Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 1010 Today
» 887 Yesterday
» 6812 Week
» 18049 Month
» 250969 Year
» 1916345 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
London, Midland & Scottish Railway and Constituent Companies
Company CME Date Incorporated Date Amalgamated Locomotives
LMS London, Midland & Scottish Railway   1923-01-01 1947-12-31  
CR Caledonian Railway        
FR Furness Railway     1922-12-31  
GSWR Glasgow and South Western Railway     1922-12-31  
HR Highland Railway     1922-12-31  
LYR Lancashire and Yorkshire Railway        
LNWR London and North Western Railway        
MCR Maryport & Carlisle Railway   1836-00-00 1923-01-01  
MR Midland Railway        
NSR North Staffordshire Railway        
SDJR Somerset & Dorset Joint Railway        
WR Wirral Railway     1923-01-01