Adams, William |
15/10/1823 |
07/08/1904 |
CME |
LSWR |
01/1878 |
07/1895 |
LSWR 380 4-4-0 (1879) LSWR 46 (1879) LSWR 135 4-4-0 (1880) LSWR 395 0-6-0 'Jumbos' (1881) LSWR 415 4-4-2T 'Radial Tanks' (1882) LSWR 445 4-4-0 (1883) LSWR 460 4-4-0 (1884) LSWR A12 0-4-2 'Jubilee' (1887) LSWR T1 0-4-4T (1888) LSWR O2 0-4-4T (1889) LSWR X2 4-4-0 (1890) LSWR B4 0-4-0T (1891) LSWR T3 4-4-0 (1892) LSWR G6 0-6-0T (1894) LSWR T6 4-4-0 (1895) LSWR X6 4-4-0 (1895) |
Link |
Adams, John |
1860 |
1915 |
CME |
NSR |
1902 |
1915 |
NSR 165 0-6-2T (1903) NSR 82 0-6-0 (1907) NSR 9 0-4-4T (1907) NSR 98 0-6-2T (1908) NSR 84 0-6-0 (1909) NSR 86 4-4-0 (1910) NSR 8 4-4-2T (1911) NSR 38 4-4-0 (1912) NSR 30 0-6-4T (1914) NSR 15 0-4-4T (1920) |
|
Armstrong, Joseph |
21/09/1816 |
05/06/1877 |
CME |
GWR |
1864 |
1877 |
GWR 302 0-6-0ST (1864) GWR 388 0-6-0 'Standard Goods' (1866) GWR 1016 0-6-0ST (1867) GWR 517 0-4-2T (1868) GWR 1076 0-6-0ST (1870) GWR 1901 0-6-0PT (1881) |
Link |
Aspinall, Sir John Audley Frederick |
25/08/1851 |
19/01/1937 |
CME |
LYR |
16/07/1886 |
1899 |
LYR 916 0-4-0ST (1886) LYR 978 4-4-0 (1888) LYR 1008 2-4-2T (1889) LYR 11 0-6-0 (1889) LYR 27 0-6-0 (1889) LYR 1093 4-4-0 (1891) LYR 1153 0-4-0ST (1891) LYR 23 0-6-0ST (1891) LYR 1351 0-6-0T (1897) LYR 1400 4-4-2 (1899) LYR 91 0-8-0 (1900) |
Link |
Barton Wright, William |
13/11/1828 |
07/05/1915 |
CME |
LYR |
01/11/1875 |
23/06/1886 |
LYR 568 0-6-0 (1876) LYR 141 0-6-2T (1880) LYR 629 4-4-0 (1880) LYR 243 0-6-2T (1881) LYR 209 4-4-0 (1887) |
Link |
Beames, Hewitt Pearson Montague |
09/05/1875 |
05/03/1948 |
CME |
LNWR |
11/1920 |
31/12/1922 |
LNWR G2 0-8-0 (1921) LNWR 7F 0-8-4T (1923) |
Link |
Beattie, William George |
02/12/1841 |
28/05/1918 |
CME |
LSWR |
|
|
LSWR 0298 2-4-0WT 'Well Tank' (1874) |
Link |
Billinton, Lawson Boskovsky |
04/02/1882 |
26/11/1954 |
CME |
LBSCR |
01/01/1912 |
31/12/1922 |
LBSCR B4X 4-4-0 'Greybacks' (1899) LBSCR L 4-6-4T (1914) |
Link |
Billinton, Robert John |
05/04/1845 |
07/11/1904 |
CME |
LBSCR |
01/1890 |
07/11/1904 |
LBSCR B4A 4-4-0 'Scotchmen' (1900) |
Link |
Brittain, George |
1821 |
1882 |
CME |
CR |
1876 |
1882 |
CR 670 0-4-2 (1878) CR 486 0-6-0ST (1881) CR 179 4-4-0 (1882) |
|
Bulleid, Oliver Vaughan Snell |
19/09/1882 |
25/04/1970 |
CME |
SR |
1937 |
31/12/1947 |
SR MN 4-6-2 'Merchant Navy' (1941) SR Q1 0-6-0 (1942) SR WCBB 4-6-2 'West Country/Battle of Britain' (1945) SR LEAD 0-6-6-0T 'Leader' (1949) |
Link |
Churchward, George Jackson |
31/01/1857 |
19/12/1933 |
CME |
GWR |
01/06/1902 |
31/12/1921 |
