Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2059 Today
» 2521 Yesterday
» 16411 Week
» 63244 Month
» 365265 Year
» 2765729 Total
|
Record: 6840 (19/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Preserved Electric Locomotives
Type |
Class |
Number |
Name |
Company |
To Service |
Withdrawn |
Date Preserved |
Status |
Last Updated |
Link |
Electric |
AL1/A |
81002 |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
01/10/1990 |
|
Unknown |
|
|
Electric |
AL3/A |
83012 |
|
|
03/07/1961 |
01/03/1989 |
|
Unknown |
|
|
Electric |
84 |
84001 |
|
|
08/03/1960 |
01/01/1979 |
|
Unknown |
|
|
Electric |
82 |
82008 |
|
|
30/10/1961 |
01/12/1987 |
|
Unknown |
|
|
Electric |
85/1 |
85101 |
|
|
20/12/1961 |
01/11/1992 |
|
Unknown |
|
|
Electric |
86/2 |
86259 |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
10/2003 |
|
Unknown |
|
|
Electric |
86/0 |
86101 |
Sir William A. Stanier F.R.S. |
|
11/11/1965 |
12/2001 |
|
Unknown |
|
|
Electric |
86/0 |
86213 |
|
|
02/12/1965 |
09/1998 |
|
Unknown |
|
|
Electric |
71 |
71001 |
|
|
31/01/1959 |
11/1977 |
|
Unknown |
|
|
Electric |
EM1 |
76020 |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
11/08/1977 |
|
Unknown |
|
|
Electric |
ES1 |
26500 |
|
|
1902 |
14/09/1964 |
|
Unknown |
|
|
Electric |
EM2 |
27000 |
ELECTRA |
|
28/12/1953 |
05/10/1968 |
|
Unknown |
|
|
Electric |
EM2 |
27001 |
ARIADNE |
|
22/03/1954 |
05/10/1968 |
|
Unknown |
|
|
Electric |
EM2 |
27003 |
DIANA |
|
05/08/1954 |
05/10/1968 |
|
Unknown |
|
|
Electric |
87 |
87001 |
ROYAL SCOT |
|
01/06/1973 |
01/06/2005 |
|
Unknown |
|
|
Electric |
87 |
87035 |
|
|
09/10/1974 |
01/01/2005 |
|
Unknown |
|
|