Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 200 Today
» 3545 Yesterday
» 16507 Week
» 68392 Month
» 693747 Year
» 3720600 Total
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
Locomotives of the Somerset & Dorset Joint Railway
Build Date SDJR Class LMS Class First SDJR Number Wheels Designer Manufacturer Order Number Works Number Withdrawn
02/1914     80 2-8-0 H. Fowler Derby Works ??   19/06/1959
03/1914     81 2-8-0 H. Fowler Derby Works ??   19/06/1961
03/1914     82 2-8-0 H. Fowler Derby Works ??   08/03/1960
04/1914     83 2-8-0 H. Fowler Derby Works ??   08/02/1962
04/1914     84 2-8-0 H. Fowler Derby Works ??   08/02/1962
08/1914     85 2-8-0 H. Fowler Derby Works ??   21/03/1961
07/1925     86 2-8-0 H. Fowler Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ?? 3892 22/01/1964
07/1925     87 2-8-0 H. Fowler Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ?? 3893 07/09/1964
07/1925     88 2-8-0 H. Fowler Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ?? 3894 26/02/1964
07/1925     89 2-8-0 H. Fowler Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ?? 3895 01/06/1964
08/1925     90 2-8-0 H. Fowler Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd ?? 3896 18/11/1963