GWR 101 0-4-0T (1902) GWR 2900 4-6-0 'Saint' (1902) GWR 2800 2-8-0 '28xx' (1903) GWR 3100/5100 2-6-2T (1903) GWR 3440 4-4-0 'City' (1903) GWR 4400 2-6-2T '44xx' (1904) GWR County 4-4-0 (1904) GWR County Tank 4-4-2T (1905) GWR 3150 2-6-2T (1906) GWR 4500 2-6-2T '45xx' (1906) GWR 4000 4-6-0 'Star' (1907) GWR Great Bear 4-6-2 (1908) GWR 1361 0-6-0ST (1910) GWR 4200 2-8-0T '42xx' (1910) GWR 4300 2-6-0 '43xx' (1911) GWR 4600 4-4-2T (1913) GWR 4700 2-8-0 '47xx' (1919) GWR 5205 2-8-0T (1923) |
Link |
Clare, Charles |
|
|
CME |
NSR |
1875 |
1882 |
NSR 6 2-4-0T (1878) NSR 4 2-4-0T (1881) NSR 6 Rbld 2-4-2T (1898) NSR 4 Rbld 2-4-2T (1900) |
|
Collett, Charles Benjamin |
10/09/1871 |
05/04/1952 |
CME |
GWR |
01/01/1922 |
1941 |
GWR 3100 2-6-2T '31xx' (1906) GWR 4073 4-6-0 'Castle' (1923) GWR 5600 0-6-2T '56xx' (1924) GWR 1101 0-4-0T (1926) GWR 4575 2-6-2T (1927) GWR 6000 4-6-0 'King' (1927) GWR 4900 4-6-0 'Hall' (1928) GWR 5101 2-6-2T (1929) GWR 5700 0-6-0PT '57xx' (1929) GWR 2251 0-6-0 (1930) GWR 5400 0-6-0PT '54xx' (1930) GWR 6100 2-6-2T '61xx' (1931) GWR 1400 0-4-2T '14xx' (1932) GWR 6400 0-6-0PT '64xx' (1932) GWR 5800 0-4-2T '58xx' (1933) GWR 1366 0-6-0PT (1934) GWR 7200 2-8-2T '72xx' (1934) GWR 6800 4-6-0 'Grange' (1936) GWR 7400 0-6-0PT '74xx' (1936) GWR 7800 4-6-0 'Manor' (1938) GWR 8100 2-6-2T '81xx' (1938) |
Link |
Connor, Benjamin |
|
|
CME |
CR |
1856 |
03/02/1876 |
CR 446 0-4-0T (1873) CR 502 0-4-0ST (1876) |
|
Cooke, Charles John Bowen |
11/01/1859 |
18/10/1920 |
CME |
LNWR |
01/03/1909 |
11/1920 |
LNWR C1 0-8-0 '2 Cylinder Rebuilds' (1909) LNWR 2665 4-6-2T (1910) LNWR George V 4-4-0 (1910) LNWR QM 4-4-0 'Queen Mary' (1910) LNWR 6F 0-8-2T '1185' (1911) LNWR POFW 4-6-0 'Prince of Wales' (1911) LNWR CLAUT 4-6-0 'Claughton' (1913) |
Link |
Cowan, W |
|
|
CME |
GNSR |
|
|
GNSR D39 4-4-0 (1878) |
|
Cumming, Christopher |
|
|
CME |
HR |
24/09/1915 |
1922 |
HR 73 4-4-0 (1917) HR 4F 4-6-0 'Clan Goods' (1918) HR 4P 4-6-0 'Highland Clan' (1919) |
|
Dean, William |
08/01/1840 |
04/09/1905 |
CME |
GWR |
1877 |
31/05/1902 |
GWR 633 0-6-0T (1871) GWR 850 0-6-0ST (1875) GWR 1813 0-6-0T (1882) GWR 1833 0-6-0T (1882) GWR 2301 0-6-0 'Dean Goods' (1883) GWR 1833 0-6-0 (1884) GWR 3201 2-4-0 'Stella' (1884) GWR 2361 0-6-0 (1885) GWR 1661 0-6-0ST (1886) GWR 3521 0-4-2T 0-4-2T (1887) GWR 3206 2-4-0 'Barnum' (1889) GWR 3521 0-4-4T 0-4-4T (1889) GWR 1854 0-6-0PT (1890) GWR 3021 2-2-2 (1891) GWR 3232 2-4-0 (1892) GWR 655 0-6-0ST (1892) GWR 3031 4-2-2 'Achilles' (1894) GWR 3500 2-4-0T 'Metro' (1894) GWR 3252 4-4-0 'Duke' (1895) GWR 3571 0-4-2T (1895) GWR 36 4-6-0 'Crocodile' (1896) GWR 2021 0-6-0PT (1897) GWR 2721 0-6-0PT (1897) GWR Badminton 4-4-0 (1897) GWR 1490 4-4-0PT (1898) GWR 3300 4-4-0 'Bulldog' (1899) GWR 3521 4-4-0 4-4-0 (1899) GWR Kruger 2-6-0/4-6-0 (1899) GWR 2600 2-6-0 'Aberdare' (1900) GWR 36xx 2-4-2T (1900) GWR Atbara 4-4-0 (1900) GWR Crane Tank 0-6-4PT (1901) GWR Metro Rbld 2-4-2T (1905) GWR 3901 2-6-2T (1907) GWR Flower 4-4-0 (1908) GWR Bird 4-4-0 (1909) GWR Earl 4-4-0 'Earl/Dukedog' (1936) |
