Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 475 Today
» 5648 Yesterday
» 17338 Week
» 8394 Month
» 354818 Year
» 3381671 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Locomotive Components
Boiler #1448
Pre Grouping Company |
NER |
Big Four Company |
LNER |
Diagram |
47 |
|
Boiler History
Class |
Loco Number |
Name |
Date Fitted |
A2 |
2401 |
|
30/12/1922 |
A2 |
2400 |
CITY OF NEWCASTLE |
07/02/1930 |
A2 |
2402 |
CITY OF YORK |
10/01/1933 |
A2 |
2403 |
CITY OF DURHAM |
18/10/1935 |
|