Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 25 Online
» 702 Today
» 1172 Yesterday
» 702 Week
» 19603 Month
» 19603 Year
» 1684979 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Locomotive Components

Boiler #8011
Big Four Company LNER
Diagram 97
Boiler History
Class Loco Number Name Date Fitted
J39 1296   30/04/1932
J39 1287   02/02/1935
J39 1492   27/03/1937
J39 2694   19/08/1939