Link |
Drummond, Peter |
1850 |
1918 |
CME |
HR GSWR |
1911 |
05/08/1918 |
HR C 4-4-0 (1898) HR A 4-6-0 'Castle' (1900) HR K 0-6-0 (1900) HR Scrap Tank 0-6-0T (1903) HR W 0-4-4T (1905) HR U 4-4-0 (1908) HR X 0-6-4T (1909) GSWR 131 4-4-0 (1913) GSWR 279 0-6-0 (1913) GSWR 137 4-4-0 (1915) GSWR 403 2-6-0 (1915) GSWR 45 0-6-2T (1915) GSWR 5 0-6-0T (1917) |
Link |
Drummond, Dugald |
01/01/1840 |
08/11/1912 |
CME |
NBR CR LSWR |
1895 |
08/11/1912 |
NBR J82 0-6-0T (1875) NBR D27 4-4-0 (1877) NBR D28 4-4-0 (1877) NBR G8 0-4-4T (1877) NBR D50 4-4-0T (1879) NBR J34 0-6-0 (1879) NBR D51 4-4-0T (1880) CR 294 0-6-0 (1883) CR 171 0-4-4T (1884) CR 66 4-4-0 (1884) CR 262 0-4-2ST (1885) CR 264 0-4-0ST (1885) CR 123 4-2-2 (1886) CR 124 4-4-0 (1886) CR 323 0-6-0ST (1887) CR 272 0-6-0ST (1888) CR 80 4-4-0 (1888) LSWR 700 0-6-0 'Black Motors' (1897) LSWR M7 0-4-4T (1897) LSWR T9 4-4-0 'Greyhounds' (1899) LSWR K10 4-4-0 'Small Hoppers' (1901) LSWR L11 4-4-0 'Large Hoppers' (1903) LSWR S11 4-4-0 (1903) LSWR L12 4-4-0 'Bulldogs' (1904) LSWR T14 4-6-0 (1911) |
Link |
Dunbar, James |
|
26/02/1922 |
CME |
BMJR |
01/01/1909 |
26/02/1922 |
BMJR Unclass 0-6-2T 'Unclassified' (1909) BMJR Unclass 0-6-2T '45' (1915) |
|
Fairburn, Charles Edward |
05/09/1887 |
12/10/1945 |
CME |
LMS |
|
|
LMS 4P 2-6-4T (1945) |
|
Fletcher, Edward |
|
|
CME |
NER |
1854 |
31/10/1882 |
NER G6 0-4-4T (1876) NER 44 0-6-0ST (1881) NER J76 0-6-0T (1881) NER J77 0-6-0T (1899) |
|
Fowler, Sir Henry |
29/07/1870 |
16/10/1938 |
CME |
LMS |
10/1925 |
31/12/1931 |
LMS 4F 0-6-0 (1911) LMS Bertha 0-10-0 'Big Bertha' (1919) LMS 3F 0-6-0T (1924) LMS 4P 4-4-0 'Compound' (1924) LMS 4P 2-6-4T (1927) LMS 2F 0-6-0T (1928) LMS 2P 4-4-0 (1928) LMS 7F 0-8-0 (1929) LMS 3P 2-6-2T (1930) LMS PAT 4-6-0 'Patriot' (1930) |
Link |
Gresley, Sir Nigel |
19/06/1876 |
05/04/1941 |
CME |
GNR LNER |
01/01/1923 |
05/04/1941 |
GNR K1 2-6-0 (1912) GNR J51 0-6-0T (1913) GNR K2 2-6-0 (1913) GNR O3 2-8-0 (1913) GNR O2 2-8-0 (1918) GNR K3 2-6-0 (1920) GNR N2 0-6-2T (1920) GNR A1 4-6-2 (1922) GNR A3 4-6-2 (1922) GNR J50 0-6-0T (1922) LNER P1 2-8-2 (1925) LNER J38 0-6-0 (1926) LNER J39 0-6-0 (1926) LNER D49 4-4-0 'Shire/Hunt' (1927) LNER B17 4-6-0 (1928) LNER B2 4-6-0 (1928) LNER W1 4-6-4 (1929) LNER V1 2-6-2T (1930) LNER P2 2-8-2 (1934) LNER A4 4-6-2 (1935) LNER V2 2-6-2 (1936) LNER K4 2-6-0 (1937) LNER V3 2-6-2T (1939) LNER V4 2-6-2 (1941) LNER A1/1 4-6-2 (1945) LNER K1/1 2-6-0 (1945) LNER K5 2-6-0 (1945) |
Link |
Hawksworth, Frederick William |
10/01/1882 |
13/07/1976 |
CME |
GWR |
1941 |
31/12/1947 |
GWR 6959 4-6-0 'Modified Hall' (1944) GWR 1000 4-6-0 'County' (1945) GWR 9400 0-6-0PT '94xx' (1947) GWR 1500 0-6-0PT '15xx' (1949) GWR 1600 0-6-0PT '16xx' (1949) |
