Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 3153 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16559 Week
» 69575 Month
» 189102 Year
» 3215955 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
London and North Eastern Railway and Constituent Companies
|
Company |
Chief Mechanical Engineers |
Date Incorporated |
Date Amalgamated |
Locomotives |
LNER |
London and North Eastern Railway |
|
01/01/1923 |
31/12/1947 |
|
EWYUR |
East & West Yorkshire Union Railway |
|
|
|
|
GCR |
Great Central Railway |
|
|
|
|
GER |
Great Eastern Railway |
|
|
31/12/1922 |
|
GNSR |
Great North of Scotland Railway |
|
|
|
|
GNR |
Great Northern Railway |
|
|
31/12/1922 |
|
HBR |
Hull & Barnsley Railway |
|
|
|
|
MET |
Metropolitan Railway |
|
|
|
|
MSR |
Mid-Suffolk Railway |
|
|
01/07/1924 |
|
MGNR |
Midland & Great Northern Railway |
|
|
|
|
NBR |
North British Railway |
|
|
|
|
NER |
North Eastern Railway |
|
|
31/12/1922 |
|