02/1959
06/1927
2131
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
07/04/1960
07/1927
2132
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
17/02/1959
07/1927
2133
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
19/12/1956
07/1927
2134
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
29/12/1956
01/1930
2151
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
07/04/1960
01/1930
2152
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
19/12/1956
02/1930
2153
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
12/02/1955
02/1930
2154
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
12/02/1955
02/1930
2155
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
12/02/1955
02/1930
2156
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
12/02/1955
02/1930
2157
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
26/11/1959
02/1930
2158
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
19/12/1956
03/1930
2159
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
17/02/1959
03/1930
2160
4-4-2T
R. Whitelegg
Derby Works
??
17/02/1959