Link |
Hill, Alfred John |
1862 |
14/03/1927 |
CME |
GER |
10/1912 |
31/12/1922 |
GER J68 0-6-0T (1912) GER Y4 0-4-0T (1913) GER N7 0-6-2T (1915) GER J19 0-6-0 (1916) GER J20 0-6-0 (1920) |
Link |
Holden, James |
26/07/1837 |
26/05/1925 |
CME |
GER |
1885 |
31/12/1907 |
GER F5 2-4-2T GER F4 2-4-2T (1884) GER D13 4-4-0 (1886) GER J66 0-6-0T (1886) GER J65 0-6-0T (1889) GER J67 0-6-0T (1890) GER J69 0-6-0T (1890) GER E4 2-4-0 (1891) GER F3 2-4-2T (1893) GER J14 0-6-0 (1893) GER G4 0-4-4T (1898) GER D14 4-4-0 (1900) GER D15 4-4-0 (1900) GER J16 0-6-0 (1900) GER J17 0-6-0 (1900) GER J70 0-6-0T (1903) |
Link |
Holden, Stephen Dewar |
23/08/1870 |
07/02/1918 |
CME |
GER |
01/01/1908 |
10/1912 |
GER F6 2-4-2T (1904) GER F7 2-4-2T (1909) GER B12 4-6-0 (1911) |
Link |
Holmes, Matthew |
1844 |
03/07/1903 |
CME |
NBR |
1882 |
1903 |
NBR 574 4-4-0 (1884) NBR D31 4-4-0 (1884) NBR D25 4-4-0 (1886) NBR J36 0-6-0 (1888) NBR 633 4-4-0 (1890) NBR D35 4-4-0 (1894) NBR D36 4-4-0 (1894) NBR 729 4-4-0 (1898) NBR J83 0-6-0T (1900) NBR D26 4-4-0 (1903) |
Link |
Hoy, Henry Albert |
13/01/1855 |
24/05/1910 |
CME |
LYR |
1899 |
1904 |
LYR 392 0-8-0 (1902) LYR 202 2-6-2T (1903) |
Link |
Hughes, George |
09/10/1865 |
27/10/1945 |
CME |
LYR LMS |
01/01/1923 |
10/1925 |
LYR 1452 0-8-0 (1906) LYR 898 0-6-0 (1906) LYR 1501 0-8-2T (1908) LYR 1506 4-6-0 (1908) LYR 5P 4-6-0 (1908) LYR 9 0-8-0 (1910) LYR 6 2-4-2T (1911) LYR 1546 0-8-0 (1912) LMS CRAB 2-6-0 (1926) |
|
Hurry Riches, Charles T |
|
|
CME |
RR |
01/01/1906 |
01/01/1921 |
RR RRR 0-6-2T 'R' (1907) RR RRS 0-6-0T 'S' (1908) RR RRAP 0-6-2T 'AP' (1909) RR RRP 0-6-2T 'P' (1909) RR RRA 0-6-2T 'A' (1910) RR RRA1 0-6-2T 'A1' (1914) RR S1 0-6-0T (1919) RR RRR1 0-6-2T 'R' (1921) |
|
Ivatt, Henry George |
04/05/1886 |
04/10/1976 |
CME |
LMS |
12/10/1945 |
31/12/1947 |
LMS 2MT 2-6-0 (1946) LMS 2MT 2-6-2T (1946) LMS 4MT 2-6-0 (1947) |
|
Ivatt, Henry Alfred |
16/09/1851 |
25/10/1923 |
CME |
GNR |
12/11/1895 |
02/12/1911 |
GNR J4 0-6-0 (1873) GNR J53 0-6-0ST (1892) GNR D3 4-4-0 (1896) GNR D4 4-4-0 (1896) GNR J3 0-6-0 (1896) GNR C12 4-4-2T (1898) GNR C2 4-4-2 (1898) GNR D2 4-4-0 (1898) GNR Q1 0-8-0 (1901) GNR C1 4-4-2 (1902) GNR Q2 0-8-0 (1902) GNR N1 0-6-2T (1907) GNR J1 0-6-0 (1908) GNR J5 0-6-0 (1909) GNR D1 4-4-0 (1911) GNR J6 0-6-0 (1911) GNR J2 0-6-0 (1912) GNR Q3 0-8-0 (1914) |
Link |
Jenkins, Richard |
|
|
CME |
RR |
|
|
RR RRM 0-6-2T 'M' (1904) |
|
Johnson, Samuel Waite |
14/10/1831 |
14/01/1912 |
CME |
MR |
1873 |
1904 |
