Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 506 Today
» 5422 Yesterday
» 21540 Week
» 120185 Month
» 322849 Year
» 3349702 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #6662
Big Four Company |
GWR |
GWR Boiler Group |
98 |
GWR Standard Boiler |
8 |
Diagram |
HB |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
Castle |
5075 |
DEVIZES CASTLE |
03/08/1938 |
Castle |
4091 |
DUDLEY CASTLE |
22/09/1942 |
Castle |
5012 |
BERRY POMEROY CASTLE |
27/04/1945 |
Castle |
4097 |
KENILWORTH CASTLE |
22/10/1947 |
Castle |
5024 |
CAREW CASTLE |
18/11/1949 |
Castle |
5015 |
KINGSWEAR CASTLE |
12/10/1951 |
Castle |
5058 |
EARL OF CLANCARTY |
29/12/1953 |
Castle |
5056 |
EARL OF POWIS |
25/01/1957 |
|