Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 4892 Today
» 4610 Yesterday
» 4892 Week
» 83827 Month
» 563053 Year
» 3589906 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
London and North Eastern Railway and Constituent Companies
Company Chief Mechanical Engineers Date Incorporated Date Amalgamated Locomotives
LNER London and North Eastern Railway   01/01/1923 31/12/1947  
EWYUR East & West Yorkshire Union Railway    
GCR Great Central Railway    
GER Great Eastern Railway   31/12/1922  
GNSR Great North of Scotland Railway    
GNR Great Northern Railway   31/12/1922  
HBR Hull & Barnsley Railway    
MET Metropolitan Railway    
MSR Mid-Suffolk Railway   01/07/1924  
MGNR Midland & Great Northern Railway    
NBR North British Railway    
NER North Eastern Railway   31/12/1922