MR 1102 0-6-0T MR 1121 0-6-0T MR 115 4-2-2 MR 1322 0-4-0ST MR 1377 0-6-0T MR 1853 4-2-2 MR 2441 0-6-0T MR 25 4-2-2 MR 2781 4-4-0 MR 60 4-4-0 MR 1142 0-6-0 (1875) MR 1262 0-4-4T (1875) MR 6 0-4-4T (1875) MR 1070 2-4-0 (1876) MR 1282 2-4-0 (1876) MR 1P 0-4-4T (1876) MR 50 2-4-0 (1876) MR 55 2-4-0 (1876) MR 1327 4-4-0 (1877) MR 1347 2-4-0 (1877) MR 1357 0-6-0 (1878) MR 1F 0-6-0T (1878) MR 2F 0-6-0 (1878) MR 1400 2-4-0 (1879) MR 111 2-4-0 (1880) MR 1492 2-4-0 (1881) MR 1532 0-4-4T (1881) MR 1562 4-4-0 (1882) MR 2P 4-4-0 (1882) MR 1667 4-4-0 (1884) MR 1738 4-4-0 (1885) MR 3F 0-6-0 (1885) MR 1808 4-4-0 (1888) MR 3F 0-6-0 (1888) MR 0F 0-4-0ST (1890) MR 3F 0-6-0 (1890) MR 1312 4-4-0 (1891) MR 2P 4-4-0 (1891) MR 2183 4-4-0 (1892) MR 1116 0-4-0ST (1893) MR 179 4-2-2 (1893) MR 2203 4-4-0 (1893) MR 2228 0-4-4T (1895) MR 156 4-4-0 (1896) MR 1134 0-4-0ST (1897) MR 3F 0-6-0T (1899) MR 2601 4-2-2 (1900) MR 2606 4-4-0 (1900) MR 3P 4-4-0 (1902) MR 4P 4-4-0 (1902) MR 483 4-4-0 (1912) |
Link |
Johnson, James |
|
|
CME |
GNSR |
1890 |
1894 |
GNSR D41 4-4-0 (1893) GNSR G10 0-4-4T (1893) |
|
Jones, David |
|
|
CME |
HR |
1870 |
1896 |
HR O 2-4-0T 'Jones Tank' (1878) HR O 4-4-0T 'Jones Tanks Rbld' (1881) HR L 4-4-0 'Skye Bogie' (1882) HR E 4-4-0 'Bruce' (1886) HR D 0-4-4ST (1890) HR D 4-4-0 'Strath' (1892) HR P 4-4-0T (1892) HR I 4-6-0 (1894) HR B 4-4-0 'Loch' (1896) |
|
Kirtley, William |
1840 |
07/10/1919 |
CME |
LCDR |
|
|
|
|
Kirtley, Matthew |
06/02/1813 |
24/05/1873 |
CME |
MR |
1844 |
24/05/1873 |
MR 690 0-4-4T (1869) MR 780 0-4-4T (1870) |
Link |
Lambie, John |
1833 |
01/02/1895 |
CME |
CR |
1891 |
01/02/1895 |
CR 1 4-4-0T (1893) CR 13 4-4-0 (1894) CR 19 0-4-4T (1895) CR 211 0-6-0ST (1895) |
|
Longbottom, Luke |
1826 |
1902 |
CME |
NSR |
1882 |
1902 |
NSR 3 0-6-0T (1883) NSR 100 0-6-0 (1896) NSR 58 0-6-2T (1899) NSR 159 0-6-0 (1900) |
|
Manson, Mr James |
1845 |
1935 |
CME |
GNSR GSWR |
1890 |
1911 |
GNSR D47 4-4-0 (1866) GNSR D45 4-4-0 (1878) GNSR D44 4-4-0 (1884) GNSR J90 0-6-0T (1884) GNSR D48 4-4-0 (1885) GNSR J91 0-6-0T (1885) GNSR D46 4-4-0 (1887) GNSR D42 4-4-0 (1888) GNSR D38 4-4-0 (1890) GNSR D43 4-4-0 (1890) GSWR 306 0-6-0 (1892) GSWR 8 4-4-0 (1892) GSWR 326 0-4-4T (1893) GSWR 336 4-4-0 (1895) GSWR 14 0-6-0T (1896) GSWR 11 4-4-0 (1897) GSWR 160 0-6-0 (1897) GSWR 6 Rblds 4-4-0 (1899) GSWR 361 0-6-0 (1900) GSWR 381 4-6-0 (1903) GSWR 240 4-4-0 (1904) GSWR 266 0-4-4T (1906) GSWR 18 4-4-0 (1907) GSWR 272 0-4-0 (1907) GSWR 17 0-6-0 (1910) |
|
Marsh, Douglas Earle |
04/01/1862 |
05/1933 |
CME |
LBSCR |
08/11/1904 |
31/12/1911 |
LBSCR C3 0-6-0 (1906) |
|
Maunsell, Richard Edward Lloyd |
26/05/1868 |
07/03/1944 |
CME |
SECR SR |
01/01/1923 |
1937 |
SR E1R 0-6-2T 'El Radials' (1874) SR D1 4-4-0 (1901) SR E1A 4-4-0 (1905) SR I1X 4-4-2T (1906) SR N15X 4-6-0 (1914) SR N 2-6-0 'Mongolipers' (1917) SR N1 2-6-0 (1923) SR L1 4-4-0 (1926) SR LN 4-6-0 'Lord Nelson' (1926) SR U 2-6-0 'U Boats' (1928) SR U1 2-6-0 'U Boats' (1928) SR Z 0-8-0T (1929) SR V 4-4-0 'Schools' (1930) SR W 2-6-4T (1931) SR Q 0-6-0 (1938) |
Link |
McDonnell, Mr Alexander |
18/12/1829 |
14/12/1904 |
CME |
NER |
|
|
NER J22 0-6-0 (1883) |
Link |
McIntosh, John Farquharson |
28/02/1846 |
06/02/1918 |
CME |
CR |
1895 |
03/1914 |
CR 29 0-6-0T (1895) CR 711 0-6-0 (1895) CR 721 4-4-0 (1896) CR 766 4-4-0 (1897) CR 92 0-4-4T (1897) CR 782 0-6-0T (1898) CR 104 0-4-4T (1899) CR 812 0-6-0 (1899) CR 900 4-4-0 (1899) CR 439 0-4-4T (1900) CR 879 0-4-4T (1900) CR 600 0-8-0 (1901) CR 55 4-6-0 (1902) CR 49 4-6-0 (1903) CR 492 0-8-0T (1903) CR 140 4-4-0 (1904) CR 903 4-6-0 (1906) CR 908 4-6-0 (1906) CR 918 4-6-0 (1906) CR 652 0-6-0 (1908) CR 139 4-4-0 (1910) CR 30 0-6-0 (1912) CR 34 2-6-0 (1912) CR 498 0-6-0T (1912) CR 179 4-6-0 (1913) CR 43 4-4-0 (1913) CR 184 4-6-0 (1914) CR 2P 0-4-4T (1925) |
Link |
Parker, Thomas |
1843 |
1903 |
CME |
MSLR |
1886 |
1893 |
MSLR D7 4-4-0 (1887) MSLR D8 4-4-0 (1888) MSLR F1 2-4-2T (1889) MSLR J13 0-6-0 (1889) MSLR N4 0-6-2T (1889) |
|
Peppercorn, Arthur Henry |
29/01/1889 |
03/03/1951 |
CME |
LNER |
01/07/1946 |
31/12/1947 |
LNER A2 4-6-2 (1947) LNER A1 4-6-2 (1948) LNER K1 2-6-0 (1949) |
|
Pettigrew, Mr William Frank |
24/01/1858 |
22/01/1941 |
CME |
FR |
1896 |
31/03/1918 |
FR L1 0-6-2T (1898) FR D3 0-6-0 (1899) FR K3 4-4-0 (1901) FR L3 0-6-2T (1904) FR D4 0-6-0 (1906) FR G5 0-6-0T (1910) FR L4 0-6-2T (1912) FR D5 0-6-0 (1913) FR K4 4-4-0 (1913) FR M1 4-4-2T (1915) |
|
Pickersgill, William |
1861 |
02/05/1928 |
CME |
GNSR CR |
03/1914 |
31/12/1922 |
GNSR D40 4-4-0 (1899) CR 113 4-4-0 (1916) CR 60 4-6-0 (1916) CR 944 4-6-2T (1917) CR 300 0-6-0 (1918) CR 72 4-4-0 (1920) CR 956 4-6-0 (1921) CR 191 4-6-0 (1922) CR 431 0-4-4T (1922) |
|
Pollitt, Harry |
26/12/1864 |
23/01/1945 |
CME |
GCR |
1894 |
1900 |
GCR D5 4-4-0 (1895) GCR D6 4-4-0 (1897) GCR F2 2-4-2T (1898) |
Link |
Ramsbottom, John |
11/09/1814 |
20/05/1897 |
CME |
LNWR |
|
|
LNWR 835 0-4-0ST (1865) |
Link |
Raven, Sir Vincent Litchfield |
03/12/1859 |
14/02/1934 |
CME |
NER |
1910 |
31/12/1922 |
NER H1 4-4-4T (1910) NER B15 4-6-0 (1911) NER C7 4-4-2 (1911) NER Q6 0-8-0 (1913) NER B16 4-6-0 (1919) NER Q7 0-8-0 (1919) NER A2 4-6-2 (1922) |
|
Reid, William Paton |
02/09/1854 |
02/02/1932 |
CME |
NBR |
1903 |
1919 |
NBR J88 0-6-0T (1904) NBR C10 4-4-2 (1906) NBR C11 4-4-2 (1906) NBR D32 4-4-0 (1906) NBR J35 0-6-0 (1906) NBR D29 4-4-0 (1909) NBR D33 4-4-0 (1909) NBR G9 0-4-4T (1909) NBR N14 0-6-2T (1909) NBR N15 0-6-2T (1910) NBR C15 4-4-2T (1911) NBR D30 4-4-0 (1912) NBR D34 4-4-0 'Glen' (1913) NBR J37 0-6-0 (1914) NBR C16 4-4-2T (1915) |
|
Robinson, John George |
30/07/1856 |
07/12/1943 |
CME |
GCR |
1900 |
31/12/1922 |
GCR D9 4-4-0 (1901) GCR J11 0-6-0 (1901) GCR B5 4-6-0 (1902) GCR Q4 0-8-0 (1902) GCR B18 4-6-0 (1903) GCR C13 4-4-2T (1903) GCR C4 4-4-2 (1903) GCR C5 4-4-2 (1905) GCR B4 4-6-0 (1906) GCR B9 4-6-0 (1906) GCR J63 0-6-0T (1906) GCR C14 4-4-2T (1907) GCR S1 0-8-4T (1907) GCR A5 4-6-2T (1911) GCR O4 2-8-0 (1911) GCR B19 4-6-0 (1912) GCR B8 4-6-0 (1913) GCR D10 4-4-0 (1913) GCR L3 2-6-4T (1914) GCR B3 4-6-0 (1917) GCR B6 4-6-0 (1918) GCR O5 2-8-0 (1918) GCR D11 4-4-0 'Large/Scottish Director' (1919) GCR B7 4-6-0 (1921) |
Link |
Rutherford, Mr David L |
04/1879 |
28/02/1940 |
CME |
FR |
|
|
FR N1 4-6-4T (1920) |
|
Smellie, Hugh |
03/03/1840 |
19/04/1891 |
CME |
MCR GSWR CR |
1890 |
19/04/1891 |
MCR 13 2-4-0 (1873) GSWR 1 0-4-4T (1879) GSWR 157 2-4-0 (1879) GSWR 1 0-6-0 '22' (1881) GSWR 218 0-4-0ST (1881) GSWR 119 4-4-0 (1882) GSWR 291 0-4-0T (1885) GSWR 153 4-4-0 (1886) GSWR 281 Renewed 0-6-0 (1911) |
|
Smith, Frederick George |
1872 |
1956 |
CME |
HR |
|
|
HR River 4-6-0 (1915) |
|
Stanier, Sir William Arthur |
27/05/1876 |
27/09/1965 |
CME |
LMS |
01/01/1932 |
1944 |
LMS 2P 0-4-4T (1932) LMS 6P5F 2-6-0 (1933) LMS PRIN 4-6-2 'Princess Royal' (1933) LMS 4P 2-6-4T (1934) LMS 5MT 4-6-0 (1934) LMS 6P 4-6-0 (1934) LMS 3P 2-6-2T (1935) LMS 4P 2-6-4T (1935) LMS 8F 2-8-0 (1935) LMS CORO 4-6-2 'Coronation (Semi)' (1937) |
Link |
Stirling, Patrick |
29/06/1820 |
11/11/1895 |
CME |
GSWR GNR |
01/10/1866 |
11/11/1895 |
GSWR 141 0-4-2 (1866) GSWR 58 0-6-0 (1866) GNR J55 0-6-0ST (1874) GNR G2 0-4-4T (1881) GNR J57 0-6-0ST (1882) GNR J7 0-6-0 (1883) GNR G1 0-4-4T (1889) GNR J52 0-6-0ST (1894) |
|
Stirling, James |
1835 |
1917 |
CME |
GSWR SER |
28/03/1878 |
1898 |
GSWR 187 0-4-2 (1870) GSWR 75 2-4-0 (1870) GSWR 208 0-4-2 (1873) GSWR 6 4-4-0 (1873) GSWR 221 0-4-2 (1874) GSWR 13 0-6-0 (1877) GSWR 187 Tanks 0-4-2T (1888) GSWR 187 Rblds 0-4-2 (1900) GSWR 221 Rblds 0-4-2 (1901) SER O 0-6-0 (1878) |
Link |
Stroudley, William |
06/03/1833 |
20/12/1889 |
CME |
HR LBSCR |
01/01/1870 |
20/12/1889 |
HR R 0-6-0T (1869) LBSCR A1 0-6-0T 'Terriers' (1876) |
|
Tennant, Henry |
|
|
CME |
NER |
|
|
NER J74 0-6-0T (1885) |
|
Thompson, Edward |
25/06/1881 |
1954 |
CME |
LNER |
05/04/1941 |
30/06/1946 |
LNER B1 4-6-0 (1942) LNER A2 4-6-2 (1944) LNER L1 2-6-4T (1945) |
Link |
Urie, Robert |
22/10/1854 |
06/01/1937 |
CME |
LSWR |
09/11/1912 |
31/12/1922 |
LSWR H15 4-6-0 (1914) LSWR N15 4-6-0 'King Arthur' (1918) LSWR S15 4-6-0 (1920) LSWR G16 4-8-0T 'Hump Engines' (1921) LSWR H16 4-6-2T (1921) |
Link |
Wainwright, Harry Smith |
16/11/1864 |
19/09/1925 |
CME |
SECR |
27/09/1898 |
30/11/1913 |
SECR F1 4-4-0 'Jumbos' (1886) SECR C 0-6-0 (1900) SECR G 4-4-0 (1900) SECR R1 0-4-4T (1900) SECR S 0-6-0ST (1900) SECR E 4-4-0 (1906) SECR P 0-6-0T (1909) |
|
Webb, Francis William |
21/05/1836 |
04/06/1906 |
CME |
LNWR |
01/10/1871 |
30/06/1903 |
LNWR 2F 0-6-0ST LNWR 2F 0-6-2T 'Coal Tank' LNWR 2F 0-6-0 'Coal Engines' (1873) LNWR Precedent 2-4-0 (1874) LNWR Precursor 2-4-0 (1874) LNWR 2234 2-4-0T (1877) LNWR 4ft 6 Tank 2-4-2T (1879) LNWR 18" Express Goods 0-6-0 'Cauliflowers' (1880) LNWR 2360 0-4-0WT (1880) LNWR Experiment 2-(2-2)-0 2-(2-2)-0 (1882) LNWR Dreadnought 2-(2-2)-0 (1884) LNWR 687 2-(2-2)-2T (1885) LNWR 600 2-(2-2)-2T (1887) LNWR 777 2-(2-4)-0T (1887) LNWR Teutonic 2-(2-2)-0 (1889) LNWR Waterloo 2-4-0 (1889) LNWR 1P 2-4-2T (1890) LNWR Greater Britain 2-(2-2)-2 (1891) LNWR 2524 0-8-0 (1892) LNWR A 0-8-0 'A Compound' (1893) LNWR Crane Tank 0-4-2ST (1893) LNWR Improved Precedent 2-4-0 (1893) LNWR Crane Tank 0-4-2WT (1894) LNWR John Hick 2-(2-2)-2 (1894) LNWR Iron Duke 4-4-0 (1897) LNWR 1560 0-6-2T (1898) LNWR Jubilee 4-4-0 (1898) LNWR 317 0-4-2ST (1901) LNWR Alfred The Great 4-4-0 (1901) LNWR B 0-8-0 '4 Cylinder Compound' (1901) LNWR 1400 4-6-0 (1903) LNWR E 2-8-0 'Rebuilt Compound' (1904) LNWR F 2-8-0 'Rebuilt Compound' (1906) LNWR Coal Engine Saddle Tank 0-6-0ST (1909) |
Link |
Whale, George |
07/12/1842 |
07/03/1910 |
CME |
LNWR |
01/07/1903 |
06/1909 |
LNWR Precursor 4-4-0 (1904) LNWR EXP 4-6-0 'Experiment' (1905) LNWR 4F 4-6-0 '19" Goods' (1906) LNWR 6ft Side Tank 4-4-2T 'Precursor Tank' (1906) LNWR G 0-8-0 '2 Cylinder Rebuilds + New' (1906) LNWR D 0-8-0 '2 Cylinder Rebuilds' (1907) LNWR Renown 4-4-0 (1908-06-00) LNWR C 0-8-0 '2 Cylinder Simple' (1911) |
Link |
Whitelegg, Robert Harben |
10/1871 |
09/03/1957 |
CME |
LTSR GSWR |
06/08/1918 |
31/12/1922 |
LTSR 37 4-4-2T (1897) LTSR 3F 0-6-2T 'Tilbury tanks' (1903) LTSR 79 4-4-2T (1909) GSWR 735 0-4-0ST (1904) GSWR 1 0-6-2T (1919) GSWR 150 0-6-0 (1921) GSWR 485 4-4-0 (1921) GSWR 540 4-6-4T (1922) |
|
Whitelegg, Thomas |
1836 |
30/03/1911 |
CME |
LTSR |
|
|
LTSR 2P 4-4-2T (1900) |
|
Worsdell, Wilson |
07/09/1850 |
14/04/1920 |
CME |
NER |
01/10/1890 |
1910 |
NER D22 4-4-0 (1886) NER D23 4-4-0 (1887) NER J78 0-6-0T 'Crane Engines' (1888) NER J73 0-6-0T (1891) NER D17 4-4-0 (1892) NER G5 0-4-4T (1894) NER J24 0-6-0 (1894) NER D18 4-4-0 (1896) NER D19 4-4-0 (1897) NER J79 0-6-0T (1897) NER J25 0-6-0 (1898) NER J72 0-6-0T (1898) NER B13 4-6-0 (1899) NER D20 4-4-0 (1899) NER B14 4-6-0 (1900) NER Q5 0-8-0 (1901) NER N10 0-6-2T (1902) NER C6 4-4-2 (1903) NER J26 0-6-0 (1904) NER C8 4-4-2 (1906) NER J27 0-6-0 (1906) NER A6 4-6-2T (1907) NER D21 4-4-0 (1908) NER T1 4-8-0T (1909) NER A7 4-6-2T (1910) |
Link |
Worsdell, Thomas William |
14/01/1838 |
28/06/1916 |
CME |
GER NER |
1885 |
01/10/1890 |
GER J15 0-6-0 (1883) GER Y6 0-4-0T (1883) NER F8 2-4-2T (1886) NER J21 0-6-0 (1886) NER J71 0-6-0T (1886) NER N8 0-6-2T (1886) NER Y7 0-4-0T (1888) NER Y8 0-4-0T (1890) NER N9 0-6-2T (1893) |
Link |